Florida Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jerry C Oldshue Jr
Case #: 3:25-bk-30177
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Frugality, Inc.
6381 Southridge Rd
Milton, FL 32570-2057
Represented By
Byron Wright, III
Bruner Wright, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
110 E. Park Avenue Suite 128
Tallahassee, FL 32301


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
43 43 2 pgs order Order re Motion to Use Cash Collateral (PDF) Wed 05/14 4:29 PM
Interim Order Granting Agreed Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Provide Adequate Protection Payments Related [+] signed on 5/14/2025 . SERVICE: Attorney Byron Wright III shall serve this document pursuant to the applicable Rules and file a certificate of service within three (3) days. (Thurman, Audrey)
Related: [-] 38
42 42 2 pgs order Order re Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries (PDF) Wed 05/14 4:21 PM
Third Interim Order Granting Debtor's Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salary of Wayne English Effective as of the Petition Date Related [+] signed on 5/14/2025 . SERVICE: Attorney Samantha A. Kelley shall serve this document pursuant to the applicable Rules and file a certificate of service within three (3) days. (Thurman, Audrey)
Related: [-] 16
Friday, May 09, 2025
41 41 court Proceeding Memo: Hearing Continued (PDF/Form) Fri 05/09 1:21 PM
Hearing is Continued: Hearing scheduled on 6/6/2025 at 10:00 AM (Central Time) at/via Telephone Conference [JCO] (650-479-3207, Meeting ID 2314 412 8931) . Related [+] GRANTED ON AN INTERIM BASIS. ORDER: WRIGHT. APPEARANCES: BYRON WRIGHT FOR DEBTOR, JASON EGAN FOR U.S. TRUSTEE, DOUGLAS BATES FOR BAY FIRST NATIONAL BANK. Continuance announced in open court; no service required. (Murrill, Lisa) Court Reporter: ALSB DCR/ECRO (digital court recording)
Related: [-] 38 Motion to Use Cash Collateral.
40 40 court Proceeding Memo: Hearing Continued (PDF/Form) Fri 05/09 1:19 PM
Hearing is Continued: Hearing scheduled on 6/6/2025 at 10:00 AM (Central Time) at/via Telephone Conference [JCO] (650-479-3207, Meeting ID 2314 412 8931) . Related [+] GRANTED ON AN INTERIM BASIS. ORDER: WRIGHT. APPEARANCES: BYRON WRIGHT FOR DEBTOR, JASON EGAN FOR U.S. TRUSTEE, DOUGLAS BATES FOR BAY FIRST NATIONAL BANK. Continuance announced in open court; no service required. (Murrill, Lisa) Court Reporter: ALSB DCR/ECRO (digital court recording)
Related: [-] 16 Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries.
misc Certificate of Service by CM/ECF Notice of Electronic Filing (Paperless) Fri 05/09 10:36 AM
Service to All Parties Completed by CM/ECF Notice of Electronic Filing Filed by Byron Wright III on behalf of Frugality, Inc. [Re:39 Notice of Hearing, IMMEDIATE ACTION REQD: Ntc to File Cert of Svc to avoid Hrg Cancel and/or Ord Deny]. (Wright, Byron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
court Service Reminder re Document Scheduling Hearing - Final Thu 05/08 6:30 PM
FINAL Notice to File Proof of Service. The movant or debtor, as applicable, or its counsel is hereby reminded of the requirement to serve the document referenced herein and file a Certificate of Service within three (3) days. Failure to comply with the FLNB noticing requirements may result in the hearing being cancelled and/or the matter being denied for failure to comply with the noticing requirements. Related [+] (ADIapps)
Related: [-] 39 Notice of Hearing
Friday, May 02, 2025
39 39 court Hearing SET: AP or BK (PDF/Form) Fri 05/02 10:39 AM
Notice of Expedited Hearing. Hearing scheduled on 5/9/2025 at 10:00 AM (Central Time) at/via Telephone Conference [JCO] (650-479-3207, Meeting ID 2314 412 8931) . Related [+] SERVICE: Byron Wright III shall serve notice of this emergency/expedited hearing immediately by facsimile or email on all parties as required by applicable Rules and a certificate of service must be filed immediately thereafter. (Murrill, Lisa)
Related: [-] 38 Motion to Use Cash Collateral.
Thursday, May 01, 2025
38 38 motion Motion to Use Cash Collateral Thu 05/01 3:28 PM
Agreed Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Byron Wright III on behalf of Frugality, Inc. (Wright, Byron)
Related: [-]
37 37 misc Operating Report - Chapter 11 Small Business Thu 05/01 11:15 AM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period March 3, 2025 through March 31, 2025 Filed by Samantha A. Kelley on behalf of Frugality, Inc.. (Kelley, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
36 36 utility utility: Submission Error Notification (SEN) - Refiling Required (Paperless/Pro se Form/PDF) Wed 04/23 12:25 PM
SUBMISSION ERROR NOTIFICATION: Please take immediate action to correct the error(s) noted below: - Incorrect Filing Event used or Wrong PDF Attached : Filing cannot be processed until refiled using the correct filing event or refiled with the correct PDF attached. PDF references April, Docket Text marked as March. Related [+] (Thurman, Audrey)
Related: [-] 35 Operating Report - Chapter 11 Small Business.
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
35 35 misc Operating Report - Chapter 11 Small Business Tue 04/22 10:02 AM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period March 3, 2025 through March 31, 2025 Filed by Samantha A. Kelley on behalf of Frugality, Inc.. (Kelley, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents
misc Certificate of Service by CM/ECF Notice of Electronic Filing (Paperless) Tue 04/22 1:56 PM
Service to All Parties Completed by CM/ECF Notice of Electronic Filing Filed by Robert C. Bruner on behalf of Frugality, Inc. [Re:32 Order on Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries,34 Order on Application to Employ]. (Bruner, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
court Service Reminder re Order Mon 04/21 6:30 PM
Notice to File Proof of Service. Attorney Samantha A. Kelley is hereby reminded of the requirement to serve the order referenced herein and file a Certificate of Service within three (3) days. Failure to comply with the FLNB noticing requirements may result in the order being vacated. Related [+] (ADIapps)
Related: [-] 32 Order on Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
34 34 2 pgs order Order re Application to Employ (PDF) Wed 04/16 3:57 PM
Order Approving Debtor's Application to Employ Bruner Wright, P.A. as Counsel for the Debtor-In-Possession Effective as of the Petition Date Related [+] signed on 4/16/2025 . SERVICE: Attorney Byron Wright III shall serve this document pursuant to the applicable Rules and file a certificate of service within three (3) days. (Thurman, Audrey)
Related: [-] 14
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
33 33 3 pgs motion Application to Employ Tue 04/15 1:53 PM
Application to Employ Thomas English (3407 Edinborough Ct., Pensacola, FL 32514) as Accountant Filed by Byron Wright III on behalf of Frugality, Inc. (Wright, Byron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Declaration
32 32 2 pgs order Order re Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries (PDF) Tue 04/15 12:26 PM
Second Interim Order Granting Debtor's Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salary of Wayne English Effective as of the Petition Date Related [+] signed on 4/15/2025 . SERVICE: Attorney Samantha A. Kelley shall serve this document pursuant to the applicable Rules and file a certificate of service within three (3) days. (Thurman, Audrey)
Related: [-] 16
Monday, April 14, 2025
31 31 court Request for Proposed Order Mon 04/14 3:28 PM
Clerk's Notice to Submit Proposed Order: In accordance with the N.D. Fla. LBRs, Byron Wright III is reminded of the requirements regarding timely submission of proposed orders. Proposed orders are to be submitted electronically through the[LINK:Submit Proposed Orders] link in CM/ECF. Do not upload/file the proposed order on the docket. Please see the[LINK:FLNB Style Guide] for style guidance. Related [+] (Thurman, Audrey)
Related: [-] 14 Application to Employ.
Friday, April 11, 2025
30 30 court Proceeding Memo: Hearing Continued (PDF/Form) Fri 04/11 11:52 AM
Hearing is Continued: Hearing scheduled on 5/9/2025 at 10:00 AM (Central Time) at/via Telephone Conference [JCO] (650-479-3207, Meeting ID 2314 412 8931) . Related [+] APPEARANCES: SAMANTHA KELLEY FOR DEBTOR, WAYNE ENGLISH DEBTOR PRINCIPAL, JASON EGAN FOR U.S. TRUSTEE, JODI DUBOSE AS SUBCHAPTERV TRUSTEE, DOUGLAS BATES FOR BAY FIRST NATIONAL BANK. Continuance announced in open court; no service required. (Murrill, Lisa) Court Reporter: ALSB DCR/ECRO (digital court recording)
Related: [-] 16 Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries.
29 29 court Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held (NoDoc) Fri 04/11 11:50 AM
Hearing Held Related [+] APPEARANCES: SAMANTHA KELLEY FOR DEBTOR, WAYNE ENGLISH DEBTOR PRINCIPAL, JASON EGAN FOR U.S. TRUSTEE, JODI DUBOSE AS SUBCHAPTERV TRUSTEE, DOUGLAS BATES FOR BAY FIRST NATIONAL BANK. (Murrill, Lisa) Court Reporter: ALSB DCR/ECRO (digital court recording)
Related: [-] 8 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Duties of the Debtor Order, Notice of Status Conference, & Deadline to File Plan.
Monday, April 07, 2025
28 28 misc Pre-Status Conference Report Mon 04/07 8:13 PM
Pre-Status Conference Report Filed by Samantha A. Kelley on behalf of Frugality, Inc. [Re:8 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Duties of the Debtor Order, Notice of Status Conference, & Deadline to File Plan]. (Kelley, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Creditor Matrix
27 27 court Notice of Conclusion of 341 Mtg by UST (Paperless) Mon 04/07 11:58 AM
The United States Trustee hereby gives notice that the Section 341(a) Meeting of Creditors was held and concluded Filed by United States Trustee Related [+]. (Egan, Jason)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case & 341(a) Meeting of Creditors
Saturday, April 05, 2025
misc Certificate of Service by CM/ECF Notice of Electronic Filing (Paperless) Sat 04/05 10:03 PM
Service to All Parties Completed by CM/ECF Notice of Electronic Filing Filed by Robert C. Bruner on behalf of Frugality, Inc. [Re:26 Order on Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries]. (Bruner, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
26 26 2 pgs order Order re Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries (PDF) Tue 04/01 2:09 PM
Interim Order Granting Debtor's Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salary of Wayne English Effective as of the Petition Date Related [+] signed on 4/1/2025 . SERVICE: Attorney Byron Wright III shall serve this document pursuant to the applicable Rules and file a certificate of service within three (3) days. (Thurman, Audrey)
Related: [-] 16
Monday, March 24, 2025
crdadd Enter Individual Creditor(s) (Paperless) Mon 03/24 2:35 PM
Creditor(s) added to list of creditors/matrix: Uline. Added by (Isom, L.)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Service by CM/ECF Notice of Electronic Filing (Paperless) Mon 03/24 7:19 PM
Service to All Parties Completed by CM/ECF Notice of Electronic Filing Filed by Robert C. Bruner on behalf of Frugality, Inc. [Re:22 Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]. (Bruner, Robert)
Related: [-]
court Service Reminder re Order Mon 03/24 6:30 PM
Notice to File Proof of Service. Attorney Byron Wright III is hereby reminded of the requirement to serve the order referenced herein and file a Certificate of Service within three (3) days. Failure to comply with the FLNB noticing requirements may result in the order being vacated. Related [+] (ADIapps)
Related: [-] 22 Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules
Friday, March 21, 2025
25 25 court Proceeding Memo: Hearing Continued (PDF/Form) Fri 03/21 12:07 PM
Hearing is Continued: Hearing scheduled on 4/11/2025 at 10:00 AM (Central Time) at/via Telephone Conference [JCO] (650-479-3207, Meeting ID 2314 412 8931) . Related [+] GRANTED ON AN INTERIM BASIS. ORDER: WRIGHT. APPEARANCES: BYRON WRIGHT FOR DEBTOR, WAYNE ENGLISH OF FRUGALITY, INC., JASON EGAN FOR U.S. TRUSTEE, JODI DUBOSE AS SUBCHAPTER V TRUSTEE, DOUGLAS BATES FOR BAY FIRST NATIONAL BANK. Continuance announced in open court; no service required. (Murrill, Lisa) Court Reporter: ALSB DCR/ECRO (digital court recording)
Related: [-] 16 Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries.
Thursday, March 20, 2025
24 24 misc Notice of Appearance (Appearance of Attorney) Thu 03/20 4:38 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Douglas A. Bates on behalf of BayFirst National Bank. (Bates, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
23 23 misc Schedules & Statements (all remaining deficient docs) Wed 03/19 4:50 PM
All remaining schedules and statements (no change to matrix) Filed by Byron Wright III on behalf of Frugality, Inc. [Re:1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11),22 Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]. (Wright, Byron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
22 22 2 pgs order Order re Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules (PDF) Tue 03/18 3:49 PM
Order Granting Debtor's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File All Remaining Schedules and Statements Related [+] signed on 3/18/2025 . Schedule A/B due 3/19/2025. Schedule D due 3/19/2025. Schedule E/F due 3/19/2025. Schedule G due 3/19/2025. Schedule H due 3/19/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 3/19/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 3/19/2025. SERVICE: Attorney Byron Wright III shall serve this document pursuant to the applicable Rules and file a certificate of service within three (3) days. (Thurman, Audrey)
Related: [-] 20
Monday, March 17, 2025
21 21 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Mon 03/17 10:28 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Additional Compensation Filed by Byron Wright III on behalf of Frugality, Inc.. (Wright, Byron)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules Mon 03/17 10:12 PM
Consent Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Byron Wright III on behalf of Frugality, Inc. (Wright, Byron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
19 19 misc Certificate of Service/Mailing Thu 03/13 5:53 PM
Certificate of Service/Mailing Filed by Byron Wright III on behalf of Frugality, Inc. [Re:16 Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries,18 Notice of Hearing]. (Wright, Byron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
18 18 court Hearing SET: AP or BK (PDF/Form) Tue 03/11 12:03 PM
Notice of Expedited Hearing. Hearing scheduled on 3/21/2025 at 10:00 AM (Central Time) at/via Telephone Conference [JCO] (650-479-3207, Meeting ID 2314 412 8931) . Related [+] SERVICE: Byron Wright III shall serve notice of this hearing immediately by facsimile or email on all parties as required by the applicable Rules and a certificate of service must be filed immediately thereafter. (Murrill, Lisa)
Related: [-] 16 Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries.
17 17 misc Case Management Summary Tue 03/11 10:11 AM
Case Management Summary Filed by Byron Wright III on behalf of Frugality, Inc.. (Wright, Byron)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries Tue 03/11 10:10 AM
Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries of Wayne English Filed by Byron Wright III on behalf of Frugality, Inc. (Wright, Byron)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Request for Notices (Not Attorney Appearance) Tue 03/11 9:08 AM
Request for Notices Filed by American Express National Bank c/o Zwicker & Associates, P.C. (Hankard, Katie)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
14 14 5 pgs motion Application to Employ Mon 03/10 12:19 PM
Application to Employ Bruner Wright, P.A. (2868 Remington Green Circle, Suite B, Tallahassee, FL 32308) as Counsel for the Debtor-In-Possession Filed by Byron Wright III on behalf of Frugality, Inc. (Wright, Byron)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 08, 2025
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sun 03/09 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+] Notice Date 03/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case & 341(a) Meeting of Creditors.
Friday, March 07, 2025
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 03/08 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 03/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Duties of the Debtor Order, Notice of Status Conference, & Deadline to File Plan.
Thursday, March 06, 2025
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 03/07 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 03/06/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order to File Federal and State Employment Tax Returns and to Deposit State and Federal Taxes.
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 03/07 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 03/06/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Deadline to Cure Deficiencies.
9 9 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Form) Thu 03/06 3:57 PM
Notice of Chapter 11 Case and 341(a) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/7/2025 at 09:00 AM, CT, at/via with the U.S. Trustee by telephone at (877) 835-0364, Access Code 4662459 . Proofs of Claims due by 5/12/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 9/2/2025. Chapter 11 Plan (Subchapter V) due: 6/2/2025. Last day to oppose discharge is 6/6/2025. Service by the Court pursuant to applicable Rules. (Romine, C.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
8 8 6 pgs court Order & Notice of Status Conference - Ch 11V (Orig/Amd/Cont/Resch) (Form / PDF) Wed 03/05 10:35 AM
Order Prescribing Subchapter V Operating Procedures, Scheduling Status Conference, and Setting Deadline for Filing Plan Status hearing to be held on 4/11/2025 at 10:00 AM (Central Time) at/via Telephone Conference [JCO] (650-479-3207, Meeting ID 2314 412 8931). Subchapter V Pre-Status Conference Report due: 3/28/2025. Service by the Court pursuant to applicable Rules. (Murrill, Lisa)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs trustee Notice of Appointment of Ch. 11 Trustee Wed 03/05 9:24 AM
Notice of Appointment of Jodi D. Dubose as Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee Filed by United States Trustee. (United States Trustee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Verification of DuBose
341info 341 Meeting Info for Ch 11 or 12 or Case Converted to Ch 7 (OUST Only) Wed 03/05 9:27 AM
Trustee's Memo re 341 Meeting: Please schedule Meeting of Creditors to be held at 9:00 AM (CST) on April 7, 2025 in BY TELEPHONE Filed by United States Trustee. (United States Trustee)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order to File Tax Returns and Make Tax Deposits (Form) Tue 03/04 6:30 PM
Order to File Federal and State Employment Tax Returns and to Deposit State and Federal Taxes signed on 03/04/2025. (ADIapps)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Notice to Cure Petition Deficiencies (Form/PDF) Tue 03/04 10:49 AM
Notice of Deadline to Cure Deficiencies. A complete list of deficient items due from Debtors attached. Service by the Court pursuant to applicable Rules. (Hawkins, J.)
Related: [-]
court 5Alpha Case Admin Assignment (NoDoc) Tue 03/04 6:00 AM
Case assigned to Audrey Thurman (admin)
Related: [-]
utility utility: QC Performed by Case Administrator Tue 03/04 10:52 AM
New Case Received and Reviewed for Accuracy (QC) (Hawkins, J.)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance (Appearance of Attorney) Mon 03/03 10:03 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Robert C. Bruner on behalf of Frugality, Inc.. (Bruner, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Online Payment Mon 03/03 3:04 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-30177 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A5486967, amount $1738.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
2 2 misc Notice of Appearance (Appearance of Attorney) Mon 03/03 2:14 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jason H. Egan on behalf of United States Trustee. (Egan, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 03/03 11:59 AM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition (Non-Individual) (Filing Fee: $1738.00) filed by Frugality, Inc.. Attorney Disclosure Statement due 03/17/2025. Employee Income Record or Statement of No Employee Income due: 03/17/2025. Schedule A/B due 03/17/2025. Schedule D due 03/17/2025. Schedule E/F due 03/17/2025. Schedule G due 03/17/2025. Schedule H due 03/17/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 03/17/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 03/17/2025. Deadline to Cure Deficiency(ies): 03/17/2025 . (Wright, Byron)
Related: [-]