Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steve C Jones
Case #: 1:14-cv-03964
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2014
Terminated:Apr 06, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 10, 2015 10:40 AM EDT
Defendant
City of Fairburn, Georgia
Represented By
Brian R. Dempsey
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Theodore Freeman
Freeman Mathis & Gary
contact info
Defendant
Charles L. Israel
Represented By
Brian R. Dempsey
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Theodore Freeman
Freeman Mathis & Gary
contact info
Defendant
James A. McCarthy
Represented By
Brian R. Dempsey
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Theodore Freeman
Freeman Mathis & Gary
contact info
Plaintiff
Jessie Nell Smith
Represented By
David B. Fife
Atkins & Fife, LLC
contact info
William J.S. Atkins
Edmond, Lindsay & Hoffler, LLP
contact info


1. Fairburn woman files federal lawsuit for 2013 arrest (wsbtv.com)
Submitted Mon 01/05/2015
Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 06, 2017
83 83 3 pgs misc Satisfaction of Judgment Thu 04/06 1:00 PM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT of Bill of Costs and Stipulation by City of Fairburn, Georgia, Charles L. Israel, James A. McCarthy. (Dempsey, Brian)
Related: [-]