Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Charles E Atchley, Jr
Referred: Jill E Mccook
Case #: 3:25-cv-00088
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 8:39 AM EDT
Defendant
Gregg Lynch
Defendant
Tammy Lynch
Defendant
Patty Wells
Plaintiff
Ronald Rucker
129243 TROUSDALE TURNER CORRECTIONAL CENTER 140 MACON WAY
HARTSVILLE, TN 37074

GPO May 06 2025
ORDER re 10 MOTION TO HOLD 42 U.S.C. § 1983 COMPLAINT IN ABEYANCE filed by Ronald Rucker. The Court therefore DENIES Plaintiffs request to hold his Complaint in abeyance and DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE his request for the appointment of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 5/6/2025. c/m Ronald Rucker 129243, TROUSDALE TURNER CORRECTIONAL CENTER, 140 MACON WAY, HARTSVILLE, TN 37074. (MKM)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
11 11 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 05/06 12:15 PM
ORDER re 10 MOTION TO HOLD 42 U.S.C. § 1983 COMPLAINT IN ABEYANCE filed by Ronald Rucker. The Court therefore DENIES Plaintiffs request to hold his Complaint in abeyance and DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE his request for the appointment of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 5/6/2025. c/m Ronald Rucker 129243, TROUSDALE TURNER CORRECTIONAL CENTER, 140 MACON WAY, HARTSVILLE, TN 37074. (MKM)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
10 10 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 05/05 12:42 PM
MOTION TO HOLD 42 U.S.C. § 1983 COMPLAINT IN ABEYANCE by Ronald Rucker. (ABF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
9 9 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 04/03 1:35 PM
ORDER: The Court HOLDS IN ABEYANCE Plaintiffs Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs [Doc. 1]. Plaintiff SHALL file his amended complaint on or before May 2, 2025.Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 4/3/25. (c/m to Ronald Rucker #129243, TROUSDALE TURNER CORRECTIONAL CENTER, 140 MACON WAY, HARTSVILLE, TN 37074)(ABF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
8 8 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Mon 03/31 11:19 AM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Ronald Rucker. (MKM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Envelope
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 03/05 11:59 AM
ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff a prison account statement form. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order to pay the full filing fee or to submit the necessary documents.Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 3/5/25. (c/m along with inmate account statement to Ronald Rucker, 129243, TROUSDALE TURNER CORRECTIONAL CENTER, 140 MACON WAY, HARTSVILLE, TN 37074 and the Warden for Trousdale Turner) (ABF)
Related: [-]
6 6 5 pgs order Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Wed 03/05 11:46 AM
Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 3/5/25. (c/m to Ronald Rucker129243, TROUSDALE TURNER CORRECTIONAL CENTER, 140 MACON WAY, HARTSVILLE, TN 37074) (ABF)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Wed 03/05 11:45 AM
Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 3/5/25. (c/m to Ronald Rucker129243, TROUSDALE TURNER CORRECTIONAL CENTER, 140 MACON WAY, HARTSVILLE, TN 37074) (ABF)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Governing Depositions Wed 03/05 11:44 AM
Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 3/5/25. (c/m to Ronald Rucker129243, TROUSDALE TURNER CORRECTIONAL CENTER, 140 MACON WAY, HARTSVILLE, TN 37074) (ABF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
3 3 notice Notice re Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address Mon 03/03 1:23 PM
Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (c/m to Ronald Rucker #129243, TROUSDALE TURNER CORRECTIONAL CENTER, 140 MACON WAY, HARTSVILLE, TN 37074) (ABF)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Mon 03/03 1:22 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ronald Rucker.(ABF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Envelope
1 1 motion In Forma Pauperis (Proceed) Mon 03/03 1:21 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Rucker.(ABF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Envelope