Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Arenda L Wright Allen
Referred: Douglas E Miller
Case #: 2:25-cv-00117
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:1345 Foreclosure
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2025
Terminated:Apr 18, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 5:14 AM EDT
Defendant
Stephanee Pope
3609 Pamlico Circle
Norfolk, VA 23513
Defendant
Secretary of Department of Housing and Urban Development
Defendant
Stacy S. Temple
Plaintiff
Trustee Services of Virginia, LLC
Represented By
Robert Anthony Oliveri, Jr.
Brock & Scott. PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By
Robert Anthony Oliveri, Jr.
Brock & Scott. PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, April 18, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 04/18 9:26 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trustee Services of Virginia, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB (Oliveri, Robert)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 01, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 03/01 6:21 PM
Complaint for a Judicial Sale ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-10035901.), filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB not in its individual capacity but solely as Trustee of GWST Trust 2020-1, Trustee Services of Virginia, LLC.(Oliveri, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 2022 Deed,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2022 Deed of Trust,
Att: 3 Exhibit April 2023 Assignment,
Att: 4 Exhibit November 2023 Assignment,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2025 Appointment of Substitute Trustee,
Att: 6 Exhibit September 2022 Loan Modification Agreement,
Att: 7 Exhibit September 2022 Partial Claim Deed of Trust,
Att: 8 Exhibit September 2023 Loan Modification Agreement,
Att: 9 Exhibit September 2023 Partial Claim Deed of Trust,
Att: 10 Exhibit May 2024 Loan Modification Agreement,
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Mon 03/03 12:36 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )
Related: [-]