Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:James M Moody Jr
Case #: 4:25-cv-00179
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 5:15 AM CDT
Defendant
John Lundberg
Defendant
Nicole Walsh
Defendant
Arkansas Department of Education
Defendant
Arkansas School for the Deaf
Plaintiff
Christian Daniel Rilloraza
42036 Moraga Road Apt 14H
Temecula, CA 92591
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Little Rock Police Department
Terminated: 03/13/2025
Defendant
Little Rock, City of
Terminated: 03/19/2025

GPO Mar 13 2025
ORDER granting 1 Christian Daniel Rilloraza's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; dismissing Mr. Rillozara's claims against the LRPD; directing the Clerk to issue summonses for the Defendant Walsh and Lundberg as provided in the Complaint; and directing the U.S.Marshal for the Eastern District of Arkansas to serve summonses and 2 Complaint on Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs via certified mail with a return receipt requested and delivery restricted. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 03/13/2025. (llg)
GPO Mar 19 2025
ORDER granting 4 motion for clarification; granting 5 motion to amend to add the City of Little Rock as a named defendant; directing the Clerk to add the City of Little Rock as a named defendant; dismissing Mr. Rillozara's claims against the City of Little Rock; and denying without prejudice 6 motion to appoint counsel. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/19/2025. (jak)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/07 2:58 PM
NOTICE of Filing certificate of service by Christian Daniel Rilloraza re18 19 17 (jap)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Sanctions Wed 05/07 2:49 PM
MOTION for Rule 11 Sanctions by Christian Daniel Rilloraza. (jap)
Related: [-]
18 18 brief Brief in Support Wed 05/07 2:36 PM
BRIEF in Support re17 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. Filed by Christian Daniel Rilloraza. (jap)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Response to Motion Wed 05/07 2:31 PM
OPPOSITION to Defendants'15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Christian Daniel Rilloraza. (jap)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
16 16 brief Brief in Support Tue 04/29 6:23 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re15 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Arkansas Department of Education, Arkansas School for the Deaf, John Lundberg, Nicole Walsh. (Broyles, Jordan)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 04/29 6:22 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Arkansas Department of Education, Arkansas School for the Deaf, John Lundberg, Nicole Walsh (Broyles, Jordan)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/29 6:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Broyles on behalf of Arkansas Department of Education, Arkansas School for the Deaf, John Lundberg, Nicole Walsh (Broyles, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/24 2:44 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Nicole Walsh served on 4/8/2025. (ajj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
12 12 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Wed 04/23 4:17 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to John Lundberg. (ajj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 04/16 10:12 AM
SECOND AMENDED Complaint with Jury Demand against Little Rock, City of, John Lundberg, Nicole Walsh, Arkansas School for the Deaf, Arkansas Department of Education, filed by Christian Daniel Rilloraza. No summons issued. (jap)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion for Reconsideration Tue 04/01 9:55 AM
ORDER granting8 and9 Motions; and giving Mr. Rilloraza until 04/28/2025 to file his second amended complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 04/01/2025. (llg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
9 9 motion Reconsideration Wed 03/26 2:24 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration of7 Order of Dismissal of City of Little Rock filed by Christian Daniel Rilloraza. (fjg)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Leave to File Document Wed 03/26 2:23 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Christian Daniel Rilloraza. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Wed 03/19 1:44 PM
ORDER granting4 motion for clarification; granting5 motion to amend to add the City of Little Rock as a named defendant; directing the Clerk to add the City of Little Rock as a named defendant; dismissing Mr. Rillozara's claims against the City of Little Rock; and denying without prejudice6 motion to appoint counsel. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/19/2025. (jak)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Appoint Counsel Wed 03/19 12:17 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Christian Daniel Rilloraza. (jap)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Amend/Correct Wed 03/19 12:14 PM
MOTION to Amend2 Complaint by Christian Daniel Rilloraza. (jap)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Clarify Wed 03/19 12:11 PM
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
3 3 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Thu 03/13 3:53 PM
ORDER granting1 Christian Daniel Rilloraza's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; dismissing Mr. Rillozara's claims against the LRPD; directing the Clerk to issue summonses for the Defendant Walsh and Lundberg as provided in the Complaint; and directing the U.S.Marshal for the Eastern District of Arkansas to serve summonses and2 Complaint on Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs via certified mail with a return receipt requested and delivery restricted. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 03/13/2025. (llg)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Thu 03/13 4:01 PM
Summons Issued as to Nicole Walsh and John Lundberg and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (llg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
2 2 cmp Complaint Mon 03/03 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Christian Daniel Rilloraza. (llg)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 03/03 3:48 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christian Daniel Rilloraza. (llg)
Related: [-]