Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Melissa Damian
Case #: 1:25-cv-20978
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 7:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Michael Carbonara
102 N.E. 2nd Street No. 112
Boca Raton, FL 33432
Represented By
Stuart Allen Weinstein-Bacal
Indiano Williams & Weinstein-Bacal
contact info
Peter W. Homer
Homer Bonner Jacobs, P.A.
contact info
Andrew R. Herron
Homer Bonner Jacobs
contact info
Defendant
Ibanera LLC
2120 Carey Avenue
Cheyenne, WY 82001
Represented By
Stuart Allen Weinstein-Bacal
Indiano Williams & Weinstein-Bacal
contact info
Peter W. Homer
Homer Bonner Jacobs, P.A.
contact info
Andrew R. Herron
Homer Bonner Jacobs
contact info
Defendant
Ibanera Private Limited
Plaintiff
Deltec Bank & Trust Limited
Represented By
Desiree F. Moore
Venable LLP
contact info
Joseph Benjamin Isenberg
Venable LLP
contact info
Abram I. Moore
Venable LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
35 35 motion Expedited Motion Mon 05/05 6:46 PM
EXPEDITED MOTION For Leave to Exceed Page Limitations For Plaintiff's Expedited Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Freezing Assets and for an Immediate Accounting and Limited Expedited Discovery by Deltec Bank & Trust Limited.(Isenberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
34 34 2 pgs order Order on Expedited Motion Order on Motion for Discovery Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Mon 05/05 1:43 PM
ORDER denying24 Expedited Motion for Preliminary Injunction ; denying24 Expedited Motion for Temporary restraining Order ; denying24 Motion for Discovery; denying27 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 5/5/2025. See attached document for full details. (gqa)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
33 33 2 pgs service Certificate of Service Fri 05/02 7:56 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deltec Bank & Trust Limited re24 EXPEDITED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and,EXPEDITED MOTION for a Preliminary Injunction Freezing Specific Assets and for an Immediate Accounting and,MOTION for Limited Expedited Discovery and Supporting Memorandum of Law,3 Summons Issued,26 Affidavit,,,22 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal (Isenberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Affidavit Fri 05/02 7:51 PM
AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Abram I. Moore in Support of signed by: Abram I. Moore re31 MOTION for an Order Authorizing Alternative Service of Process on Defendant Ibanera Private Limited and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Deltec Bank & Trust Limited(Isenberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
31 31 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/02 7:39 PM
MOTION for an Order Authorizing Alternative Service of Process on Defendant Ibanera Private Limited and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Deltec Bank & Trust Limited.(Isenberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Fri 05/02 4:15 PM
ORDER Granting23 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 5/2/2025. See attached document for full details. (cds)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/02 2:55 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order Granting by Deltec Bank & Trust Limited re24 EXPEDITED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and,EXPEDITED MOTION for a Preliminary Injunction Freezing Specific Assets and for an Immediate Accounting and,MOTION for Limited Expedited Discovery and Supporting Memorandum of Law (Isenberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
27 27 3 pgs motion File Excess Pages Fri 05/02 10:54 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Deltec Bank & Trust Limited. (Isenberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
26 26 3 pgs misc Affidavit Fri 05/02 9:57 AM
AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Abram I. Moore in Support of Plaintiff's Expedited Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Freezing Specific Assets and for an Immediate Accounting and Limited Expedited Discovery and Supporting Memorandum of Law signed by: Abram I. Moore re24 EXPEDITED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and,EXPEDITED MOTION for a Preliminary Injunction Freezing Specific Assets and for an Immediate Accounting and,MOTION for Limited Expedited Discovery and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Deltec Bank & Trust Limited(Isenberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 3 5 pgs Exhibit C,
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit D,
Att: 5 3 pgs Exhibit E,
Att: 6 11 pgs Exhibit F,
Att: 7 8 pgs Exhibit G,
Att: 8 4 pgs Exhibit H,
Att: 9 7 pgs Exhibit I,
Att: 10 10 pgs Exhibit J
25 25 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Fri 05/02 9:52 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re24 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief ; ERROR - The Filer selected only one relief event and failed to select the additional corresponding events for each relief requested in the motion. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. (jas)
Related: [-]
SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 30 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1861723)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
24 24 29 pgs motion Expedited Motion Discovery Fri 05/02 12:28 AM
EXPEDITED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and, EXPEDITED MOTION for a Preliminary Injunction Freezing Specific Assets and for an Immediate Accounting and, MOTION for Limited Expedited Discovery and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Deltec Bank & Trust Limited. Responses due by 5/15/2025. (Isenberg, Joseph). Added MOTION for Discovery on 5/2/2025 (jas).
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Motion to Seal (Public) Thu 05/01 9:34 PM
MOTION to Seal Exhibit to Amended Verified Complaint per Local Rule 5.4 by Deltec Bank & Trust Limited. (Isenberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
22 22 33 pgs cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Thu 05/01 9:27 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Deltec Bank & Trust Limited.(Isenberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 32 pgs Exhibit A
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/22 3:43 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Stuart A. Weinstein-Bacal. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 4/22/2025. See attached document for full details. (gqa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
20 20 5 pgs motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Thu 04/10 9:01 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Stuart A. Weinstein-Bacal. Filing Fee $ 250.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-18358542 by Michael Carbonara, Ibanera LLC. Responses due by 4/24/2025.(Herron, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
19 19 2 pgs notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 04/09 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter W. Homer on behalf of Michael Carbonara, Ibanera LLC. Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Michael Carbonara(pty:dft), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Ibanera LLC(pty:dft). (Homer, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/07 2:35 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Desire F. Moore. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 4/7/2025. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/07 2:34 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Abram I. Moore,. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 4/7/2025. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Fri 04/04 5:19 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Abram I. Moore. Filing Fee $ 250.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-18343220 by Deltec Bank & Trust Limited. Responses due by 4/18/2025. (Isenberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Fri 04/04 5:17 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Desiree F. Moore. Filing Fee $ 250.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-18343206 by Deltec Bank & Trust Limited. Responses due by 4/18/2025. (Isenberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Fri 04/04 9:03 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Deltec Bank & Trust Limited. Michael Carbonara served on 3/12/2025, response/answer due 4/2/2025. (Isenberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Fri 04/04 9:01 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Deltec Bank & Trust Limited. Ibanera LLC served on 3/12/2025, response/answer due 4/2/2025. (Isenberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
12 12 7 pgs notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 04/02 9:02 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew R. Herron on behalf of Michael Carbonara, Ibanera LLC. Attorney Andrew R. Herron added to party Michael Carbonara(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew R. Herron added to party Ibanera LLC(pty:dft). (Herron, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
11 11 service Summons Issued Fri 03/28 3:26 PM
Alias Summons Issued as to Ibanera LLC. (cds)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued Fri 03/28 3:24 PM
Alias Summons Issued as to Michael Carbonara. (cds)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Fri 03/28 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Alias Summons to Ibanera LLC by Deltec Bank & Trust Limited re1 Complaint,, filed by Deltec Bank & Trust Limited (Isenberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Fri 03/28 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Alias Summons to Michael Carbonara by Deltec Bank & Trust Limited re1 Complaint,, filed by Deltec Bank & Trust Limited (Isenberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
7 7 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/24 6:37 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deltec Bank & Trust Limited identifying Corporate Parent Deltec International Group for Deltec Bank & Trust Limited (Isenberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 03/10 1:29 PM
Summons Issued as to Ibanera LLC. (cds)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Mon 03/10 1:11 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) to Ibanera LLC by Deltec Bank & Trust Limited re1 Complaint,, filed by Deltec Bank & Trust Limited (Isenberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 03/04 1:15 PM
ORDER ON CASES WITH MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 3/4/2025. See attached document for full details. (jas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
3 3 3 pgs service Summons Issued Mon 03/03 12:51 PM
Summons Issued as to Michael Carbonara, Ibanera LLC, Ibanera Private Limited. (gqa)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 03/03 12:46 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Melissa Damian. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Ellen F. D'Angelo is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (gqa)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/03 12:38 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-18246809, payment transferred from : 25CV20966 Deltec Bank & Trust Limited v. Michael Carbonara, Ibanera LLC, Ibanera Private Limited, filed by Deltec Bank & Trust Limited.(Isenberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 32 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint,
Att: 2 Summon(s) Summons Ibanera LLC,
Att: 3 Summon(s) Summons Ibanera Private Limited,
Att: 4 2 pgs Summon(s) Summons Michael Carbonera,
Att: 5 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet