Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Aileen M Cannon
Case #: 9:25-cv-80292
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 5:08 AM EDT
Defendant
Service Finance Company, LLC
Represented By
Nicholas Steven Agnello
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
David Alan Elliott
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Valentino Amaro
Represented By
Alexander James Adducci Taylor
Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Tue 05/13 1:03 PM
ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 5/27/2025. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 5/12/2025. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/09 3:10 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Service Finance Company, LLC. (Elliott, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 04/30 9:19 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting11 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint1 . On or before May 12, 2025 , Defendant shall file an answer or responsive motion to Plaintiff's Complaint1 . No further extensions of this deadline will be granted . Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 4/30/2025. (bbk)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline Fri 05/02 12:59 PM
Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline per DE 12 Order. Service Finance Company, LLC response/answer due 5/12/2025. (amb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 04/23 12:17 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by Service Finance Company, LLC. (Agnello, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 03/25 7:28 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting9 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to1 Plaintiff's Complaint. On or before April 28, 2025 , Defendant shall file an answer or responsive motion to Plaintiff's Complaint1 . Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/25/2025. (bbk)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline Wed 03/26 4:15 PM
Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline per DE 10 Order. Service Finance Company, LLC response/answer due 4/28/2025. (amb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 03/24 11:03 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by Service Finance Company, LLC. (Agnello, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
8 8 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 03/13 11:21 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Valentino Amaro. Service Finance Company, LLC served on 3/7/2025, response/answer due 3/28/2025. (Taylor, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 03/05 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Alan Elliott on behalf of Service Finance Company, LLC. Attorney David Alan Elliott added to party Service Finance Company, LLC(pty:dft). (Elliott, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
6 6 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/04 4:27 PM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Service Finance Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Truist Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Truist Bank, Corporate Parent Service Finance Holdings, LLC for Service Finance Company, LLC (Agnello, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 03/04 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Steven Agnello on behalf of Service Finance Company, LLC. Attorney Nicholas Steven Agnello added to party Service Finance Company, LLC(pty:dft). (Agnello, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
4 4 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 03/03 6:26 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES ON SEALING/REDACTION: Notwithstanding the requirements of Local Rule 5.4 and/or any protective order, the parties are prohibited from filing anything under seal or from redacting any content from a court filing or exhibit/attachment (except for the personal data identifiers listed in Section 6A of this District's CM/ECF Administrative Procedures) unless the party with a stated interest in sealing/redaction first seeks and obtains permission from the Court via a motion for leave. The motion for leave must be filed after meaningful conferral with the opposing party (or parties) and be filed publicly except as authorized by prior Court order. Additionally, the motion for leave shall specify the particularized basis for sealing the proposed material; shall describe the information/documents to be sealed with as much specificity as possible but without attaching the proposed sealed material; shall indicate the proposed duration of the seal request and the reasons why means other than sealing are unavailable or unsatisfactory; shall contain a separate certificate of conference section indicating the results of the parties' meaningful conferral; and shall be filed at last three business days before any related deadline to permit adequate Court consideration. The party seeking authorization to seal material shall not file or otherwise attach the subject material until the Court has ruled on the motion for leave. Finally, all parties are advised that mere designation of material as confidential and/or otherwise subject to a protective order does not bind the Court, does not supplant the requirements of the Local Rules on sealing, and does not otherwise relieve the party seeking sealing/redaction from justifying its request under applicable legal principals governing the presumption of public access to civil proceedings. Failure to comply with this Notice may result in immediate unsealing of any unauthorized shielded material. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/3/2025. (bbk)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 03/03 8:41 AM
Summons Issued as to Service Finance Company, LLC. (cwc)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 03/03 8:38 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cwc)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/28 6:30 PM
COMPLAINT against Service Finance Company, LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18246679, filed by Valentino Amaro.(Taylor, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons