Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:John A Gibney, Jr
Case #: 3:25-cv-00161
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 6:15 AM EDT
Defendant
Nick Feaster
Defendant
Groundworks Operations, LLC
Defendant
JES Foundation Repair LLC
Defendant
Matt Malone
Plaintiff
Riley Thornock
3017 Mountain Rd. PO Box 843
Glen Allen, VA 23060


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Order on Motion to Stay Wed 04/16 3:53 PM
ORDER that the Court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART Thornock's motion to seal. (ECF No.7 .) The Court GRANTS the motion as to the two medical reports and DIRECTS the Clerk to file those reports under seal. (ECF No.7 -2, at 1-5.) The Court DENIES the motion to seal as to the police crash report. Instead, the Court DIRECTS Thornock to redact any personal identifying information from the police crash report as set forth in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and refile the report with the Clerk's office. Upon due consideration, the Court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART Thornock's motion to stay. (ECF No.9 .) The Court has not yet scheduled an initial pretrial conference in this case; discovery has not opened; and the Court is undertaking an initial review of Thornock's amended complaint, meaning no defendants have been served or entered their appearance. The Court, however, does not believe a 120-day stay is appropriate at this juncture. Accordingly, the Court STAYS this case until Friday, May 16, 2025. The Court WITHHOLDS ruling on the pending motion to appoint counsel, (ECF No.8 ), until after the conclusion of the stay. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 4/16/2025. (Copy of Order mailed to Thornock as directed.) (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
9 9 motion Stay Mon 04/14 11:32 AM
MOTION to Stay Proceedings Due to Medical Impairment and Litigation Hardship by Riley Thornock.(jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Rule 83.1 Certification
8 8 motion Appoint Counsel Mon 04/14 11:31 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel Due to Meical Impairment and Case Complexity by Riley Thornock.(jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Rule 83.1 Certification
7 7 motion Seal Mon 04/14 11:27 AM
MOTION to File Supporting Materials Under Seal by Riley Thornock. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Rule 83.1 Certification;
Att: 2 Exhibit Medical records/Police report
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
6 6 notice Notice (other) Wed 03/26 3:34 PM
Addendum for Compliance and Clarification by Riley Thornock(adun, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Rule 83.1
Monday, March 24, 2025
5 5 2 pgs respoth Memorandum Mon 03/24 2:02 PM
Memorandum of Legal Significance filed by Riley Thornock.(ewat, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Rule 83.1
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/24 1:57 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nick Feaster, Groundworks Operations, LLC, JES Foundation Repair LLC, Matt Malone, filed by Riley Thornock.(ewat, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Rule 83.1
Thursday, March 06, 2025
3 3 cmp Complaint Thu 03/06 1:13 PM
COMPLAINT against Nick Feaster, Groundworks Operations, LLC, JES Foundation Repair LLC, Matt Malone filed by Riley Thornock.(jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit E,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Local Rule Certification,
Att: 7 Proposed summonses
2 2 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 03/06 1:04 PM
ORDER that the Court FINDS Thornock unable to pay the costs of proceeding in this case, GRANTS his motion, and DIRECTS the Clerk to docket the complaint. The Court has reviewed the complaint filed along with Thornock's application, and it is deficient in two respects. Accordingly, the Court DIRECTS Thornock to file an amended complaint within twenty-one (21) days of this Order. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 3/6/2025. (Copy of Order mailed to Thornock as directed.) (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 03/03 4:56 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Riley Thornock.(jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 Local Rule Certification,
Att: 8 Proposed Summons