Utah District Court
Judge:Tena Campbell
Case #: 2:25-cv-00146
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 3:23 AM MDT
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By
Jose A. Abarca
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Chaunceton Bird
Parr Brown Gee & Loveless
contact info
Defendant
Mountain America Federal Credit Union
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
Plaintiff
Jesus Delgado Gutierrez
Represented By
Eric Stephenson
Stephenson Law Firm
contact info
Rebecca Fredona
Doherty Smith, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
35 35 order Order of Recusal Tue 05/20 9:52 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL - Judge David Barlow recused. Case reassigned to Judge Tena Campbell for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 5/20/25. (jrj)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 19, 2025
34 34 utility Reassignment to District Judge Mon 05/19 9:27 AM
NOTICE OF NON-CONSENT Consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge under DUCivR 72-3 has not been obtained. Case randomly assigned to Judge David Barlow and Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Magistrate Judge is automatically referred under 28 U.S.C636(b)(1)(A). Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned as the presiding judge to the case. (mh)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
33 33 notice Notice From the Court Fri 05/16 9:18 AM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT: On May 15, 2025, Plaintiff filed a32 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the dismissal of this defendant is self-effectuating. See Kristina Consulting Grp. v. Debt Pay Gateway, Inc. , No. 21-5022 2022 U.S. App. LEXIS 7858, at *5 n.4 (10th Cir. Mar. 25, 2022) (unpublished) ("Although Rule 41(a)(1)(A) refers to dismissal of the 'action,' the rule permits the dismissal of fewer than all parties so long as all claims against a particular party are dismissed."). Pursuant to the terms of the notice of voluntary dismissal, Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to pay their own attorney fees and costs. No order will follow. (gdr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
32 32 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Atty) Thu 05/15 11:51 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Experian filed by Plaintiff Jesus Delgado Gutierrez (Fredona, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
31 31 notice Notice of Settlement (Atty) Thu 05/01 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Jesus Delgado Gutierrez (Fredona, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
30 30 misc Modification of Docket Thu 05/01 10:29 AM
Modification of Docket re29 Answer to Complaint : Error: Adding extra text should be avoided except when it is necessary to indicate unique information that is not already duplicated or linked to in the system text. The link is sufficient and a filers identity is always automatically added to entry text by the system. Excess text has been removed. (alf)
Related: [-]
29 29 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/30 2:11 PM
Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Abarca, Jose)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
28 28 misc Received Consent /Reassignment Form Mon 04/28 11:04 AM
RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Jesus Delgado Gutierrez. (mh)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment Fri 04/25 10:14 AM
NOTICE OF PRESIDING MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-3, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail to the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Defendants Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Plaintiff Jesus Delgado Gutierrez. Form due by 5/16/2025. (mh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
26 26 notice Notice From the Court Thu 04/24 9:46 AM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT: On April 23, 2025, Plaintiff filed a25 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Trans Union LLC. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the dismissal of this defendant is self-effectuating. See Kristina Consulting Grp. v. Debt Pay Gateway, Inc. , No. 21-5022 2022 U.S. App. LEXIS 7858, at *5 n.4 (10th Cir. Mar. 25, 2022) (unpublished) ("Although Rule 41(a)(1)(A) refers to dismissal of the 'action,' the rule permits the dismissal of fewer than all parties so long as all claims against a particular party are dismissed."). Pursuant to the terms of the notice of voluntary dismissal, Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Trans Union LLC are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to pay their own attorney fees and costs. No order will follow. (gdr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Atty) Wed 04/23 9:05 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Trans Union LLC filed by Plaintiff Jesus Delgado Gutierrez (Fredona, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
24 24 utility Remark Mon 04/21 2:11 PM
Remark: Case was closed in error. Case reopened, defendant Mountain America Federal Credit Union terminated with prejudice per notice 23 . (alf)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice From the Court Mon 04/21 10:30 AM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT: On April 21, 2025, Plaintiff filed a22 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Mountain America Federal Credit Union. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the dismissal of this defendant is self-effectuating. See Kristina Consulting Grp. v. Debt Pay Gateway, Inc. , No. 21-5022 2022 U.S. App. LEXIS 7858, at *5 n.4 (10th Cir. Mar. 25, 2022) (unpublished) ("Although Rule 41(a)(1)(A) refers to dismissal of the 'action,' the rule permits the dismissal of fewer than all parties so long as all claims against a particular party are dismissed."). Pursuant to the terms of the notice of voluntary dismissal, Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Mountain America Federal Credit Union are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to pay their own attorney fees and costs. No order will follow. (gdr)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Atty) Fri 04/18 10:52 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Mountain America Federal Credit Union filed by Plaintiff Jesus Delgado Gutierrez (Fredona, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
21 21 notice Notice of Settlement (Atty) Thu 04/03 11:01 AM
NOTICE of Settlement Mountain America Federal Credit Union by Jesus Delgado Gutierrez (Fredona, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
20 20 notice Notice of Availability of Judicial Settlement Conference Tue 04/01 1:45 PM
NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF JUDICIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. For the benefit of the public and the bar, the District of Utah offers judicial settlement conference as an alternative for dispute resolution assistance in all civil cases and bankruptcy adversary proceedings. The court offers this alternative because, when compared with litigation, it can resolve a dispute faster, at less expense, and with solutions that are better able to meet the parties' needs and interests. Parties may file a stipulated motion for judicial settlement conference. A form[LINK:motion] is available on the court's website. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Plaintiff Jesus Delgado Gutierrez. (alf)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/01 11:10 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Based on the parties' stipulation, Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to May 1, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 4/1/2025. No attached document. (gdr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 03/31 2:01 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re2 Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Attorney Chaunceton Bird added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft)(Bird, Chaunceton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint
Friday, March 28, 2025
17 17 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 03/28 1:32 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Based on the parties' stipulation and for good cause shown, Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to April 30, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 3/28/2025. No attached document. (gdr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
16 16 misc Modification of Docket Fri 03/28 12:10 PM
Modification of Docket re15 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer : Error: The filing should have been linked to the complaint. Correction: Motion now linked to2 Complaint. (alf)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 03/27 3:31 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. Attorney Jose A. Abarca added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft)(Abarca, Jose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Settlement (Atty) Wed 03/26 11:56 AM
NOTICE of Settlement Trans Union LLC by Jesus Delgado Gutierrez (Fredona, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/14 10:39 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Filed by Jesus Delgado Gutierrez. Summons as to Mountain America Federal Credit Union. (Fredona, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/14 10:38 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Filed by Jesus Delgado Gutierrez. Summons as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Fredona, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/14 10:37 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Filed by Jesus Delgado Gutierrez. Summons as to Trans Union LLC. (Fredona, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/14 10:35 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Filed by Jesus Delgado Gutierrez. Summons as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Fredona, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/13 4:24 PM
ORDER granting 8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Rebecca Fredona for Jesus Delgado Gutierrez. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 3/13/2025. (haa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
8 8 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry) Tue 03/11 10:16 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rebecca Fredona , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-5358224, Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at[LINK:https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html] . Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at[LINK:https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing] . filed by Plaintiff Jesus Delgado Gutierrez.(Stephenson, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Exhibit Application,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 03, 2025
7 7 5 pgs order Order to Propose Schedule Tue 03/04 8:48 AM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 3/3/2025. (haa)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Electronically Fri 02/28 3:35 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Mountain America Federal Credit Union. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Electronically Fri 02/28 3:35 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Electronically Fri 02/28 3:34 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Trans Union LLC. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Electronically Fri 02/28 3:34 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
Related: [-]
2 2 20 pgs cmp Complaint (Atty) Fri 02/28 2:08 PM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5348022) filed by Jesus Delgado Gutierrez. (Stephenson, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 misc Remark - New Case Fri 02/28 12:51 PM
Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Plaintiff Jesus Delgado Gutierrez is directed to E-File the Complaint and civil cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 405 by the end of the business day. NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts[LINK:PDF version] and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (kec)
Related: [-]