Florida Southern District Court
Judge:David S Leibowitz
Referred: Panayotta D Augustin-Bir
Case #: 0:25-cv-60401
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:0101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 5:07 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Brandon Williams
Counter Defendant
DMSO Store Inc
Represented By
Brad Elliott Kelsky
Kelsky Law, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Brandon Williams
2021 NW 136th Avenue Building 4 Apt. 373
Sunrise, FL 33323
Plaintiff
DMSO Store Inc
3580 SW 30th Avenue
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33312
Represented By
Brad Elliott Kelsky
Kelsky Law, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 88 minutes ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
15 15 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 05/08 11:00 AM
ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 5/7/2025. See attached document for full details. (amb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 05/06 9:23 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin Lee Kelsky on behalf of DMSO Store Inc. Attorney Benjamin Lee Kelsky added to party DMSO Store Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin Lee Kelsky added to party DMSO Store Inc(pty:cd). (Kelsky, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
13 13 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 05/05 7:48 AM
ORDER Setting Jury Trial Schedule: ( Jury Trial set for 6/29/2026 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge David S. Leibowitz., Calendar Call set for 6/23/2026 02:00 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge David S. Leibowitz.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 1/13/2026.), and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 5/2/2025. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Fri 05/02 11:17 AM
SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by DMSO Store Inc(Kelsky, Brad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
11 11 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 04/23 11:42 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by DMSO Store Inc. Responses due by 5/7/2025. (Kelsky, Brad)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
10 10 2 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Mon 04/14 2:56 PM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. The parties are directed to prepare and file a joint scheduling report, as required by Local Rule 16.1, by May 5, 2025. Joint Scheduling Report due by 5/5/2025 Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 4/11/2025. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 04/11 2:51 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against DMSO Store Inc by Brandon Williams. (nan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
8 8 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Wed 03/26 7:48 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by DMSO Store Inc. Brandon Williams served on 3/25/2025, response/answer due 4/15/2025. (Kelsky, Brad)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Fri 03/14 3:52 PM
Summons Issued as to Brandon Williams. (nan)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Fri 03/14 12:50 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by DMSO Store Inc (Kelsky, Brad)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/03 8:49 AM
NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet by DMSO Store Inc (Kelsky, Brad)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Form AO 120/121 Mon 03/03 8:42 AM
FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (nan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint
3 3 order Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE Mon 03/03 8:35 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (nan)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 01, 2025
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 03/03 8:33 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge David S. Leibowitz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Sat 03/01 10:28 AM
COMPLAINT against Brandon Williams. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18246913, filed by DMSO Store Inc.(Kelsky, Brad)
Related: [-]