Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Claude M Hilton
Referred: William E Fitzpatrick
Case #: 1:25-cv-00370
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 7:22 AM EDT
Defendant
Search
Represented By
Jeffrey R. B. Notz
Prince William County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Jane Doe 4
Defendant
Kushner
Represented By
Jeffrey R. B. Notz
Prince William County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Porcaro
Represented By
Jeffrey R. B. Notz
Prince William County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Prince William County Police Department
Represented By
Jeffrey R. B. Notz
Prince William County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Queen
Represented By
Jeffrey R. B. Notz
Prince William County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Richards
Represented By
Jeffrey R. B. Notz
Prince William County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Rostami
Represented By
Jeffrey R. B. Notz
Prince William County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Schenck
Represented By
Jeffrey R. B. Notz
Prince William County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Jane Doe 3
Defendant
Sibley
Represented By
Jeffrey R. B. Notz
Prince William County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Solenberger
Represented By
Jeffrey R. B. Notz
Prince William County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Oscar F. Sugastti
Represented By
Frances Miller
Mitchell & Simopoulos, PLLC
contact info
Byron James Mitchell
Mitchell & Simopoulos, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Sullivan
Represented By
Jeffrey R. B. Notz
Prince William County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Szalach
Represented By
Jeffrey R. B. Notz
Prince William County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Villalobos Reyes
Represented By
Jeffrey R. B. Notz
Prince William County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Walsh
Represented By
Jeffrey R. B. Notz
Prince William County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Williams
Represented By
Jeffrey R. B. Notz
Prince William County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Jane Doe 2
Defendant
AAA Pediatrics
Represented By
Frances Miller
Mitchell & Simopoulos, PLLC
contact info
Byron James Mitchell
Mitchell & Simopoulos, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Agyare
Represented By
Jeffrey R. B. Notz
Prince William County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Carpio
Represented By
Jeffrey R. B. Notz
Prince William County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Centifonti
Represented By
Jeffrey R. B. Notz
Prince William County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Chance
Represented By
Jeffrey R. B. Notz
Prince William County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Cordner
Represented By
Jeffrey R. B. Notz
Prince William County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Crawford
Represented By
Jeffrey R. B. Notz
Prince William County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Dobson
Represented By
Jeffrey R. B. Notz
Prince William County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Elahi
Represented By
Jeffrey R. B. Notz
Prince William County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Fontenot
Represented By
Jeffrey R. B. Notz
Prince William County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Gonzalez Tirado
Represented By
Jeffrey R. B. Notz
Prince William County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Gourlay
Represented By
Jeffrey R. B. Notz
Prince William County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Huber
Represented By
Jeffrey R. B. Notz
Prince William County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Hume
Represented By
Jeffrey R. B. Notz
Prince William County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Jane Doe 1
Plaintiff
Foday Tholley
13198 Centerpoint Way Suite 201
Woodbridge, VA 22193


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
utility Remark Thu 05/01 7:25 AM
Remark - ***Deadlines terminated - Motion Hearing set for 5/02/25 will be decided on the papers; no oral argument will be heard. (Per CMH Chambers) (yguy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
29 29 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 04/22 2:15 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AAA Pediatrics, Oscar F. Sugastti. (Miller, Frances)
Related: [-]
28 28 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 04/22 11:09 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Insufficient Service Process filed by Agyare, Carpio, Centifonti, Chance, Cordner, Crawford, Dobson, Elahi, Fontenot, Gonzalez Tirado, Gourlay, Huber, Hume, Kushner, Porcaro, Prince William County Police Department, Queen, Richards, Rostami, Schenck, Search, Sibley, Solenberger, Sullivan, Szalach, Villalobos Reyes, Walsh, Williams. (Notz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
27 27 16 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Thu 04/17 3:00 PM
Memorandum in Support re16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AAA Pediatrics, Oscar F. Sugastti. (Miller, Frances)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
26 26 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 04/16 3:44 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Foday Tholley. (swil)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 04/16 3:42 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Insufficient Service Process filed by Foday Tholley. (swil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 04/03 1:07 PM
ORDERED that the Motion for Extension of Time (Dkt. 20) is GRANTED IN PART. Defendants AAA Pediatrics and Oscar F. Sugastti M.D. shall have up to and including April 18, 2025 to file a brief in support of their previously filed Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 4/2/2025. (swil)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order Mon 03/31 1:07 PM
ORDERED that Plaintiff is hereby NOTIFIED that an opposing party has filed a motion to dismiss that, if granted, could result in the dismissal of some or all of Plaintiff's claims. Plaintiff is ADVISED that Plaintiff is entitled to file a response opposing the motion within twenty-one (21) days of the entry date of this Notice. Plaintiff is FURTHER ADVISED that the Court could dismiss some or all of Plaintiff's claims on the basis of the moving partys papers if Plaintiff does not file a response. If Plaintiff submits a response, Defendant(s) may file a reply within six (6) days after the service of Plaintiffs response. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 3/31/2025. (swil)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/31 11:37 AM
Set Deadline as to16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2025 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (triv)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
22 22 misc Waiver of Fri 03/28 1:15 PM
Waiver of re20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File ,21 Memorandum in Support by AAA Pediatrics, Oscar F. Sugastti (Miller, Frances)
Related: [-]
21 21 5 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Fri 03/28 1:12 PM
Memorandum in Support re16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by AAA Pediatrics, Oscar F. Sugastti. (Miller, Frances)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Extension of Fri 03/28 1:10 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File by AAA Pediatrics, Oscar F. Sugastti. (Miller, Frances)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Notice of Hearing Date Fri 03/28 10:39 AM
Notice of Hearing Date re16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Miller, Frances)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Correction Fri 03/28 9:55 AM
Notice of Correction re16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing or Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument (swil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/27 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Byron James Mitchell on behalf of AAA Pediatrics, Oscar F. Sugastti (Mitchell, Byron)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Thu 03/27 2:50 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by AAA Pediatrics, Oscar F. Sugastti. (Mitchell, Byron)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 03/27 2:48 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by AAA Pediatrics, Oscar F. Sugastti. (Mitchell, Byron)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/27 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Byron James Mitchell on behalf of AAA Pediatrics, Oscar F. Sugastti (Mitchell, Byron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order Wed 03/26 11:06 AM
ORDERED that Plaintiff is hereby NOTIFIED that an opposing party has filed a motion to dismiss that, if granted, could result in the dismissal of some or all of Plaintiff's claims. Plaintiff is ADVISED that Plaintiff is entitled to file a response opposing the motion within twenty-one (21) days of the entry date of this Notice. Plaintiff is FURTHER ADVISED that the Court could dismiss some or all of Plaintiffs claims on the basis of the moving party's papers if Plaintiff does not file a response. If Plaintiff submits a response, Defendant(s) may file a reply within six (6) days after the service of Plaintiff's response (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 3/26/2025. (swil)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Notice of Hearing Date Wed 03/26 8:32 AM
Notice of Hearing Date AMENDED set for May 2, 2025 re10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Insufficient Service Process (Notz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 03/26 10:38 AM
Set Deadline as to10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Insufficient Service Process . Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2025 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (triv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
12 12 misc Notice of Hearing Date Tue 03/25 5:21 PM
Notice of Hearing Date April 2, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. re10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Insufficient Service Process (Notz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
11 11 respoth Brief in Support Tue 03/25 5:19 PM
Brief in Support to10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Insufficient Service Process filed by Agyare, Carpio, Centifonti, Chance, Cordner, Crawford, Dobson, Elahi, Fontenot, Gonzalez Tirado, Gourlay, Huber, Hume, Kushner, Porcaro, Prince William County Police Department, Queen, Richards, Rostami, Schenck, Search, Sibley, Solenberger, Sullivan, Szalach, Villalobos Reyes, Walsh, Williams. (Notz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 03/25 5:17 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Insufficient Service Process by Agyare, Carpio, Centifonti, Chance, Cordner, Crawford, Dobson, Elahi, Fontenot, Gonzalez Tirado, Gourlay, Huber, Hume, Kushner, Porcaro, Prince William County Police Department, Queen, Richards, Rostami, Schenck, Search, Sibley, Solenberger, Sullivan, Szalach, Villalobos Reyes, Walsh, Williams. (Notz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Se E-Noticing Fri 03/21 1:21 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Pro Se E-Noticing. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 3/21/2025. (swil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
8 8 motion Pro Se E-Noticing Thu 03/20 2:34 PM
MOTION for Pro Se E-Noticing by Foday Tholley. (swil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/13 3:56 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed AAA Pediatrics served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025; Agyare served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025; Carpio served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025; Centifonti served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025; Chance served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025; Cordner served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025; Crawford served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025; Dobson served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025; Elahi served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025; Fontenot served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025; Gonzalez Tirado served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025; Gourlay served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025; Huber served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025; Hume served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025; Kushner served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025; Porcaro served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025; Prince William County Police Department served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025; Queen served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025; Richards served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025; Rostami served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025; Schenck served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025; Search served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025; Sibley served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025; Solenberger served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025; Oscar F. Sugastti served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025; Sullivan served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025; Szalach served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025; Villalobos Reyes served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025; Walsh served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025; Williams served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025 (swil)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
6 6 misc Docket Annotation Mon 03/03 1:38 PM
Submission to the Court in re1 Complaint by Foday Tholley. (swil)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 03/03 9:15 AM
Summons Issued to be served by USMS as to AAA Pediatrics, Agyare, Carpio, Centifonti, Chance, Cordner, Crawford, Dobson, Elahi, Fontenot, Gonzalez Tirado, Gourlay, Huber, Hume, Kushner, Porcaro, Prince William County Police Department, Queen, Richards, Rostami, Schenck, Search, Sibley, Solenberger, Oscar F. Sugastti, Sullivan, Szalach, Villalobos Reyes, Walsh, Williams,(swil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 US Marshal Form,
Att: 2 Summons Notice
4 4 order Sealed Order Fri 02/28 1:21 PM
Under Seal ORDER granting2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 2/28/2025. (swil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Fri 02/28 9:31 AM
Proposed Summons by Foday Tholley. (swil)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 02/28 9:30 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Foday Tholley. (swil)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/28 9:29 AM
COMPLAINT against AAA Pediatrics, Agyare, Carpio, Centifonti, Chance, Cordner, Crawford, Dobson, Elahi, Fontenot, Gonzalez Tirado, Gourlay, Huber, Hume, Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Kushner, Porcaro, Prince William County Police Department, Queen, Richards, Rostami, Schenck, Search, Sibley, Solenberger, Oscar F. Sugastti, Sullivan, Szalach, Villalobos Reyes, Walsh, Williams, filed by Foday Tholley.(swil)
Related: [-]