California Central District Court
Judge:Stephen V Wilson
Referred: Stephanie S Christensen
Case #: 2:25-cv-01790
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 3:05 AM PDT
Defendant
Salesforce, Inc.
Represented By
Shawn Everett Hanson
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Beach District Surgery Center
Represented By
Jonathan Aaron Stieglitz
Law Offices Of Jonathan Stieglitz
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
21 21 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 04/09 9:40 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE-IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re:9 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant; and11 MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by plaintiff: The motions are submitted. Order to issue. The hearing scheduled for 04/14/2025 at 1:30 P.M. is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
20 20 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 04/08 1:24 PM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The courtesy copy requirement is suspended until further notice. All proceedings are held in person. Requests for remote appearances must be filed a week prior to the proceeding. Requests are made in a pleading format, with a declaration stating the good cause why the attorney cannot appear in-person. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
19 19 stip Continue Fri 04/04 7:59 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Motions to Remand and to Dismiss from April 14, 2025 to April 28, 2025 Re: Text Only Scheduling Notice, 17 filed by defendant Salesforce, Inc..(Hanson, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Shawn Hanson,
Att: 2 Declaration of Jonathan Stieglitz,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 03, 2025
18 18 order Transfer DECLINED-(related case)(CV-34) Thu 04/03 4:36 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. Related [+] filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:23-cv-06745 MEMF(PDx) (rn)
Related: [-] lated Case
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
17 17 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 04/02 2:19 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court11 - The motion set for hearing on 04/07/2025 at 1:30 P.M. has been rescheduled to 4/14/2025 at 01:30 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
16 16 respm Motion Related Document Thu 03/27 9:56 AM
DEFENDANT SALESFORCE, INC.S REQUEST FOR REMOTE APPEARANCE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court11 filed by Defendant Salesforce, Inc..(Hanson, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Shawn Hanson,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
15 15 respm Reply (Motion related) Thu 03/27 9:49 AM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 9 filed by Defendant Salesforce, Inc.. (Hanson, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
14 14 5 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Thu 03/20 2:55 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 9 filed by Plaintiff Beach District Surgery Center. (Stieglitz, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
13 13 respm Reply (Motion related) Thu 03/20 11:50 AM
REPLY support of motion to remand NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court11 filed by Plaintiff Beach District Surgery Center. (Stieglitz, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
12 12 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Mon 03/17 10:16 PM
Defendant's Opposition in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court11 filed by Defendant Salesforce, Inc.. (Hanson, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
11 11 motion Remand Case to State Court Mon 03/10 10:35 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by plaintiff Beach District Surgery Center. Motion set for hearing on 4/7/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Stieglitz, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, March 07, 2025
10 10 misc For Judicial Notice Fri 03/07 7:03 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 9 filed by Defendant Salesforce, Inc.. (Hanson, Shawn)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Dismiss Case Fri 03/07 7:01 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Salesforce, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/14/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Hanson, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Shawn Hanson,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12,
Att: 14 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 03/04 11:11 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 03/04 11:11 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 03/04 11:10 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. (lh)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 01, 2025
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Sat 03/01 12:13 AM
Notice OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTIONS OR PROCEEDINGS filed by Defendant Salesforce, Inc.. (Hanson, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 02/28 9:38 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Salesforce, Inc., identifying no other parties. (Hanson, Shawn)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Related Case(s) Fri 02/28 9:32 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) Salesforce, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:25-cv-01313-ODW-RAO, 2:25-cv-01394-AB-MAA, 2:23-cv-06745-MEMF-PD (Hanson, Shawn)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 02/28 9:28 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Salesforce, Inc.. (Hanson, Shawn)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 02/28 9:21 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 24STCV30838 Receipt No: ACACDC-39207912 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Salesforce, Inc.. (Attorney Shawn Everett Hanson added to party Salesforce, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hanson, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Brief
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 03/04 11:20 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Salesforce, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Beach District Surgery Center. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/21/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh)
Related: [-]