Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Elizabeth W Hanes
Referred: Douglas E Miller
Case #: 2:25-cv-00122
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause29:2101 Workers Adjustment and Retraining Notification Act
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 6:14 AM EDT
Defendant
AMP United, L.L.C.
1170 E. Olney Rd.
Norfolk, VA 23504
Plaintiff
Daniel Lee Toner
Represented By
Brandon Thomas Bybee
Brandon T. Bybee, P.L.C.
contact info
Christian Lee Connell
Christian L. Connell, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Frederick M. Wilson
Represented By
Brandon Thomas Bybee
Brandon T. Bybee, P.L.C.
contact info
Christian Lee Connell
Christian L. Connell, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
5 5 order Rule 26(f) Pretrial Order Mon 05/12 4:11 PM
ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: An initial pretrial conference in this case will be scheduled for May 28, 2025 at 11:30 A.M., to be held by videoconference. SEE ORDER FOR DIRECTIVES. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 5/12/2025. (tameub, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 05/09 11:24 AM
Set Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/28/2025 at 11:30 AM (via Zoom) before District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes. (tameub, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
4 4 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Fri 05/02 11:52 AM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by AMP United, L.L.C.. (Abel, Christopher)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/02 10:53 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by AMP United, L.L.C..(Abel, Christopher)
Related: [-]
misc Refer for 16 b Fri 05/02 1:04 PM
Referred for 16(b). (epri, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 03/27 3:29 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Daniel Lee Toner, Frederick M. Wilson. AMP United, L.L.C. waiver sent on 3/5/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (Connell, Christian)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/03 3:50 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-10038350.), filed by Daniel Lee Toner, Frederick Morton Wilson.(Connell, Christian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Tue 03/04 9:58 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (alet)
Related: [-]