District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Royce C Lamberth
Case #: 1:25-cv-00603
Nature of Suit151 Contract - Medicare Act
Cause42:1395 HHS: Adverse Reimbursement Review
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 4:50 AM EDT
Defendant
ROBERT F. KENNEDY, JR.
Plaintiff
MIAMI COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By
Mark D. Polston
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
OLATHE MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By
Mark D. Polston
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
UKHS GREAT BEND, LLC
Represented By
Mark D. Polston
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY
Represented By
Mark D. Polston
King & Spalding LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 03, 2025
4 4 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Mon 03/03 10:05 AM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ROBERT F. KENNEDY, JR., U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/03 10:03 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Related Case Fri 02/28 9:02 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, MIAMI COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, INC., OLATHE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., UKHS GREAT BEND, LLC. Case related to Case No. 23-1594 (Polston, Mark)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Fri 02/28 9:01 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, MIAMI COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, INC., OLATHE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., UKHS GREAT BEND, LLC (Polston, Mark)
Related: [-]
1 1 27 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/28 8:59 PM
COMPLAINT against ROBERT F. KENNEDY, JR. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11512511) filed by UKHS GREAT BEND, LLC, UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, OLATHE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., MIAMI COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, INC..(Polston, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons,
Att: 8 Summons