Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John L Badalamenti
Referred: Nicholas P Mizell
Case #: 2:25-cv-00168
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 5:00 AM EDT
Defendant
Racetrac, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph Jacob Goldberg
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Vicky Laguerre
Represented By
Charles Randall Austin, I
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, April 18, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Fri 04/18 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Joseph Jacob Goldberg on behalf of Racetrac, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Joseph J. Goldberg. (Goldberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
13 13 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 04/17 12:50 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Tiffany Brooke Batten and Joseph Jacob Goldberg of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (FLY)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of appearance Thu 04/17 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany Brooke Batten on behalf of Racetrac, Inc. (Batten, Tiffany) Modified on 4/17/2025 to edit text. (FLY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
11 11 misc Case Management Report Tue 04/08 5:08 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Goldberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
10 10 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Mon 03/31 4:56 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Racetrac, Inc.. (Goldberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Wed 03/26 11:32 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Vicky Laguerre. (Austin, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 03/25 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Charles Randall Austin, I on behalf of Vicky Laguerre. Lead Counsel: C. Randall Austin. (Austin, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
7 7 order Order Mon 03/17 9:52 AM
TEXT ORDER. Local Rule 3.03 requires that, with the first appearance, each party must file a disclosure statement using the standard form from the clerk or the court's website. But both parties failed to do so. By March 31, 2025, both parties must file their disclosure statement using the standard form, which can be found at: https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/form/disclosure-statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 3/17/2025. (RCD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 03/04 11:20 AM
NOTICE of hearing: TELEPHONIC Rule 16(b) Conference set for 5/8/2025 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. A Case Management Report to be filed by 4/22/2024. DIAL: 1-650-479-3207, Access code: 2316 024 8769(WRW)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Civil Action Order Tue 03/04 10:49 AM
CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/4/2025. (WRW)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/03 10:51 AM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Racetrac, Inc. (Originally filed in State Court on 2/18/2025)(BD)
Related: [-]
3 3 3 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/03 10:50 AM
COMPLAINT against Racetrac, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Vicky Laguerre. (Originally filed in State Court on 1/24/2025) (BD)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/03 8:47 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:25-cv-168-JLB-NPM. (ARL)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 02/28 5:19 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Collier County Circuit Court, case number 2025-CA-000137-0001 01 filed in State Court on 01/24/2025. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-23077331 filed by All Defendants.(Goldberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT Complaint,
Att: 2 State Court ANSWER Answer,
Att: 3 State Court Docket Sheet Docket Sheet,
Att: 4 State Court Other Documents Combined court documents,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet