New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Lashann Dearcy Hall
Referred: Lara K Eshkenazi
Case #: 1:25-cv-01169
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1201 Civil Rights (Disability)
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 4:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Brandon Conovitz
Defendant
Katie Conovitz
Defendant
Allison Somerset
Defendant
Twelve Inc.
Plaintiff
Elina Garcia
Represented By
Dorina Cela
Phillips & Associates, PLLC
contact info
Kayla Wheeler
Phillips & Associates, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 18 minutes ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 05/09 9:19 AM
ORDER granting25 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 6/3/2025 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi on 5/9/2025. (DL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/08 8:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Brian Lichtenberg on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Lichtenberg, David)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 05/08 8:51 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Brandon Conovitz, Katie Conovitz, Allison Somerset, Twelve Inc.. (Canning, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Stipulation Extending Time to Answer
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/08 8:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Canning on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Canning, Amy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/06 2:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Brian Lichtenberg on behalf of Twelve Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Lichtenberg, David)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/06 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Canning on behalf of Twelve Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Canning, Amy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
21 21 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 04/01 11:05 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Elina Garcia. Allison Somerset waiver sent on 3/26/2025, answer due 5/26/2025. (Cela, Dorina)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 04/01 11:03 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Elina Garcia. Brandon Conovitz waiver sent on 3/26/2025, answer due 5/26/2025. (Cela, Dorina)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 04/01 11:01 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Elina Garcia. Katie Conovitz waiver sent on 3/26/2025, answer due 5/26/2025. (Cela, Dorina)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 04/01 10:59 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Elina Garcia. Twelve Inc. waiver sent on 3/26/2025, answer due 5/26/2025. (Cela, Dorina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
17 17 3 pgs service Summons Issued Thu 03/20 3:37 PM
Summons Issued as to Brandon Conovitz, Katie Conovitz, Allison Somerset, Twelve Inc.. (MLR)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 03/20 12:19 PM
Proposed Summons. by Elina Garcia (Cela, Dorina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
15 15 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 03/04 4:57 PM
Proposed Summons. by Elina Garcia (Cela, Dorina)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 03/04 3:37 PM
Proposed Summons. by Elina Garcia (Cela, Dorina)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 03/04 3:35 PM
Proposed Summons. by Elina Garcia (Cela, Dorina)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 03/04 3:34 PM
Proposed Summons. by Elina Garcia (Cela, Dorina)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 03/04 3:33 PM
Proposed Summons. by Elina Garcia (Cela, Dorina)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 03/04 2:28 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Tue 03/04 2:27 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (SDM)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 03/04 2:19 PM
Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SDM)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Tue 03/04 2:26 PM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: If multiple defendants, there must me a rider attached to the summons with the name and addresses of all defendants included., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (SDM)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Tue 03/04 4:48 PM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: . If multiple defendants, there must me a rider attached to the summons with the name and addresses of all defendants included. (Please do not file summons individually as to each party). Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. For further assistance please contact the court's Help Desk at 718-613-2610. (MLR)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
8 8 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 03/03 3:54 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Elina Garcia (Cela, Dorina)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/03 11:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kayla Wheeler on behalf of Elina Garcia (aty to be noticed) (Wheeler, Kayla)
Related: [-]
notice Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet Mon 03/03 11:44 AM
Notice: Requires Newly Updated Civil Cover Sheet. The Civil cover sheet has been updated and The Clerk's Office requires the updated version of the civil cover sheet to continue to process this case. The form is available at:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/forms/js44-civil-cover-sheet] . Please resubmit using new JS44 under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (CV)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
6 6 2 pgs misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 02/28 9:30 PM
Proposed Summons. by Elina Garcia (Cela, Dorina)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 02/28 9:28 PM
Proposed Summons. by Elina Garcia (Cela, Dorina)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 02/28 9:26 PM
Proposed Summons. by Elina Garcia (Cela, Dorina)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 02/28 9:23 PM
Proposed Summons. by Elina Garcia (Cela, Dorina)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 02/28 9:20 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Elina Garcia (Cela, Dorina)
Related: [-]
1 1 41 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/28 9:10 PM
COMPLAINT against Brandon Conovitz, Katie Conovitz, Allison Somerset, Twelve Inc. d/b/a TwelveNYC filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18811770 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Elina Garcia. (Cela, Dorina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue