Original Case: 1:24-cv-00414

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01324
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 01, 2025 4:12 AM CST
Defendant - Appellee
COMMERCE AND INDUSTRY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
Richard A. Hodyl
HINKHOUSE WILLIAMS WALSH, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
TRI CITY FOODS, INC.
Represented By
Robert H. Muriel
WILLIAMS, BAX & SALTZMAN
contact info
Charles L. Philbrick
RATHJE WOODWARD LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/01/2025 4:11 AM CST
Thursday, February 27, 2025
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 03/13/2025. Appellant's brief due on or before 04/08/2025 for Tri City Foods, Inc. [1] [7437329] 25-1324 (PS) [Entered: 02/27/2025 11:33 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 41 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court
2 2 1 pgs Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Richard A. Hodyl for Appellee Commerce and Industry Insurance Company in 25-1324 Appellant Commerce and Industry Insurance Company in 25-1228 [2] [7437342] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) 25-1324 25-1228 (Hodyl, Richard) [Entered: 02/27/2025 12:02 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders these appeals are CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition. The briefing schedule is as follows: Main appeal brief due on or before 04/07/2025 for Commerce and Industry Insurance Company. Appellee Cross-Appellant brief due on or before 05/07/2025 for Tri City Foods, Inc. Appellant Reply Cross-Appellee brief due by 06/06/2025 for Appellant Commerce and Industry Insurance Company. Reply Brief in Cross Appeal due by 06/27/2025 for Appellant Tri City Foods, Inc. JXK [3] [7437411] 25-1228 25-1324 (HTP) [Entered: 02/27/2025 02:40 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Commerce and Industry Insurance Company in 25-1228 Appellee Commerce and Industry Insurance Company in 25-1324 [4] [7437447] 25-1228 25-1324 (Hodyl, Richard) [Entered: 02/27/2025 03:20 PM]
Related: [-]