New York Southern District Court
Judge:Andrew L Carter, Jr
Case #: 1:25-cv-01733
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 4:55 AM EDT
Defendant
Kuberno Limited
Represented By
Evan David Parness
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Teresa T. Lewi
Covington & Burling Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Kuberno US Inc.
Represented By
Evan David Parness
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Teresa T. Lewi
Covington & Burling Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Mr. Andrew Harker-Rigal
Plaintiff
Diligent Boardbooks Limited
Represented By
Safraz W. Ishmael
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Marc Evan Miller
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Diligent Corporation
Represented By
Safraz W. Ishmael
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Marc Evan Miller
Dla Piper LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, April 04, 2025
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 04/04 4:41 PM
ORDER granting16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/4/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 04/04 4:42 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Andrew Harker-Rigal answer due 5/16/2025; Kuberno Limited answer due 5/16/2025; Kuberno US Inc. answer due 5/16/2025. (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 04/03 3:34 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Evan Parness dated April 3, 2025. Document filed by Kuberno Limited, Kuberno US Inc...(Parness, Evan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/02 12:32 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Teresa T. Lewi on behalf of Kuberno Limited, Kuberno US Inc...(Lewi, Teresa)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/02 12:30 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evan David Parness on behalf of Kuberno Limited, Kuberno US Inc...(Parness, Evan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
13 13 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 03/19 3:04 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Kuberno US Inc. served on 3/17/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. Service was accepted by L. Jackson Intake Specialist. Document filed by Diligent Corporation; Diligent Boardbooks Limited..(Ishmael, Safraz)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/14 10:57 AM
ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Safraz W. Ishmael for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned action is hereby GRANTED. As further set forth by this Order. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 3/14/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/11 2:26 PM
MOTION for Safraz Ishmael to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30748046. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Diligent Corporation, Diligent Boardbooks Limited..(Ishmael, Safraz)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Safraz Ishmael,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Tue 03/11 2:33 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 11 MOTION for Safraz Ishmael to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30748046. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
10 10 service Summons Issued Mon 03/03 10:34 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew Harker-Rigal. (vf)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued Mon 03/03 10:32 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kuberno US Inc.. (vf)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Mon 03/03 10:31 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kuberno Limited. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 03/03 9:29 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Marc Evan Miller. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Andrew Harker-Rigal. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 03/03 10:00 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 03/03 10:01 AM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 03/03 10:01 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/28 5:57 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc Evan Miller on behalf of Diligent Corporation, Diligent Boardbooks Limited..(Miller, Marc)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/28 5:55 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Diligent Luxembourg for Diligent Boardbooks Limited; Corporate Parent Diamond Parent Holdings, Corp. for Diligent Corporation. Document filed by Diligent Corporation, Diligent Boardbooks Limited..(Miller, Marc)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 02/28 5:50 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew Harker-Rigal, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Diligent Corporation, Diligent Boardbooks Limited..(Miller, Marc)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 02/28 5:48 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kuberno US Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Diligent Corporation, Diligent Boardbooks Limited..(Miller, Marc)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 02/28 5:39 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kuberno Limited, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Diligent Corporation, Diligent Boardbooks Limited..(Miller, Marc)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 02/28 5:29 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Miller, Marc)
Related: [-]
1 1 25 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/28 5:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Andrew Harker-Rigal, Kuberno Limited, Kuberno US Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30696560)Document filed by Diligent Corporation, Diligent Boardbooks Limited..(Miller, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Kuberno Website Printout,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Diligent Website Printout