Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Sara L Ellis
Case #: 1:25-cv-02145
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2025
Terminated:Apr 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 5:31 AM CDT
Defendant
AVI Foodsystems, Inc.
doing business at Sarah Lawrence College 2590 Elm Road NE
Warren, OH 44483
Represented By
Steven Joshua Silver
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey Daniel Iles
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
UNITE HERE Health
Represented By
Fiona Madelyn Lamb
Baum Sigman Auerbach & Neuman, Ltd.
contact info
Laura M. Finnegan
Baum Sigman Auerbach & Neuman, Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Walker
Represented By
Fiona Madelyn Lamb
Baum Sigman Auerbach & Neuman, Ltd.
contact info
Laura M. Finnegan
Baum Sigman Auerbach & Neuman, Ltd.
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/01/2025 7:18 AM CST
Friday, February 28, 2025
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 3). (cvk, )
Related: [-]
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached[LINK:Consent To] [LINK:form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (cvk, )
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs COMPLAINT filed by UNITE HERE Health, Matthew Walker; N. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-23148974.(Finnegan, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs UNITE HERE Health, Matthew Walker by Laura M. Finnegan (Finnegan, Laura)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (Finnegan, Laura)
Related: [-]
4 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs UNITE HERE Health, Matthew Walker by Fiona Madelyn Lamb (Lamb, Fiona)
Related: [-]