North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Richard E Myers, II
Referred: Brian S Meyers
Case #: 7:25-cv-00390
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
CauseCamp Lejeune Justice Act of 2022
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 8:34 AM EDT
Defendant
United States of America
P.O. Box 227 Washington
Washington, DC 20044
Interested Party
Torts Branch USDOJ
Plaintiff
Norman Franell
Represented By
Miriam Agrait
contact info
Kevin Donovan
Rubenstein Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, March 07, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Special Appearance Fri 03/07 8:08 AM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Miriam Agrait on behalf of Norman Franell. (Agrait, Miriam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
3 3 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit Wed 03/05 2:42 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit filed by Norman Franell. (Donovan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Receipt of Payment
order Text Order Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/05 4:44 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission. Attorney Miriam Fresco Agrait must file a notice of special appearance within ten days, unless one has already been filed. Local Counsel is DIRECTED to serve this order on out-of-state counsel. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/5/2025. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/03 2:11 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin Donovan on behalf of Norman Franell. (Donovan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/03 2:10 PM
SHORT-FORM COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCEDC-8004916.), filed by Norman Franell. (Donovan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
service Notice of Camp Lejeune Justice Act Case Mon 03/03 3:43 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE. This action is governed by Standing Order 23-SO-1. Pursuant to that Order, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing System, notifying the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Civil Division, Torts Branch, Environmental Torts Litigation Office, United States Department of Justice of the case. Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. No summons will issue. Service of the Complaint and any attachments thereto will be completed by a regenerated Notice of Electronic Filing to follow immediately. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]