Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Daniel P Collins
Case #: 2:25-bk-01783
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Avondale Capital LLC Avondale Capital L.L.C.
22521 Twilight Tral
Buckey, AZ 85326
Represented By
KEITH M. KNOWLTON
Keith M. Knowlton, L.L.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE 230 NORTH FIRST AVENUE SUITE 204
PHOENIX, AZ 85003


Docket last updated: 37 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
53 53 audio audio Wed 05/07 11:16 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [05/06/2025 11:08:03 AM]. File Size [ 25393 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:53:49 ]. (audiouser)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
57 57 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 05/08 9:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 52 Order
55 55 vCal CHAP Minute Entry Continued Thu 05/08 9:52 AM
Minutes of Hearing held on: 5/6/2025 Subject: Chapter 11 Status Conference, Expedited Hearing on Motion to Dismiss, Order to Show Cause Related [+] Continued Hearing set for 06/05/2025 at 11:00 AM at 230 N First Ave, Crtrm 603, Phoenix, AZ (RSB)
Related: [-] 36 Motion to Accelerate/Expedite,23 Order to Show Cause,7 Order Setting Chapter 11 Status Conference
52 52 order oGranting Tue 05/06 1:49 PM
ORDER Granting Application to Employ and Appoint Attorney and Keith M. Knowlton, LLC signed on 5/6/2025 Related [+] . (AEC)
Related: [-] 49 Notice of Lodging Proposed Order
Monday, May 05, 2025
54 54 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 05/07 9:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 51 Order Granting
51 51 order oGranting Mon 05/05 1:27 PM
ORDER Granting Application to Employ and Appoint a Real Estate Broker signed on 5/5/2025 Related [+] . (AEC)
Related: [-] 50 Notice of Lodging Proposed Order
50 50 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Mon 05/05 10:52 AM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order to Hire Broker filed by KEITH M. KNOWLTON of Keith M. Knowlton, LLC on behalf of Avondale Capital LLC Avondale Capital L.L.C. Related [+].(KNOWLTON, KEITH)
Related: [-] 32 Application to Employ
Att: 1 Appendix Mailing Matrix
Att: 2 Appendix Proposed Order
49 49 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Mon 05/05 10:37 AM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order to Employ Counsel filed by KEITH M. KNOWLTON of Keith M. Knowlton, LLC on behalf of Avondale Capital LLC Avondale Capital L.L.C..(KNOWLTON, KEITH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Mailing Matrix
Att: 2 Appendix Proposed Order
48 48 answer Response Mon 05/05 9:51 AM
Amended Response to Motion/Application to dismiss or lift Stay Related [+] filed by KEITH M. KNOWLTON of Keith M. Knowlton, LLC on behalf of Avondale Capital LLC Avondale Capital L.L.C.. (KNOWLTON, KEITH)
Related: [-] lated to motions(s)36
Att: 1 Appendix Gill PN
47 47 other Amendment to Schedules (D,E/F/34.00 Fee) Mon 05/05 9:00 AM
Amendment to Schedules (D,E/F/34.00 Fee) F filed by KEITH M. KNOWLTON of Keith M. Knowlton, LLC on behalf of Avondale Capital LLC Avondale Capital L.L.C.. Related [+](KNOWLTON, KEITH)
Related: [-] 38 Order Setting Hearing
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits re Promissory Note
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment Mon 05/05 9:54 AM
Receipt of Amendment to Schedules (D,E/F/34.00 Fee)([LINK:2:25-bk-01783-DPC] ) [other,1229] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A37469774. Fee amount 34.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
46 46 notice Notice of Filing Fri 05/02 4:14 PM
Notice of Filing Relevant Portions of 341 Transcript filed by KHALED TARAZI of Buchalter, A Professional Corporation on behalf of Community Valley Bank.(TARAZI, KHALED)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, May 01, 2025
45 45 answer Response Thu 05/01 3:15 PM
Response to Motion/Application to Dismiss or alternatively lift the automatic stary Related [+] filed by KEITH M. KNOWLTON of Keith M. Knowlton, LLC on behalf of Avondale Capital LLC Avondale Capital L.L.C.. (KNOWLTON, KEITH)
Related: [-] lated to motions(s)34
44 44 answer Response Thu 05/01 1:58 PM
Response to Order to Show Cause filed by KEITH M. KNOWLTON of Keith M. Knowlton, LLC on behalf of Avondale Capital LLC Avondale Capital L.L.C. Related [+]. (KNOWLTON, KEITH)
Related: [-] 23 Order to Show Cause