Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:John A Gibney, Jr
Case #: 3:25-cv-00150
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Right Denial of Due Process
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2025
Terminated:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 8:17 AM EDT
Defendant
Peter Vance Bishop
Defendant
Commonwealth of Virginia
Defendant
Joshua P. Deford
Defendant
Breckenridge Ingles
Defendant
Jeffrey W. Shaw
Defendant
Virginia Supreme Court
Plaintiff
Jennifer-Nayomia Bishop
Trustee, authorized representative and 1st Lein Holder of Jennifer Nayomia Bishop Trust 134 River Rd
Hartfield, VA 23071


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 03/26 2:26 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Peter Vance Bishop, Commonwealth of Virginia, Joshua P. Deford, Breckenridge Ingles, Jeffrey W. Shaw, and Virginia Supreme Court, filed by Jennifer-Nayomia Bishop.(Kski, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Rule 83.1
3 3 cmp Complaint Wed 03/26 2:25 PM
COMPLAINT against Peter Vance Bishop, Commonwealth of Virginia, Joshua P. Deford, Breckenridge Ingles, Jeffrey W. Shaw, and Virginia Supreme Court, filed by Jennifer-Nayomia Bishop.(Kski, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Rule 83.1
2 2 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 03/26 2:19 PM
FINAL ORDER - The Court GRANTS Bishop's motion and DIRECTS the Clerk to docket the complaint and amended complaint. Because Bishop filed an amended complaint four days after filing her initial complaint and before the Court ruled on the motion for IFP, (ECF No.1 - 5 ), the Court will consider the amended complaint the operative complaint in this matter. Upon review of Bishop's amended complaint, however, the Court must dismiss this case for failure to state a claim. For the foregoing reasons, the Court DISMISSES Bishop's Tucker Act Claims against all defendants and § 1983 claims against the Commonwealth of Virginia, the Supreme Court of Virginia, Judge Shaw, and Judge DeFord WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court DISMISSES Bishop's § 1983 claims against Breckenridge Ingles and Peter Bishop and her APA claims against all defendants WITH PREJUDICE. The Court DECLINES to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Bishop's remaining state law claims and DISMISSES those claims WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court does not grant leave to amend, rendering this order final and appealable. Should the plaintiff wish to appeal this Final Order, she must file a written notice of appeal with the Clerk of Court within thirty (30) days of the date of entry hereof. Failure to file a notice of appeal within that period may result in the loss of the right to appeal. It is so ORDERED. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 03/26/2025. Copy of Final Order mailed to plaintiff. (Kski, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 02/28 11:02 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jennifer-Nayomia Bishop.(jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Local Rule 83.1(N) Certification