Utah District Court
Judge:Ann Marie Mciff Allen
Referred: Dustin B Pead
Case #: 1:25-cv-00026
Nature of Suit540 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Mandamus & Other
Cause28:1651 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2025
Defendant
Dale Hitesman
Defendant
J. Cole
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
Rob Copeland
Defendant
Skylar Crockett
Defendant
Tec Management
Defendant
Tyler J. Jensen
Defendant
Tyrin Crockett
Defendant
Unknown Officer
Plaintiff
Julie Lynn Seppich
Respondent
Jason Nelson

GPO Mar 17 2025
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 6 Motion to Confirm Federal Jurisdiction and Establish the Inapplicablility of Procedural Defenses; denying 7 Motion for Hearing; denying 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 15 Motion for Service of Process; denying 16 Motion for Sanctions; denying 19 Motion Supplemental in Support of Judicial Clarification and Request for Injunctive Relief; denying 21 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 22 Motion to Compel; denying 23 Amended Motion to Disqualify Defense Counsel Due to Conflict of Interest, Requet for Ethical Review, and Motion for Immediate Monetary Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/17/2025. (jwt)

Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, March 24, 2025
29 29 utility Lodged Document Mon 03/24 9:06 AM
DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of "Motion for Alternate Service and Notice of Indigence". Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (alf)
Related: [-]
28 28 utility Lodged Document Mon 03/24 9:05 AM
DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of "Emergency Motion to Stay Court Proceedings and to Declare Void all State Court Orders issued Post-Removal". Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (alf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
27 27 utility Lodged Document Thu 03/20 9:31 AM
DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Notice of Removal to Federal Court and Motion to Stay Proceedings filed in the Second Judicial District Court.. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (alf)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
26 26 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for Hearing Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion for Service of Process Order on Motion for Sanctions Order on Motion to Compel Mon 03/17 4:29 PM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 6 Motion to Confirm Federal Jurisdiction and Establish the Inapplicablility of Procedural Defenses; denying 7 Motion for Hearing; denying 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 15 Motion for Service of Process; denying 16 Motion for Sanctions; denying 19 Motion Supplemental in Support of Judicial Clarification and Request for Injunctive Relief; denying 21 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 22 Motion to Compel; denying 23 Amended Motion to Disqualify Defense Counsel Due to Conflict of Interest, Requet for Ethical Review, and Motion for Immediate Monetary Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/17/2025. (jwt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
25 25 3 pgs respoth Memorandum (NOT to motion) Wed 03/12 9:19 AM
Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Expedited Jurisdictional Determination and Procedural Preemption. Filed by Julie Lynn Seppich. (mh)
Related: [-]
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 03/11 12:55 PM
ORDER temporarily granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The court will screen the complaint and Plaintiff may not file any motions or other documents while the case is screened or until the court orders otherwise. The time to serve the complaint is tolled until further order of the court. If the action is allowed to proceed, the court will enter an order authorizing service of process on the defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/11/2025. (kec)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 03/11 9:07 AM
Plaintiff's AMENDED MOTION to Disqualify Defense Counsel Due to Conflict of Interest, Request for Ethical Review, and Motion for Immediate Monetary Sanctions and Memorandum in Support. Filed by Plaintiff Julie Lynn Seppich. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(mh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
22 22 motion Compel Tue 03/11 9:04 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Discovery and Request for Sanctions Due to Evidence of Collusion Between Tec Management and Ogden Police Department. Filed by Plaintiff Julie Lynn Seppich. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(mh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
21 21 motion Preliminary Injunction Tue 03/11 8:50 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Enjoin State Court Proceedings. Filed by Plaintiff Julie Lynn Seppich. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(mh)
Related: [-]
20 20 4 pgs respoth Memorandum (NOT to motion) Tue 03/11 8:49 AM
Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Support of Expedited Jurisdictional Determination and Procedural Preemption. Filed by Julie Lynn Seppich. (mh)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 03/11 8:10 AM
Amended Plaintiff's Supplemental MOTION in Support of Judicial Clarification and Request for Injunctive Relief. Filed by Plaintiff Julie Lynn Seppich. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(mh)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 03/10 3:38 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate Judge to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Signed by District Judge Ann Marie McIff Allen on 3/10/2025. (pjd)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/10 11:34 AM
Plaintiff's Supplemental MOTION in Support of Judicial Clarification and Request for Injunctive Relief. Filed by Plaintiff Julie Lynn Seppich. (mh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
16 16 motion Sanctions Fri 03/07 9:23 AM
MOTION for Emergency Relief and Sanctions Due to Intentional Delay Tactics by Defendant's Counsel. Filed by Plaintiff Julie Lynn Seppich.(mh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
15 15 motion Service of Process Fri 03/07 9:18 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Service of Process by U.S. Marshals. Summons to be served on: Tec Managment, Dale Hitesman, Ogden Police Department, Rob Copeland and Tyler J. Jensen. Filed by Plaintiff Julie Lynn Seppich.(mh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons for Tec Management,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons for Dale Hitesman,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons for Ogden Police Department,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons for Rob Copeland,
Att: 5 Proposed Summons for Tyler J. Jensen
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 03/07 9:08 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tec Management, Rob Copeland, Dale Hitesman, Tyler J. Jensen, Skylar Crockett, Tyrin Crockett, John Doe (Head of Maintenance), J. Cole (Officer), Ogden Police Department (Unknown Officer) with Jury Demand. Jason Nelson (in his offical capacity as a Judge of the Second Judicial District Court of Utah) terminated per amended complaint. Filed by Julie Lynn Seppich. (mh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
13 13 respoth Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition (NOT to motion) Tue 03/04 4:25 PM
Plaintiff's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Stay All Responses, Limit Filings, And For a Scheduling Conference filed by Julie Lynn Seppich. (mh)
Related: [-]
12 12 3 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Tue 03/04 3:53 PM
ORDER denying 3 Motion for TRO. Her other requests for relief remain pending. The Court directs Petitioner to properly serve the opposing parties with summonses in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, along with copies of all her filings. Once service has been accomplished on the opposing parties, Petitioner may request a date for a hearing to determine status and set a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Ann Marie McIff Allen on 3/4/2025. (mh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/03 2:52 PM
Plaintiff's NOTICE of Multi-Agency Involvement and Referrals to Government Authorities by Julie Lynn Seppich. (mh)
Related: [-]
10 10 4 pgs respoth Memorandum (NOT to motion) Mon 03/03 9:35 AM
Plaintiff's Preemptive MEMORANDUM Addressing Anticipated Defenses, Procedural Objections, and Potential Claims of Vexatious Litigation filed by Julie Lynn Seppich. (mh)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 02, 2025
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/03 9:32 AM
Plaintiff's NOTICE of Material Events and Procedural Chronology by Julie Lynn Seppich (mh)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Preliminary Injunction Mon 03/03 9:30 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Emergency Relief filed by Petitioner Julie Lynn Seppich. (mh)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Hearing Mon 03/03 9:29 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Expedited Hearing filed by Petitioner Julie Lynn Seppich.(mh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
6 6 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/03 9:27 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Confirm Federal Jurisdiction and Establish the Inapplicablility of Procedural Defenses and Memorandum in Support filed by Petitioner Julie Lynn Seppich.(mh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
Saturday, March 01, 2025
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/03 9:24 AM
Plaintiff's NOTICE of to The Court Regarding Communication to Tec Management Regarding Unlawful Property Handling by Julie Lynn Seppich. (mh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, February 28, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Email Filing and Notification Form Fri 02/28 2:59 PM
NOTICE of Email Filing and Notification Form by Julie Lynn Seppich (kec)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Temporary Restraining Order Fri 02/28 2:58 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Petitioner Julie Lynn Seppich.(kec)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Certificate of Service
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 02/28 2:57 PM
**SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. Related [+] filed by Petitioner Julie Lynn Seppich. (kec)
Related: [-] ceived by the court on: 2/28/2025
1 1 cmp Complaint (Court) Fri 02/28 2:52 PM
PETITION for Emergency Writ of Mandamus against Jason Nelson (Originally received by the court on 2/28/2025). (Fee Status: In Forma Pauperis) filed by Julie Lynn Seppich. Assigned to District Judge Ann Marie McIff Allen (kec) Modified on 2/28/2025 (kec)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Supplement