Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Nitza I Quinones Alejandr
Case #: 2:25-cv-01082
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 5:04 AM EDT
Defendant
WALMART INC
702 SW 8th Street
Bentonville, AR 72716
Represented By
KEVIN J. MANGAN
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Storebound LLC
50 Broad Street, 12th Floor
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
KEAN C. MAYNARD
Bochetto&lentz, P.C
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 05/14 9:37 AM
ORDER DENYING AS MOOT8 MOTION TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 5/13/25. 5/14/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 05/12 3:36 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Storebound LLC, filed by Storebound LLC.(MAYNARD, KEAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Exhibit A. Receipt Evidencing Purchase,
Att: 3 Exhibit B. '368 Patent,
Att: 4 Exhibit C. Infringing Products from Website,
Att: 5 Exhibit D. Photos of Infringing Product,
Att: 6 Exhibit E. Claim Chart
Friday, May 02, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Fri 05/02 4:04 PM
ORDER GRANTING7 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF BARRY J. HERMAN. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 5/2/25. 5/2/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
9 9 10 pgs respm Memorandum Mon 04/28 5:51 PM
Memorandum re8 MOTION to Dismiss // Defendant Walmart Inc.'s Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by WALMART INC.(MANGAN, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
8 8 motion Dismiss Mon 04/28 5:48 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by WALMART INC.Defendant Walmart Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction.(MANGAN, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Friday, April 25, 2025
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Fri 04/25 9:12 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Barry J. Herman ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-18243180.) filed by WALMART INC..(MANGAN, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order Order Setting Answer Deadline Fri 03/21 9:04 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR WALMART INC TO ANSWER BY 4/28/2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 3/20/25. 3/21/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]
5 5 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Thu 03/20 2:35 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by WALMART INC.(MANGAN, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Stipulation Thu 03/20 2:33 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint (Attorney), // Stipulation and Proposed Order by WALMART INC. (MANGAN, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 03/03 4:43 PM
Summons Issued as to WALMART INC. Forwarded To: Kean C. Maynard on 3/3/25 (fdc)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice Re: Magistrate Consent Mon 03/03 9:57 AM
Opt In Notice of Procedure to Consent to Random Magistrate Judge Assignment(sbt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent
Friday, February 28, 2025
1 1 62 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Fri 02/28 5:06 PM
COMPLAINT against WALMART INC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-18109062.), filed by Storebound LLC.(MAYNARD, KEAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form