Oklahoma Western District Court
Case #: 5:25-cr-00033
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 1:18 AM CST
Defendant
Omar Macias-Villegas (1)
Represented By
Judith Sarai Gallegos
contact info
Cesar A Armenta
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Elizabeth Joynes
Doj-Usao
contact info
Brandon T Hale
Us Attorney'S Office-Okc
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/02/2025 1:50 AM CST
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Omar Macias-Villegas (1). (cps) [5:25-mj-00010-STE]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
Monday, January 13, 2025
4 4 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Omar Macias-Villegas (cps) [5:25-mj-00010-STE]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Cesar Armenta as CJA as to Omar Macias-Villegas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 1/13/2025. (cps) [5:25-mj-00010-STE]
Related: [-]
6 6 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin: Initial Appearance as to Omar Macias-Villegas held on 1/13/2025, Preliminary Hearing waived on 1/13/2025. Detention Hearing set for 1/21/2025 01:00 PM in Courtroom 101 before Magistrate Judge Chris M Stephens. Dft remanded to the custody of the USM pending Detention Hearing. (cps) [5:25-mj-00010-STE]
Related: [-]
7 7 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Omar Macias-Villegas (cps) [5:25-mj-00010-STE]
Related: [-]
8 8 DPPA-ORDER as to Omar Macias-Villegas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 1/13/2025. (cps) [5:25-mj-00010-STE]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Omar Macias-Villegas Detention Hearing set for 1/21/2025 01:00 PM in Courtroom 101 before Magistrate Judge Chris M Stephens.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 1/13/2025. (cps) [5:25-mj-00010-STE]
Related: [-]
12 12 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 1/13/2025 within the Western District of Oklahoma, ICE in case as to Omar Macias-Villegas. (cps) [5:25-mj-00010-STE]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
10 10 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Cesar A Armenta appearing for Omar Macias-Villegas (Armenta, Cesar) [5:25-mj-00010-STE]
Related: [-]
11 11 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Judith Sarai Gallegos appearing for Omar Macias-Villegas (Gallegos, Judith) [5:25-mj-00010-STE]
Related: [-]
13 13 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Omar Macias-Villegas Detention Hearing set for 1/21/2025 01:00 PM in Courtroom 101 before Magistrate Judge Chris M Stephens. (ac) [5:25-mj-00010-STE]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
15 15 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chris M Stephens:Detention Hearing as to Omar Macias-Villegas waived on 1/21/2025. Defendant remanded to custody of USMS. (ac) [5:25-mj-00010-STE]
Related: [-]
16 16 WAIVER Of Detention Hearing & Consent to Order of Detention with an Order of Detention pending further proceedings as to Omar Macias-Villegas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M Stephens on 1/21/2025. (ac) [5:25-mj-00010-STE]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
17 17 INFORMATION as to Omar Macias-Villegas (1) count(s) 1. (rp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet 1 - Omar Macias-Villegas