Marion Martinez v. West Hills Hospital et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha |
Referred: | Michael B Kaufman |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-01749 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Feb 28, 2025 |
Case in other court: | Los Angeles County Superior Court, 23STCV13576 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 2:56 AM PDT |
Defendant
CHC Payroll Agent, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Adam Gardner
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HCA Healthcare, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HCA Human Resources, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Los Robles Regional Medical Center
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Charlene Timms
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
West Hills Hospital
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
HCA Healthcare
|
|
Defendant
HCA Human Resources Group
|
|
Plaintiff
Marion Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, May 01, 2025 | ||
21 | 21
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 05/01 3:45 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties, and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the court VACATES the May 2, 2025, Scheduling Conference. A Scheduling and Trial Order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (doc) |
|
Monday, April 28, 2025 | ||
20 | 20
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 04/28 7:42 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OF PLAINTIFF MARION MARTINEZ TO REMAND CASE TO LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT (DKT.11 ) UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court finds that the Motion to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court currently scheduled for hearing on May 2, 2025, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, this motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. The court expects the parties to continue litigating this action diligently, while awaiting the court's ruling on this motion. No appearances are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) |
|
Friday, April 18, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 8-10 days, filed by Plaintiff Marion Martinez.. (Good, Morgan) |
|
18 | 18
![]() REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court11 filed by Plaintiff Marion Martinez. (Good, Morgan) |
|
Friday, April 11, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
![]() OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court11 filed by Defendants CHC Payroll Agent, Inc., Adam Gardner, HCA Healthcare, Inc., HCA Human Resources, LLC, Los Robles Regional Medical Center, Charlene Timms, West Hills Hospital.(Chuang, Angela) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, April 08, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE15 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The Scheduling Conference is continued to May 2, 2025, at 1:30 p.m. (lc) |
|
Monday, April 07, 2025 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from April 25, 2025 to May 2, 2025 filed by Plaintiff Marion Martinez.(Good, Morgan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, April 01, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Marion Martinez, identifying West Hills Hospital, HCA Healthcare, Inc., CHC Payroll Agent, Inc., HCA Human Resources, LLC, Los Robles Regional Medical Center, Charlene Timms, Adam Gardner, Healthcare Indemnity, Inc., The Myers Law Group, APC, Sheppard Mulling Richtor & Hampton, LLP, Marion Martinez. (Good, Morgan) |
|
13 | 13
![]() RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court11 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. A notice of interested parties shall be filed no later than 5 days from entry of this Order. (lc) |
|
Monday, March 31, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Plaintiff's NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) |
|
Friday, March 28, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Marion Martinez. Motion set for hearing on 5/2/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Good, Morgan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Tuesday, March 18, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Scheduling Conference set for 4/25/2025 at 01:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) |
|
9 | 9
![]() INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) |
|
Monday, March 10, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge George H Wu. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge George H Wu to Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:25-cv-01749 FLA(MBKx). (rn) |
|
Thursday, March 06, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Judge George H Wu for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Michael B. Kaufman. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:25-cv-01749-GW (MBKx). (et) |
|
6 | 6
textonly
MJDAP Timely Opt-Out
Thu 03/06 9:37 AM
Declination of Consent form received on 3/5/2025 was submitted within deadline set forth in L.R. 73-2.1.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (edr) |
|
Tuesday, March 04, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() (IN CHAMBERS) Order by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver RE: DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. On March 4, 2025, the Clerk issued a Notice of Assignment to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent form. The Court directs all parties served with this order to promptly review Local Rule 73. There are strict deadlines for a party to decline consent to have a Magistrate Judge preside over this case. If a declination of consent is not received by the applicable deadline, that party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge for all purposes. See Order for further details. (edr) |
|
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh) |
|
Friday, February 28, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, identifying HCA Healthcare, Inc.. (Attorney Bryanne Lewis added to party HCA Healthcare, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Bryanne Lewis added to party CHC Payroll Agent, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Bryanne Lewis added to party HCA Human Resources, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Bryanne Lewis added to party Los Robles Regional Medical Center(pty:dft), Attorney Bryanne Lewis added to party Charlene Timms(pty:dft), Attorney Bryanne Lewis added to party Adam Gardner(pty:dft))(Lewis, Bryanne) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant West Hills Hospital. (Lewis, Bryanne) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 23STCV13576 Receipt No: ACACDC-39205987 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant West Hills Hospital. (Attorney Bryanne Lewis added to party West Hills Hospital(pty:dft))(Lewis, Bryanne) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Tue 03/04 9:16 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants CHC Payroll Agent, Inc., Does, Adam Gardner, HCA Healthcare, HCA Healthcare, Inc., HCA Human Resources Group, HCA Human Resources, LLC, Los Robles Regional Medical Center, Charlene Timms, West Hills Hospital. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Marion Martinez. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/13/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh) |
||
othcmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 03/04 9:18 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants CHC Payroll Agent, Inc., Does, Adam Gardner, HCA Healthcare, HCA Healthcare, Inc., HCA Human Resources Group, HCA Human Resources, LLC, Los Robles Regional Medical Center, Charlene Timms, West Hills Hospital amending Complaint,, filed by Plaintiff Marion Martinez. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 8/14/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 )(lh) |
||
othcmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 03/04 9:20 AM
NON-CONFORMED COPY OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants CHC Payroll Agent, Inc., Does, Adam Gardner, HCA Healthcare, HCA Healthcare, Inc., HCA Human Resources Group, HCA Human Resources, LLC, Los Robles Regional Medical Center, Charlene Timms, West Hills Hospital amending First Amended Complaint,, filed by Plaintiff Marion Martinez. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 )(lh) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Tue 03/04 9:24 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants CHC Payroll Agent, Inc., HCA Human Resources, LLC, Los Robles Regional Medical Center, Charlene Timms, Adam Gardner, West Hills Hospital, HCA Healthcare, Inc. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 7/16/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 )(lh) |