California Central District Court
Judge:Sheri Pym
Case #: 5:25-cv-00553
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 3:05 AM PDT
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By
Thomas P Quinn, Jr
Nokes And Quinn Apc
contact info
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Defendant
Hyundai Capital America
Represented By
Kathryn JoAnn Richards
Holland And Knight LLP
contact info
Defendant
TransUnion, LLC
Plaintiff
Marc Arthur Phanord
Represented By
Kyle Schumacher
Schumacher Lane PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
35 35 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 05/20 2:33 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kyle Schumacher counsel for Plaintiff Marc Arthur Phanord. Kyle Schumacher is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Marc Arthur Phanord. (Schumacher, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
34 34 order Extension of Time to Answer Mon 05/19 3:23 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS AND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT (L.R. 7-1) by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym.17 ,28 These motions and stipulation are GRANTED. Experian shall have up to and including May 23, 2025, to answer or otherwise response to Plaintiffs Complaint. (san)
Related: [-]
33 33 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Fri 05/16 9:48 AM
Text Only Entry re Order, Set/Reset Hearing25 . The hearing time is changed from 10:00 a.m. to 11:00 a.m. on Tuesday, May 20, 2025 by Zoom. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
32 32 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Tue 05/13 2:07 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-3 days, filed by Plaintiff Marc Arthur Phanord.. (Schumacher, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
31 31 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Fri 05/09 1:18 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer now due 5/23/2025, filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Abbott, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, May 02, 2025
30 30 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 05/02 12:22 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Hyundai Capital America.(Richards, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
29 29 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 04/29 5:02 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., identifying Experian plc; Central Source LLC; Online Data Exchange LLC; New Management Services LLC; VantageScore Solutions LLC; Opt-Out Services LLC. (Abbott, Thomas)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Extend Time to File Answer Tue 04/29 5:01 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 5/12/2025 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attorney Thomas N Abbott added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Abbott, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
27 27 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 04/22 10:15 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Quinn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Settlement Tue 04/22 8:03 AM
NOTICE of Settlement BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT TRANSUNION, LLC filed by Plaintiff Marc Arthur Phanord. (Schumacher, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
25 25 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 04/18 4:12 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. This matter is set for a scheduling conference on May 20, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (kca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
24 24 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 04/09 1:19 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Marc Arthur Phanord, re Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form8 served on March 4, 2025. (Schumacher, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
23 23 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Tue 04/08 4:30 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: Order Setting Deadline for Plaintiff to File Proof of Service of Notice of Assignment to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. Accordingly, the court now orders plaintiff to file, on or before April 15, 2025 (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (kca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
22 22 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 04/02 12:15 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Hyundai Capital America (Richards, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
21 21 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 04/02 12:09 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hyundai Capital America answer now due 5/2/2025, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Hyundai Capital America.(Attorney Kathryn JoAnn Richards added to party Hyundai Capital America(pty:dft))(Richards, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
20 20 textonly MJDAP Opt-Out Expired Fri 03/28 12:43 PM
The period to decline consent to a magistrate judge has expired. No timely declination of consent has been received by the Court. Each party is deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge for all purposes pursuant to the Local Rules. The case shall now proceed before a Magistrate Judge for all purposes. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
19 19 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 03/25 10:08 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC, identifying Equifax, Inc.. (Quinn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
18 18 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Tue 03/25 10:06 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Equifax Information Services, LLC answer now due 4/24/2025, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Attorney Thomas P Quinn, Jr added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Quinn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
17 17 motion Extend Time to File Answer Thu 03/20 9:17 AM
First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 4/28/2025 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Marc Arthur Phanord. (Schumacher, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
16 16 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 03/17 9:45 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marc Arthur Phanord, upon Defendant Hyundai Capital America served on 3/12/2025, answer due 4/2/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Montijo, designed to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Schumacher, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
15 15 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 03/10 12:38 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marc Arthur Phanord, upon Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Maddie Bright in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Schumacher, Kyle)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 03/10 12:36 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marc Arthur Phanord, upon Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon George Martinez in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Schumacher, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 03/05 6:22 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Marc Arthur Phanord. upon TransUnion, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/4/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. Waiver of Service signed by Charlotte Long. (Schumacher, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
12 12 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 03/04 10:11 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant TransUnion, LLC. (ghap)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 03/04 10:09 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Hyundai Capital America. (ghap)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 03/04 10:08 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (ghap)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 03/04 10:07 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (ghap)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form Tue 03/04 9:47 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
7 7 notice Summons Request Fri 02/28 6:44 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Hyundai Capital America. (Schumacher, Kyle)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Summons Request Fri 02/28 6:43 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff TransUnion, LLC. (Schumacher, Kyle)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Summons Request Fri 02/28 6:43 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Schumacher, Kyle)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Fri 02/28 6:42 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Marc Arthur Phanord. (Schumacher, Kyle)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 02/28 6:41 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Marc Arthur Phanord, identifying Marc A. Phanord; Schumacher Lane PLLC; Equifax Information Services, LLC; TransUnion, LLC; Experian Information Solutions, Inc.; and Hyundai Capital America. (Schumacher, Kyle)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 02/28 6:39 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Marc Arthur Phanord. (Schumacher, Kyle)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 02/28 6:38 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39207195 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Marc Arthur Phanord. (Attorney Kyle Schumacher added to party Marc Arthur Phanord(pty:pla))(Schumacher, Kyle)
Related: [-]