Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Reed C O'Connor
Case #: 4:25-cv-00194
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 5:55 AM CDT
Defendant
James River Insurance Company
Plaintiff
The American Guarantee Insurance Company
Represented By
Jennifer L Kelley
Cox PLLC
contact info
Lindsey Nicole Hardy
Cox PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
6 6 answer Answer to Counterclaim Fri 05/09 12:22 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by The American Guarantee Insurance Company. Related document:4 Answer to Complaint,,,, Counterclaim,,, Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Hardy, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
5 5 motion Dismiss Thu 05/08 5:46 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by The American Guarantee Insurance Company (Hardy, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 18, 2025
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 04/18 3:58 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint filed by James River Insurance Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice., COUNTERCLAIM against The American Guarantee Insurance Company filed by James River Insurance CompanyAttorney Christopher Kipper Lee Burke added to party James River Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Burke, Christopher Kipper)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 03/03 11:48 AM
Summons Issued as to James River Insurance Company. (saw)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
2 2 qcref O' Connor (FORT WORTH CASES) Mon 03/03 11:47 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (saw)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/28 4:56 PM
COMPLAINT against James River Insurance Company filed by The American Guarantee Insurance Company, Individually and As Subrogee of City Gate Property Group, LLC. (Filer fee note- Clerk to add prior fee payment info here.) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Hardy, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) JS-44