California Central District Court
Judge:Otis D Wright, II
Referred: Alicia G Rosenberg
Case #: 2:25-cv-01775
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2025
Terminated:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 3:01 AM PDT
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc
Plaintiff
Jacob Cohen
Represented By
George Thomas Martin, III
Martin And Bontrager Apc
contact info
Nicholas J Bontrager
Martin And Bontrager Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
13 13 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 04/01 2:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Pursuant to Plaintiffs Notice of Voluntary Dismissal12 , and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The entire action and all claims asserted therein are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and 2. All dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED and taken off calendar. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
12 12 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Mon 03/31 1:22 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Jacob Cohen. (Martin, George)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
11 11 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 03/28 11:23 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Plaintiff(s) is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing no later than March 31, 2025 why this action shouldnot be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Plaintiff's request for entry of default as to the defendant or Answer by the defendant(s) In the event both documents are filed before the above date, the answer will take precedence. Failure to respond to the Court's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. (lc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 03/14 2:48 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jacob Cohen, upon Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc served on 3/5/2025, answer due 3/26/2025. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Martin, George)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
9 9 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Tue 03/04 1:09 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. EFFECTIVE IMMEDIATELY- No mandatory chambers copies required, EXCEPT FOR Motions for summary judgment and any other evidence-heavy motions. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/03 1:11 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 03/03 1:08 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 03/03 1:07 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 03/03 1:07 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 02/28 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties (Martin, George)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 02/28 3:57 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jacob Cohen. (Martin, George)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Fri 02/28 3:56 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Jacob Cohen. (Martin, George)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 02/28 3:56 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39205031 - Fee: $405. (Attorney George Thomas Martin, III added to party Jacob Cohen(pty:pla))(Martin, George)
Related: [-]