California Central District Court
Judge:Steve Kim
Case #: 2:25-cv-01750
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 2:56 AM PDT
Defendant
Leona M. Drum
Represented By
Cris Campbell Vaughan
Vaughan And Associates Law Office, Apc
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Homers Truck and Auto Service, Inc.
Represented By
Cris Campbell Vaughan
Vaughan And Associates Law Office, Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Bernard Taruc
Represented By
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 16 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
15 15 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Tue 04/29 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Bernard Taruc. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
14 14 order Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-22) Thu 04/17 10:17 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim: granting9 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation as to All Defendants. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than 7/15/2025. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (hr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
13 13 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Thu 04/10 4:17 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) STANDING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim: This action has been assigned to the civil consent calendar of Judge Steve Kim through the Voluntary Consent Program or the Magistrate Judges Direct Assignment Program. (see document for details.) (et)
Related: [-]
12 12 textonly MJDAP Opt-Out Expired Thu 04/10 2:47 PM
The period to decline consent to a magistrate judge has expired. No timely declination of consent has been received by the Court. Each party is deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge for all purposes pursuant to the Local Rules. The case shall now proceed before a Magistrate Judge for all purposes. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (clee)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 04/10 1:47 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bernard Taruc, upon Defendant Leona M. Drum served on 3/21/2025, answer due 4/11/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon LEONA M. DRUM, DEFENDANT in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 04/10 12:25 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bernard Taruc, upon Defendant Homers Truck and Auto Service, Inc. served on 3/18/2025, answer due 4/8/2025. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
9 9 motion Stay Case and Early Mediation (ADR-21) Tue 04/08 1:35 PM
APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendants Leona M. Drum, Homers Truck and Auto Service, Inc.. (Attorney Cris Campbell Vaughan added to party Leona M. Drum(pty:dft), Attorney Cris Campbell Vaughan added to party Homers Truck and Auto Service, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Vaughan, Cris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
8 8 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Tue 03/18 1:35 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) STANDING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) (hr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
7 7 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Tue 03/04 3:05 PM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (clee)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/03 11:27 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Leona M. Drum, Homers Truck and Auto Service, Inc. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form Mon 03/03 11:23 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
4 4 notice Summons Request Fri 02/28 1:12 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Bernard Taruc. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 02/28 1:12 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 02/28 1:11 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Bernard Taruc. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 02/28 1:10 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39202096 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Bernard Taruc(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]