Nebraska District Court
Case #: 4:25-cr-03023
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 03, 2025 1:13 AM CST
Defendant
Reyes Ernesto Garcia-Urquizo (1)
Represented By
Matthew J. Knowles
Knowles Law Firm
contact info
Toni M. Leija-Wilson
Federal Public Defender'S Office - Lincoln
contact info
Cody J. Miltenberger
Miltenberger Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Enrique Martinez (2)
Represented By
Timothy P. Sullivan
Sullivan Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Christopher J. Harroun
Assistant United States Attorney - Lincoln
contact info

GPO Feb 06 2025
ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL - The Federal Public Defender for the District of Nebraska is appointed to represent the defendant in this matter as to defendant Reyes Ernesto Garcia-Urquizo. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (NMW)[4:25-mj-03017-JMD]
GPO Feb 06 2025
ORDER ISSUED PURSUANT TO THE DUE PROCESS PROTECTION ACT as to defendant Reyes Ernesto Garcia-Urquizo. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (NMW)[4:25-mj-03017-JMD]
GPO Feb 06 2025
ORDER of Detention as to defendant Reyes Ernesto Garcia-Urquizo. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (NMW)[4:25-mj-03017-JMD]
GPO Feb 14 2025
ORDER - The motion of Toni M. Leija-Wilson to withdraw as counsel of recordfor Defendant, (Filing No. 14), is granted. Defendant's newly retained counsel, Matthew J. Knowles and Cody J. Miltenberger, shall promptly notify Defendant of the entry of this order as to Reyes Ernesto Garcia-Urquizo. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (NMW)[4:25-mj-03017-JMD]
GPO Feb 28 2025
ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL - CJA Counsel is appointed to represent the defendant in this matter as to defendant Enrique Martinez. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (NMW)
GPO Feb 28 2025
ORDER of Detention pending trial as to defendant Enrique Martinez. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (NMW)
GPO Feb 28 2025
*STRICKEN* ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL - CJA Counsel, Timothy P. Sullivan, is appointed to represent the defendant in this matter as to defendant Enrique Martinez. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (LKO) Modified on 2/28/2025 per strike order at filing 35 (NMW).
GPO Mar 11 2025
ORDER - Defendant's motion to continue, (Filing No. 37), is granted as to Reyes Ernesto Garcia-Urquizo (1). Pretrial motions and briefs shall be filed on or before April 17, 2025. The conference call previously scheduled to be held on March 21, 2025, is continued. A telephonic conference with counsel will be held before the undersigned magistrate judge at 9:45 a.m. on April 22, 2025 to discuss setting any pretrial motion hearing needed, a change of plea hearing, or the date of the jury trial and deadlines for disclosing experts as required under Rule 16. Counsel for all parties shall use the conferencing instructions provided by the court to participate in the call. The time between today's date and April 22, 2025 shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirements of the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (JES)
GPO Mar 21 2025
ORDER - Defendant's motion to continue, (Filing No. 44), is granted as to Enrique Martinez (2). Pretrial motions and briefs shall be filed on or before May 20, 2025. The conference call previously scheduled to be held on March 25, 2025, is continued. A telephonic conference with counsel will be held before the undersigned magistrate judge at 9:00 a.m. on May 27, 2025 to discuss setting any pretrial motion hearing needed, a change of plea hearing, or the date of the jury trial and deadlines for disclosing experts as required under Rule 16. Counsel for all parties shall use the conferencing instructions provided by the court to participate in the call. The time between today's date and May 27, 2025 shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirements of the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (JES)
GPO Mar 27 2025
ORDER -Defense counsel's motion to appoint new counsel, (Filing No. 56), is granted. Timothy Sullivan is hereby withdrawn as counsel and shall promptly notify Defendant of the entry of this order. The Federal Public Defender shall forthwith provide the court with a draft appointment order (CJA Form 20) bearing the name and other identifying information of the CJA Panel attorney identified in accordance with the Criminal Justice Act Plan for this district. The newly appointed counsel shall promptly file an entry of appearance on behalf of Defendant as to Enrique Martinez. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (E-mailed to FPD)(NMW)
GPO Mar 27 2025
ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL - CJA Counsel is appointed to represent the defendant in this matter as to defendant Manuel Enrique Corona-Ramirez. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (NMW)
GPO Mar 27 2025
ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL - CJA Counsel is appointed to represent the defendant in this matter as to defendant Omar Gonzalez-Garcia. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (NMW)
GPO Mar 27 2025
ORDER of Detention pending trial as to defendant Omar Gonzalez-Garcia. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (NMW)
GPO Mar 28 2025
ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL - CJA Counsel is appointed to represent the defendant in this matter as to defendant Shawn Norris. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (NMW)
GPO Mar 28 2025
ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL - CJA Counsel is appointed to represent the defendant in this matter as to defendant Trevor Hardin. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (NMW)
GPO Mar 28 2025
ORDER of Detention pending trial as to defendant Trevor Hardin. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (NMW)
GPO Mar 31 2025
WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND ORDER as to defendant Reyes Ernesto Garcia-Urquizo. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (NMW)
GPO Apr 02 2025
ORDER of Detention pending trial as to defendant Manuel Enrique Corona-Ramirez. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (NMW)
GPO Apr 02 2025
ORDER of Detention pending trial as to defendant Shawn Norris. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (NMW)
GPO Apr 11 2025
ORDER - Defendant's motion to continue, (Filing No. 109), is granted as to Omar Gonzalez-Garcia (6). Pretrial motions and briefs shall be filed on or before May 16, 2025. The conference call previously scheduled to be held on April 18, 2025, is continued. A telephonic conference with counsel will be held before the undersigned magistrate judge at 9:45 a.m. on May 19, 2025 to discuss setting any pretrial motion hearing needed, a change of plea hearing, or the date of the jury trial and deadlines for disclosing experts as required under Rule 16. Counsel for all parties shall use the conferencing instructions provided by the court to participate in the call. The time between today's date and May 19, 2025 shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirements of the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (JES)
GPO Apr 14 2025
ORDER - Defendant's motion to continue, (Filing No. 111), is granted as to Reyes Ernesto Garcia-Urquizo (1). Pretrial motions and briefs shall be filed on or before May 19, 2025. The conference call previously scheduled to be held on April 22, 2025, is continued. A telephonic conference with counsel will be held before the undersigned magistrate judge at 9:15 a.m. on May 23, 2025 to discuss setting any pretrial motion hearing needed, a change of plea hearing, or the date of the jury trial and deadlines for disclosing experts as required under Rule 16. Counsel for all parties shall use the conferencing instructions provided by the court to participate in the call. The time between today's date and May 23, 2025 shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirements of the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (JES)
GPO Apr 16 2025
ORDER - Defendant's motion to continue, (Filing No. 113), is granted as to Shawn Norris (4). Pretrial motions and briefs shall be filed on or before May 19, 2025. The conference call previously scheduled to be held on April 18, 2025, is continued. A telephonic conference with counsel will be held before the undersigned magistrate judge at 9:15 a.m. on May 23, 2025 to discuss setting any pretrial motion hearing needed, a change of plea hearing, or the date of the jury trial and deadlines for disclosing experts as required under Rule 16. Counsel for all parties shall use the conferencing instructions provided by the court to participate in the call. The time between today's date and May 23, 2025 shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirements of the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (JES)
GPO Apr 17 2025
ORDER - Defendant's motion to continue, (Filing No. 115), is granted as to Trevor Hardin (5). Pretrial motions and briefs shall be filed on or before May 19, 2025. The conference call previously scheduled to be held on April 18, 2025, is continued. A telephonic conference with counsel will be held before the undersigned magistrate judge at 10:00 a.m. on May 23, 2025 to discuss setting any pretrial motion hearing needed, a change of plea hearing, or the date of the jury trial and deadlines for disclosing experts as required under Rule 16. Counsel for all parties shall use the conferencing instructions provided by the court to participate in the call. The time between today's date and May 23, 2025 shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirements of the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (JES)

Docket last updated: 03/03/2025 1:57 AM CST
Monday, February 03, 2025
1 1 RESTRICTED COMPLAINT signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca as to defendant Reyes Ernesto Garcia-Urquizo. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(A). (LKO) Modified on 2/5/2025 to restrict per Notice4 (LKO). [4:25-mj-03017-JMD]
Related: [-]
2 2 CRIMINAL COVER SHEET as to defendant Reyes Ernesto Garcia-Urquizo. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (LKO) [4:25-mj-03017-JMD]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
4 4 NOTICE (MEMORANDUM) TO UNSEAL MAGISTRATE JUDGE CASE but the underlying Complaint and Affidavit should remain Restricted by Attorney Christopher J. Harroun as to defendant Reyes Ernesto Garcia-Urquizo. (LKO) [4:25-mj-03017-JMD]
Related: [-]
5 5 RESTRICTED HEARING INSTRUCTIONS AND ORDER as to defendant Reyes Ernesto Garcia-Urquizo. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(e). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. Initial Appearance set for 2/6/2025 at 02:00 PM Internet/Telephonic Conferencing before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (E-mailed to Lincoln Co.)(NMW) [4:25-mj-03017-JMD]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
7 7 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca as to defendant Reyes Ernesto Garcia-Urquizo. Initial Appearance on Criminal Complaint held by videoconference with consent of the defendant. Appointment of counsel requested. Court appoints Federal Public Defender to represent defendant. Defense counsel read the complaint to the Defendant with the assistance of an interpreter. Rights given. Preliminary Examination waived. Court finds probable cause. Court takes judicial notice of the Complaint1 and Sealed Pretrial Services Report 6 . Government moves for detention. Detention hearing waived. Court finds that based upon the information of record he poses a risk of non-appearance and risk of harm to the public and has not shown by clear and convincing evidence that he would not pose such a risk if released. At this time there are no conditions before the court that would sufficiently alleviate these risks. Defendant remanded to custody of the U.S. Marshal pending further order of the court. Appearance for Plaintiff: Christopher J. Harroun, USA; For Defendant: Toni M. Leija-Wilson, FPD. Pretrial Services: Courtney Schoneweis; Courtroom Deputy: Nicki Wenzl; Court Reporter: Digital Recorder. Spanish Interpreter: Laura Garcia-Hein Remote. Time Start: 1:56 PM; Time Stop: 2:27 PM; Time in Court: 31 Minutes. (NMW) [4:25-mj-03017-JMD]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL - The Federal Public Defender for the District of Nebraska is appointed to represent the defendant in this matter as to defendant Reyes Ernesto Garcia-Urquizo. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (NMW) [4:25-mj-03017-JMD]
Related: [-]
9 9 AUDIO FILE. Audio as to Defendant (1) Reyes Ernesto Garcia-Urquizo. Court Date & Time [ 2/6/2025 2:11:43 PM ]. File Size [ 3508 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:14:37 ]. (Initial Appearance). (auto-docket). [4:25-mj-03017-JMD]
Related: [-]
10 10 CONSULAR NOTIFICATION as to defendant Reyes Ernesto Garcia-Urquizo. (NMW) [4:25-mj-03017-JMD]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER ISSUED PURSUANT TO THE DUE PROCESS PROTECTION ACT as to defendant Reyes Ernesto Garcia-Urquizo. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (NMW) [4:25-mj-03017-JMD]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER of Detention as to defendant Reyes Ernesto Garcia-Urquizo. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (NMW) [4:25-mj-03017-JMD]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
13 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for Defendant by Attorney Matthew J. Knowles as to defendant(s) Reyes Ernesto Garcia-Urquizo. (Knowles, Matthew) [4:25-mj-03017-JMD]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
14 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Attorney Toni M. Leija-Wilson as to defendant(s) Reyes Ernesto Garcia-Urquizo. (Leija-Wilson, Toni) [4:25-mj-03017-JMD]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER - The motion of Toni M. Leija-Wilson to withdraw as counsel of recordfor Defendant, (Filing No.14 ), is granted. Defendant's newly retained counsel, Matthew J. Knowles and Cody J. Miltenberger, shall promptly notify Defendant of the entry of this order as to Reyes Ernesto Garcia-Urquizo. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (NMW) [4:25-mj-03017-JMD]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
Remark - Public: Case filed under seal on 2/18/2025 and unsealed on 2/26/2025 pursuant to memorandum as to defendants Reyes Ernesto Garcia-Urquizo, Enrique Martinez. (JES)
Related: [-]
16 16 5 pgs PART 1 OF 2 - INDICTMENT with foreperson's signature redacted pursuant to the E-Government Act as to defendants Reyes Ernesto Garcia-Urquizo, Enrique Martinez. (TCL) Modified on 2/26/2025 to remove the word sealed (JES).
Related: [-]
17 17 PART 2 OF 2 - FOREPERSON'S SIGNATURE PAGE regarding Indictment (Sealed)16 as to defendants Reyes Ernesto Garcia-Urquizo, Enrique Martinez. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(e). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (TCL)
Related: [-]
18 18 CRIMINAL COVER SHEET as to defendants Reyes Ernesto Garcia-Urquizo, Enrique Martinez. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (TCL)
Related: [-]