Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean D Jordan
Case #: 4:25-cv-00207
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 3:40 AM CDT
Defendant
Kyle Hall
1801 Chuckwagon Drive
Midlothian, TX 76065
Defendant
Texas Star Recognition
Plaintiff
Jostens Inc.
Represented By
Edward Michael Rodriguez
Atlas Hall & Rodriguez LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 39 minutes ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
12 12 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Mon 04/21 4:57 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document - PROPOSED ORDER:11 MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment . Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction . (Rodriguez, Edward)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Entry of Default Mon 04/21 4:52 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment by Jostens Inc..(Rodriguez, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Monday, March 17, 2025
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/17 4:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jostens Inc.. Texas Star Recognition served on 3/15/2025. (Rodriguez, Edward)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/17 4:35 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jostens Inc.. Kyle Hall served on 3/15/2025. (Rodriguez, Edward)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued Wed 03/12 4:48 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Kyle Hall, Texas Star Recognition.(CLC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons - TX Star Recognition
7 7 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Wed 03/12 11:11 AM
Additional Attachments to Main Document:1 Complaint. SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION - TEXAS STAR RECOGNITION, LLC . (Rodriguez, Edward)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Wed 03/12 11:01 AM
Additional Attachments to Main Document:1 Complaint. SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION - KYLE HALL . (Rodriguez, Edward)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
5 5 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Tue 03/04 9:14 AM
Additional Attachments to Main Document:3 MOTION PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF . ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION . (Rodriguez, Edward)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
4 4 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Mon 03/03 4:00 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document:1 Complaint. CIVIL COVER SHEET . (Rodriguez, Edward)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Mon 03/03 8:21 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (CLC)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
3 3 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 02/28 5:28 PM
MOTION PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by Jostens Inc..(Rodriguez, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit/Declaration Sonia Reyes
2 2 misc Sealed Document Fri 02/28 5:22 PM
Sealed Document.(Rodriguez, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/28 5:14 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10703229.), filed by Jostens Inc..(Rodriguez, Edward)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/03 8:20 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (CLC)
Related: [-]