Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:Jerry Edwards, Jr
Referred: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Case #: 1:25-cv-00262
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 3:33 AM CDT
Defendant
Board of Supervisors for the University of Louisiana System
thru Dawn Wilson-Muscarello 150 Third St
Baton Rouge, LA 70801
Defendant
James T Genovese
Plaintiff
Christine Dorribo
Represented By
James Dalton Courson
Disability Rights Louisiana
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 03/25 2:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christine Dorribo. James T Genovese served on 3/17/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. (aty,Courson, James)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 03/25 2:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christine Dorribo. Board of Supervisors for the University of Louisiana System served on 3/18/2025, answer due 4/8/2025. (aty,Courson, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
3 3 order Jurisdictional Review Finding Thu 03/06 3:30 PM
ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 3/6/2025. (crt,Tice, Y)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued - All (Form Included) Mon 03/03 1:35 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Board of Supervisors for the University of Louisiana System, James T Genovese. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/28 6:44 PM
COMPLAINT against Board of Supervisors for the University of Louisiana System, James T Genovese (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6204722) filed by Christine Dorribo.(Attorney James Dalton Courson added to party Christine Dorribo(pty:pla))(aty,Courson, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/03 1:34 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge Jerry Edwards, Jr and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]