North Carolina Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lena M James
Case #: 6:14-bk-51366
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Jan 16, 2015
Claims Deadline:Apr 10, 2015
Terminated:Jan 17, 2019

Debtor
Carolina Mattress Guild, Inc.
385 North Rd
Thomasville, NC 27360-8944
Represented By
Stephanie Osborne
contact info
Last checked: never
Bankruptcy Administrator
William P. Miller
Bankruptcy Administrator P.O. Box 1828
Greensboro, NC 27402
Trustee
W. Joseph Burns
Trustee PO Box 21433
Winston-Salem, NC 27120
Represented By
Daniel C. Bruton
Bell, Davis & Pitt, P.A.
contact info

Docket last updated: 12/14/2014 7:00 PM EST
Monday, December 15, 2014
crditcrd none Mon 12/15 1:09 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 14-51366 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00). Receipt number 6058604, amount $ 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Mon 12/15 11:58 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Carolina Mattress Guild, Inc. (Osborne, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice of Change of Creditor(s) Address Mon 12/15 3:19 PM
Notice of Change of Creditor(s)' Address filed by obo Bank of North Carolina Filed by Debtor Carolina Mattress Guild, Inc.. (Osborne, Stephanie)
Related: [-]