Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:25-cv-00212
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1333 Admiralty
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 16, 2025 4:46 AM EDT
Defendant
OKALOOSA COUNTY FLORIDA
Represented By
MATTHEW REED SHAUD
Nabors Giblin & Nickerson Pa - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
ELMER CORONADO IGNACIO
Nabors Giblin & Nickerson Pa - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
NEW YORK COALITION TO SAVE THE STEAM SHIP UNITED STATES INC
Represented By
JAMES M MALONEY
Law Office Of James M Maloney - Port Washington Ny
contact info
JAMES MICHAEL MALONEY
Law Office Of James M Maloney - Port Washington Ny
contact info


Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/15 10:57 AM
ORDER re 18 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR A TWO-WEEK EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. The motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 16 ) is extended to June 4, 2025. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 05/15/25. Related [+] (jfj)
Related: [-] sponse to motion due by 6/4/2025 .
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Thu 05/15 8:35 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to16 MOTION TO DISMISS. (jfj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
18 18 3 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 05/14 5:39 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by NEW YORK COALITION TO SAVE THE STEAM SHIP UNITED STATES INC. (MALONEY, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order Staying Case ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 05/07 4:24 PM
ORDER. In response to the Amended Complaint, ECF No. 12 , Defendant has moved to dismiss this action, challenging the Plaintiff's standing to bring the suit and also arguing that the Amended Complaint fails to state a claim. Because the Court's jurisdiction is in question, the case and all discovery will be and is STAYED until the Court resolves the Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 16 . Plaintiff's response to the Motion to Dismiss is due in 14 days. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 05/07/25. Related [+] (jfj)
Related: [-] sponse to motion due by 5/21/2025 .
16 16 33 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 05/07 12:39 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by OKALOOSA COUNTY FLORIDA. (IGNACIO, ELMER)
Related: [-]
15 15 5 pgs motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/07 10:27 AM
Consent MOTION Related [+] to Take Judicial Notice by OKALOOSA COUNTY FLORIDA. (IGNACIO, ELMER)
Related: [-] quest
Att: 1 24 pgs Exhibit Permit SAJ-1996-03565,
Att: 2 Exhibit Permit SAJ-1996-03565 Modification 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit Permit SAJ-1996-03565 Modification 2
Monday, April 28, 2025
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 04/28 10:15 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:14 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (jfj)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
14 14 7 pgs misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Fri 04/25 3:35 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (IGNACIO, ELMER)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/23 1:43 PM
ORDER re 10 MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT. The motion is DENIED as moot. See ECF No. 12 . Defendant must respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (ECF No. 12 ) within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 04/23/25. (OKALOOSA COUNTY FLORIDA Answer due by 5/7/2025 .) (jfj)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 04/21 9:24 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:12 Amended Complaint. (jfj)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 04/18 11:12 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against OKALOOSA COUNTY FLORIDA, filed by NEW YORK COALITION TO SAVE THE STEAM SHIP UNITED STATES INC. (MALONEY, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Open Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 HAER,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 Brody Opinion,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 Agreement,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 Statutes
Friday, April 11, 2025
11 11 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 04/11 6:56 PM
NOTICE OF INTENTION TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT by NEW YORK COALITION TO SAVE THE STEAM SHIP UNITED STATES INC re10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (MALONEY, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
10 10 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 03/28 3:03 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by OKALOOSA COUNTY FLORIDA. (IGNACIO, ELMER)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/31 9:42 AM
Set Deadline re10 OKALOOSA COUNTY, FLORIDA'S MOTION TO DISMISS - Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/11/2025 . (jfj)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
4 4 2 pgs Summons Issued as to OKALOOSA COUNTY FLORIDA. (jfj)
Related: [-]
3 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by NEW YORK COALITION TO SAVE THE STEAM SHIP UNITED STATES INC. (MALONEY, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 02, 2025
2 2 NOTICE of filing proposed summons by NEW YORK COALITION TO SAVE THE STEAM SHIP UNITED STATES, INC. re1 Complaint, (MALONEY, JAMES)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs COMPLAINT against NEW YORK COALITION TO SAVE THE STEAM SHIP UNITED STATES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AFLNDC-9390252.), filed by NEW YORK COALITION TO SAVE THE STEAM SHIP UNITED STATES, INC.. (MALONEY, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Letter to the President,
Att: 3 Exhibit HISTORIC AMERICAN ENGINEERING RECORD,
Att: 4 14 pgs Exhibit MEMORANDUM OPINION,
Att: 5 13 pgs Exhibit Purchase and Sale Agreement,
Att: 6 Exhibit Public Laws 92-296 and 94-536