Kentucky Western District Court
Judge:David J Hale
Case #: 3:25-cv-00123
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2025
Case in other court:Jefferson Circuit Court, 25-CI-000918
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 5:08 AM EDT
Defendant
Shaun Wimberly
Represented By
James Patrick Grohmann
O'Bryan, Brown & Toner, PLLC
contact info
Caroline Bruenderman
O'Bryan, Brown & Toner, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Wimberly and Associates, PLLC
Represented By
James Patrick Grohmann
O'Bryan, Brown & Toner, PLLC
contact info
Caroline Bruenderman
O'Bryan, Brown & Toner, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Louis Briggs
Represented By
Zachary L. Taylor
Winton & Hiestand Law Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 42 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
7 7 motion Remand Wed 03/05 4:01 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Louis Briggs (Taylor, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 03, 2025
6 6 motion Dismiss Mon 03/03 3:07 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Shaun Wimberly, Wimberly and Associates, PLLC (Bruenderman, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint filed 09-05-17,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Order filed 08-25-20,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Civil Docket for case # 17-cv-00537,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - US Court of Appeals Sixth Circuit General Docket,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Opinion by US Court of Appeals filed 4 1-2022
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Complaint in Jefferson Circuit 9 21-2024
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - Opinion and Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 9 Proposed Order Proposed Order of Dismissal
Friday, February 28, 2025
5 5 misc Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Fri 02/28 5:32 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement and Diversity Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)); filed by Shaun Wimberly, Wimberly and Associates, PLLC. (Bruenderman, Caroline)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Deficiency Fri 02/28 3:15 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency re1 Notice of Removal. Reason for Deficiency: Missing Rule 7.1(a)(1) and Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statements. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/7/2025. (KDY)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/28 3:04 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE to Jefferson Circuit Court Clerk and counsel/parties of records re1 Notice of Removal. (KDY)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assignment Fri 02/28 2:52 PM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (KDY)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Fri 02/28 2:51 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Wimberly and Associates, PLLC and Shaun Wimberly from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 25-CI-000918. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AKYWDC-4201535) Notice to counsel: Pursuant to LR 81.1(a), the removing party must electronically file any portion of the state court record it considers relevant to the removed action that the removing party did not file at the time of removal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1446(a). Pursuant to LR 81.1(b), any motion that remains pending in state court at the time of removal that the movant wishes the District Court to rule upon must be refiled in the District Court case within 14 days after removal. (KDY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Itemization of Damages,
Att: 3 Attachment 1 - Summons to Shaun Wimberly,
Att: 4 Attachment 2 - Summons to Shaun Wimberly,
Att: 5 Attachment 3 - Receipt Courtesy Receipt,
Att: 6 Attachment 4 - Receipt USPS Receipt,
Att: 7 Attachment 5 - Receipt USPS Receipt,
Att: 8 Cover Sheet