District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Dabney L Friedrich
Case #: 1:25-cv-00623
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 5:48 AM EDT
Defendant
FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC.
Represented By
Brenton Cooper
Baker Botts LLP
contact info
Vern Cassin
Baker Botts LLP
contact info
Aaron M. Streett
Baker & Botts, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By
Stephen M. Pezzi
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
DAVID SALTIEL
Represented By
Stephen M. Pezzi
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Benjamin Lehman
Doj-Civ
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMES J. LUKEZIC
Represented By
Kathleen Balthrop Havener
The Cullen Law Firm, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Stuart G. Nash
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Dochtor Daniel Kennedy
Hlbs Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
44 44 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 05/19 3:49 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint by DAVID SALTIEL.(Lehman, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 05/19 4:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting defendant David Saltiel's unopposed44 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Accordingly, the defendant shall file his motion to dismiss the plaintiff's40 Amended Complaint on or before May 30, 2025. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 19, 2025. (lcdlf2)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 18, 2025
order Scheduling Order Sun 05/18 1:09 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties'42 Joint Status Report, the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: the defendants shall file any motions to dismiss the plaintiffs40 Amended Complaint on or before May 23, 2025; the plaintiff shall file his response on or before June 16, 2025; and the defendants shall file any reply on or before July 3, 2025. The Court will schedule a hearing on the motions in a forthcoming order. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 18, 2025. (lcdlf2)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
43 43 respm Reply to opposition to motion Fri 05/16 3:54 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re1 Motion for TRO, filed by JAMES J. LUKEZIC. (Havener, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
42 42 misc Status Report Thu 05/08 4:45 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by JAMES J. LUKEZIC. (Havener, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
41 41 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 04/24 4:52 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (REDLINED COPY) against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by JAMES J. LUKEZIC.(Havener, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
40 40 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 04/24 4:44 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by JAMES J. LUKEZIC.(Havener, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
39 39 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/24 2:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Balthrop Havener on behalf of JAMES J. LUKEZIC (Havener, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 04/16 6:42 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties'37 Joint Status Report and 38 Motion for Alternative Schedule, it is ordered that the 38 Motion is GRANTED. The Court's Minute Order of April 9, 2025, is VACATED and all pending deadlines are STAYED. Absent a motion, the plaintiff shall file his amended complaint on or before April 24, 2025, and the parties shall file a joint status report, proposing a schedule for further proceedings, on or before May 8, 2025. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 16, 2025. (lcdlf2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
38 38 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/16 9:15 AM
MOTION for Alternative Schedule by DAVID SALTIEL. (See docket entry37 to view document) (zdp)
Related: [-]
37 37 misc Status Report Tue 04/15 6:52 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT AND REQUEST FOR ALTERNATIVE SCHEDULE by DAVID SALTIEL. (Lehman, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 04/14 6:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the plaintiff's25 Motion to Withdraw, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Attorney Dochtor Daniel Kennedy is terminated from the case. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 14, 2025. (lcdlf2)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 04/14 6:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the plaintiff's24 Motion to Withdraw, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Attorney Stuart G. Nash is terminated from the case. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 14, 2025. (lcdlf2)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
36 36 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Fri 04/11 10:40 AM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC.(Cassin, Vern)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Memorandum and Opinion Order (25-447)
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 04/09 12:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the plaintiff's unopposed35 Motion for Extension of Time, the plaintiff shall file a reply in support of his1 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and an opposition to the defendant's29 Motion to Dismiss on or before May 9, 2025 . The defendant shall file any reply in support of its29 Motion on or before May 16, 2025 . The Court will determine at that time whether a hearing on the motions is necessary. If the Court schedules a hearing on the motions, the hearing will occur on May 22 , 23, 28, 29, or sometime thereafter. Accordingly, on or before April 15, 2025 , the parties shall file a joint status report indicating their availability for a hearing on or after those dates. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 9, 2025. (lcdlf2)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 04/09 10:02 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/15/2025. (smc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
35 35 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/08 5:10 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by JAMES J. LUKEZIC.(Havener, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
34 34 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/08 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brenton Cooper on behalf of FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC. (Cooper, Brenton)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/08 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Balthrop Havener on behalf of JAMES J. LUKEZIC (Havener, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 04/04 4:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting FINRA's32 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Accordingly, defendant FINRA shall answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint within 21 days of the Court's ruling on the plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 4, 2025. (lcdlf2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
32 32 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 04/03 10:38 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC..(Cassin, Vern)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
31 31 respm Response to motion Thu 04/03 10:29 PM
RESPONSE re1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC..(Cassin, Vern)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19,
Att: 20 Exhibit 20,
Att: 21 Text of Proposed Order
30 30 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Thu 04/03 10:07 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re1 Motion for TRO, filed by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Pezzi, Stephen)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Dismiss Thu 04/03 10:06 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION.(Pezzi, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Ex. 1 - FINRA Disciplinary Complaint (Dec. 17, 2024),
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
28 28 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 04/03 11:12 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Dochtor D. Kennedy by JAMES J. LUKEZIC. (Kennedy, Dochtor)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of QC **DO NOT USE- FOR REPORTING PURPOSES ONLY.** Thu 04/03 8:33 AM
NOTICE OF ERROR re25 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; emailed to stuart.nash@hklaw.com, cc'd 10 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please note the following for future filings; do not refile document , 2. Signature on Filing must match PACER account (mg, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
27 27 service Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Wed 04/02 2:58 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/28/2025. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/27/2025. (Nash, Stuart)
Related: [-]
26 26 service Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Wed 04/02 2:57 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General March 25, 2025. (Nash, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
25 25 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 04/01 10:52 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Dochtor D. Kennedy) by JAMES J. LUKEZIC. (Nash, Stuart)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 04/01 10:49 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by JAMES J. LUKEZIC. (Nash, Stuart)
Related: [-]
order .Order Tue 04/01 2:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER. On or before April 8, 2025, the plaintiff shall (1) file any opposition to his counsel's25 26 Motions to Withdraw as Attorney and (2) inform the Court whether he has or intends to retain new counsel or proceed pro se. At this time, the briefing schedule for the motion for a preliminary injunction remains in effect: the defendants shall file their opposition on or before April 3, 2025, and the plaintiff shall file his reply on or before April 10, 2025; if the Court determines that a hearing on the motion is necessary, it will hold one on April 17, 2025 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 24A. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 1, 2025. (lcdlf2)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 04/01 3:00 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall (1) file any opposition to his counsel's25 26 Motions to Withdraw as Attorney and (2) inform the Court whether he has or intends to retain new counsel or proceed pro se by 4/8/2025. (smc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
23 23 service Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Thu 03/27 10:40 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General March 19, 2025. (Nash, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/20 4:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron M. Streett on behalf of FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC. (Streett, Aaron)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/20 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Lehman on behalf of DAVID SALTIEL (Lehman, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/20 11:00 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions.] So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 20, 2025. (lcdlf2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
20 20 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/19 2:23 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Aaron Streett, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11553348. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC..(Cassin, Vern)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, March 14, 2025
19 19 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Fri 03/14 1:41 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC. served on 3/13/2025 (Nash, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
18 18 misc Sealed Document Thu 03/13 10:07 AM
SEALED DOCUMENT (Exhibits) filed by FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC.. re1 Motion for TRO,. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 6,
Att: 2 Exhibit 7,
Att: 3 Exhibit 8,
Att: 4 Exhibit 9
order Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal Wed 03/12 5:52 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting FINRA's sealed12 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court shall place UNDER SEAL the exhibits containing personal identifying information: Dkts. 1-9, 1-10, 1-11, 1-12, and 1-13. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 12, 2025. (lcdlf2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/11 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Vern Cassin on behalf of FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC. (Cassin, Vern)
Related: [-]
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 03/11 11:14 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the16 Joint Status Report, the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: the defendants shall file their opposition to the motion for preliminary injunction on or before April 3, 2025; and the plaintiff shall file his reply on or before April 10, 2025. A hearing on the preliminary injunction shall be held on April 17, 2025 at 11:30 a.m. in person in Courtroom 24A. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 11, 2025. (lcdlf1)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 03/11 11:48 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 4/17/2025 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 24A (In Person) before Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (smc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
16 16 misc Status Report Mon 03/10 7:18 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC.. (Cassin, Vern)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Mon 03/10 4:50 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DAVID SALTIEL served on 3/7/2025 (Nash, Stuart)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Mon 03/10 4:50 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION served on 3/7/2025 (Nash, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
13 13 misc Redacted Document Fri 03/07 5:26 PM
REDACTED DOCUMENT- Notice of Redacted Documents by FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC..(Cassin, Vern)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit
12 12 motion Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal Fri 03/07 5:18 PM
SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Cassin, Vern)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order
11 11 3 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 03/07 11:51 AM
ORDER denying the1 Motion for TRO. See text for details. On or before March 10, 2025, the parties shall file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 7, 2025. (lcdlf1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
10 10 misc Status Report Thu 03/06 11:59 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC.. (Cassin, Vern)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status Thu 03/06 8:55 AM
NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re8 STATUS REPORT by FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC.. (Cassin, Vern). Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 3/13/2025. (zapb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/05 4:56 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Dochtor D. Kennedy, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11522580. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JAMES J. LUKEZIC.(Nash, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
8 8 misc Status Report Wed 03/05 2:05 PM
STATUS REPORT by FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC.. (Cassin, Vern)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/05 1:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Pezzi on behalf of UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION, DAVID SALTIEL (Pezzi, Stephen)
Related: [-]
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 03/05 2:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the8 Status Report, the parties are directed to file a joint status report on or before 12:00 p.m. on March 6, 2025, (1) setting forth the parties' respective positions on the resolution of the TRO, and (2) if necessary, proposing a briefing and hearing schedule for any TRO. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 5, 2025. (lcdlf1)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/05 5:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions.] So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 5, 2025. (lcdlf1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
6 6 order .Order Tue 03/04 12:58 PM
STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 4, 2025. (lcdlf1)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Tue 03/04 11:48 AM
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mg)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Request for Summons to Issue Tue 03/04 9:30 AM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to Attorney General filed by JAMES J. LUKEZIC.(Nash, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons to U.S. Attorney
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 03/04 9:05 AM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC., DAVID SALTIEL, UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION.(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
2 2 17 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/04 8:25 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BDCDC-11516082) filed by JAMES J. LUKEZIC.(Nash, Stuart) Modified receipt information on 3/4/2025 (znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons to Financial Industry Regulatory Authority,
Att: 3 Summons to Securities and Exchange Commission,
Att: 4 Summons to David Saltiel
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 03/04 9:02 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (znmw)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Error- New Case Tue 03/04 9:06 AM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding2 Complaint,. The following error(s) need correction: Missing summonses- U.S. government. When naming a U.S. government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (znmw)
Related: [-]
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 03/04 2:16 PM
MINUTE ORDER directing the parties to file, on or before 2:00 p.m. on March 5, 2025, a joint status report proposing a schedule for briefing and any hearing on the plaintiff's1 Motion for TRO or Preliminary Injunction. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 4, 2025. (lcdlf1) Modified on 3/4/2025 (smc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
1 1 motion Temporary Restraining Order Mon 03/03 5:51 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by James J Lukezic.(Nash, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Affidavit of James Lukezic,
Att: 4 Affidavit of Austin Davis,
Att: 5 Exhibit 1,
Att: 6 Exhibit 2,
Att: 7 Exhibit 3,
Att: 8 Exhibit 4,
Att: 9 Exhibit 5,
Att: 10 Exhibit 6,
Att: 11 Exhibit 7,
Att: 12 Exhibit 8,
Att: 13 Exhibit 9
misc Filing Fee Received Mon 03/03 6:47 PM
Filing fee received: $ 405, receipt number: BDCDC-11516082. (zjd)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Error- New Case Mon 03/03 6:57 PM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. The following errors need correction: (1.) Missing complaint. Please file a complaint pursuant to FRCvP Rule 3. (2.) Missing civil cover sheet. Please file the Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) form at www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms using the event Civil Cover Sheet. (3.) Missing summonses. Please locate the summons applicable to your case at www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms and file using the event Request for Summons to issue. Other COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business on Tuesday, March 4, 2025. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zjd)
Related: [-]