California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 2:25-cv-01659
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2025
Terminated:Mar 04, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 3:55 AM PDT
Defendant
David Bermejo Correyero
732 South Spring Street, Unit 2819
Los Angeles, CA 90014
Plaintiff
IRP Grace Apartments, LLC
Represented By
Manisha Bajaj
Kimball Tirey And St John LLP
contact info
Chris J. Evans
Kimball Tirey And St. John LLP
contact info
Mackenzie Clara Gonzales
Kimball Tirey And St John LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
9 9 misc Receipt Tue 04/15 7:47 AM
Receipt of Order of Remand is acknowledged on 3/7/2025 (pj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
8 8 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Tue 03/04 10:14 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, No. 24STUD14617. (lc)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Tue 03/04 10:11 AM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (NON-PRISONER CASE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: As explained in the attached statement, the Request is DENIED because:2 The District Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction, removal jurisdiction. This case is REMANDED to state court as explained in the attached statement. Case remanded to Los Angeles County Superior Court, No. 24STUD14617. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (lc)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 02/28 8:13 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 02/28 8:13 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 02/28 8:12 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (et)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 02/28 8:08 AM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant David Bermejo Correyero. (et)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Fri 02/28 7:50 AM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Defendant David Bermejo Correyero. (et)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 02/28 7:48 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA for the County of Los Angeles, case number 24STUD14617 with CONFORMED E-FILED copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick., filed by Defendant David Bermejo Correyero.. (et)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet