California Northern District Court
Judge:Charles R Breyer
Case #: 3:25-cv-02181
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 5:08 AM PDT
Defendant
Raiser CA LLC
Defendant
Raiser LLC
Defendant
Uber Technologies Inc
Plaintiff
S.L.
Represented By
Marlene Jaye Goldenberg
Nigh Goldenberg Raso & Vaughn
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 03, 2025
11 11 misc Refund Status Thu 04/03 4:35 PM
Refund Status re7 Application for Refund Approved. (rgh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/02 9:55 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by S.L.. Raiser CA LLC served on 3/26/2025, answer due 4/16/2025; Raiser LLC served on 3/26/2025, answer due 4/16/2025; Uber Technologies Inc served on 3/26/2025, answer due 4/16/2025. (Goldenberg, Marlene)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
9 9 service Summons Issued Fri 03/21 9:59 AM
Summons Issued as to Raiser CA LLC, Raiser LLC, Uber Technologies Inc. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Proposed Summons Fri 03/21 8:27 AM
Proposed Summons. (Goldenberg, Marlene)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
7 7 misc Application for Refund Thu 03/20 10:49 AM
Application for Refund, Receipt Number ACANDC-20410357 by S.L.. (Goldenberg, Marlene)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
6 6 misc Refund Status Fri 03/07 4:23 PM
Refund re2 Application for Refund Status: Declined. (kep, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Additional Parties Fri 03/07 1:52 PM
Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on1 Complaint, and have been added to this case: Raiser LLC. (This is a text-only entry.) (Goldenberg, Marlene)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 03/07 9:40 AM
Case assigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (kxo, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 03/07 10:10 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Not all parties listed in the complaint have been added to the docket. Please add the missing parties using the event Notice of Additional Parties. The event can be found at: Civil Events > Other Filings > Notices > Notice of Additional Parties.Re:1 Complaint, filed by S.L. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 03/06 9:57 AM
Civil Cover Sheet by S.L. . (Goldenberg, Marlene)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
2 2 misc Application for Refund Wed 03/05 12:18 PM
Application for Refund, Receipt Number ACANDC-20410357 by S.L.. (Goldenberg, Marlene)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
utility Electronic Filing Error Tue 03/04 10:22 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] .. Incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used. Current Revision is JS 44 Related [+] [err101]. Please e-file an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Event is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re:1 Complaint filed by S.L. (kxo, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] v. 12/2024
utility MDL Member Case Mon 03/10 7:30 AM
DIRECT MEMBER CASE OPENED: MDL 3084, Opened in California Northern District as 3:25-cv-2181-CRB cc: JPMDL (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/03 1:22 PM
COMPLAINT against S.L., Raiser CA LLC, Uber Technologies Inc ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20410586.). Filed by S.L..(Goldenberg, Marlene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet