Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:Lynn Adelman
Case #: 2:25-cv-00313
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 5:17 AM CDT
Defendant
Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff
Shahida Qureshi
Represented By
Mark D DeBofsky
Debofsky Law Ltd
contact info
Glenn R Kantor
Kantor & Kantor
contact info
Jaclyn Denise Conover
Kantor & Kantor LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Wahid Qureshi
Represented By
Mark D DeBofsky
Debofsky Law Ltd
contact info
Glenn R Kantor
Kantor & Kantor
contact info
Jaclyn Denise Conover
Kantor & Kantor LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 05/21 11:35 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Transamerica Life Insurance Company filed by Wahid Qureshi, Shahida Qureshi.(Kantor, Glenn)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
12 12 misc Declaration Mon 05/05 3:47 PM
DECLARATION of Courtney Wunderlich (McCabe, Julianna)
Related: [-]
11 11 respm Brief in Support of Motion Mon 05/05 3:41 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company re10 MOTION to Dismiss . (McCabe, Julianna)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Dismiss Mon 05/05 3:12 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (McCabe, Julianna)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Mon 05/05 1:35 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (McCabe, Julianna)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement Mon 05/05 1:33 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (McCabe, Julianna)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/05 1:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Julianna T McCabe on behalf of Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Julianna Thomas McCabe (McCabe, Julianna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/25 8:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn R Kantor on behalf of Wahid Qureshi, Shahida Qureshi. Attorney(s) appearing: Glenn R. Kantor (Kantor, Glenn)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/17 1:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jaclyn Denise Conover on behalf of Wahid Qureshi, Shahida Qureshi. Attorney(s) appearing: Jaclyn D. Conover (Conover, Jaclyn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/11 5:38 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company - Waiver sent on 3/6/2025. (DeBofsky, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
3 3 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Thu 03/06 11:51 AM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Wahid Qureshi, Shahida Qureshi. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (DeBofsky, Mark)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal) Thu 03/06 11:50 AM
NOTICE by Wahid Qureshi, Shahida Qureshi of Interested Parties Plaintiff's (DeBofsky, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/03 12:45 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Transamerica Life Insurance Company by Wahid Qureshi, Shahida Qureshi. ( Filing Fee PAID $405 receipt number AWIEDC-4896304)(DeBofsky, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Mon 03/03 1:02 PM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman. Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available[LINK:here.] Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1, a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (mew)
Related: [-]