Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Julia K Munley
Case #: 3:25-cv-00373
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 5:23 AM EDT
Defendant
Farah Damas
Defendant
Drew Lutton
Represented By
Adam J. Fulginiti
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
Defendant
Monroe County
Represented By
Brooke C. Madonna
Spector Gadon & Rosen, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Pleasant Valley Manor, Inc.
Represented By
Adam J. Fulginiti
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Minter
Represented By
Patrick E. Dougherty
Dougherty, Levanthal & Price
contact info
Sean P. McDonough
Dougherty, Leventhal & Price, L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
Teresa D. Minter
Represented By
Patrick E. Dougherty
Dougherty, Levanthal & Price
contact info
Sean P. McDonough
Dougherty, Leventhal & Price, L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kristen Minter-Possinger
Represented By
Patrick E. Dougherty
Dougherty, Levanthal & Price
contact info
Sean P. McDonough
Dougherty, Leventhal & Price, L.L.P.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order Thu 05/08 4:21 PM
ORDER directing plaintiff to file to further this action re dft Damas, Failure to comply may result in the dismissal of the defendant for failure to prosecute. Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 5/8/25. (sm)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
13 13 misc Letter Mon 05/05 12:55 PM
Letter from Sean P. McDonough to Judge Munley regarding service on Defendant Damas . (McDonough, Sean)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
12 12 2 pgs order Order Fri 04/25 1:57 PM
ORDER DIRECTING plaintiff to file status report w/i 10 days re service of Defendant Damas. Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 4/25/25. (sm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/24 11:37 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, with Affirmative Defenses by Pleasant Valley Manor, Inc., Drew Lutton.(Fulginiti, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/14 4:33 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, with Affirmative Defenses by Monroe County.(Madonna, Brooke)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
9 9 misc Stipulation Mon 04/07 12:13 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Monroe County. (Madonna, Brooke)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
8 8 service Proof of Service Tue 04/01 3:03 PM
Proof of Service - by Teresa D. Minter, Kristen Minter-Possinger, Michael Minter re2 Summons Issued, (McDonough, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
7 7 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Mon 03/24 11:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke C. Madonna on behalf of Monroe County (Madonna, Brooke)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
6 6 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Tue 03/18 9:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick E. Dougherty on behalf of Teresa D. Minter, Kristen Minter-Possinger, Michael Minter. (Dougherty, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
5 5 misc Jury Demand Thu 03/13 3:30 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Pleasant Valley Manor, Inc., Drew Lutton. (Fulginiti, Adam)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Thu 03/13 3:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J. Fulginiti on behalf of Pleasant Valley Manor, Inc., Drew Lutton (Fulginiti, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
3 3 1 pgs order Order Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Mon 03/03 4:40 PM
ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 3/3/25. (sm)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 02/28 3:49 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (dj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Packet
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/28 3:47 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405, Receipt Number APAMDC-6916297), filed by Teresa D. Minter, Kristen Minter-Possinger, Michael Minter.(dj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - POA,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Survey Report of 7-25-23,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - PMV Bylaws,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - PMV Agenda,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - CMS Star Rating 10-19-23,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - CMS Star Rating 2-26-25,
Att: 8 Exhibit G - Pg 4 of Master baseline,
Att: 9 Exhibit H - MDS Section G,
Att: 10 Exhibit I - Progress Note,
Att: 11 Exhibit J - Cert of Merit