Illinois Southern District Court
Judge:David W Dugan
Case #: 3:25-cv-00295
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2025
Case in other court:Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Illinois, 2025-MR-5
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 4:51 AM CDT
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company
Represented By
James P. DuChateau
Heplerbroom, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrea Cisco
Represented By
Daniel R. Price
Wham & Wham Lawyers
contact info
Curtis W. Martin
Shaw & Martin
contact info


Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 04/17 2:30 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Andrea Cisco.(Price, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
15 15 order Scheduling Order Thu 04/17 1:35 PM
SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery due by 12/19/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 1/16/2026. Stipulation Selecting Mediator to be filed by 5/8/2025. Mandatory Mediation Session to be completed by 11/3/2025. Mandatory Mediation Program Completion due by 12/31/2025. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 4/17/2025.(dmw2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 JROP
14 14 order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 04/17 1:33 PM
ORDER. The Court adopts the Joint Report of the Parties as submitted. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference set for 4/23/2025 is CANCELLED . Should the parties seek to amend the trial date, a written motion will be required. A Status Conference is set for 1/20/2026 at 3:00 PM via Zoom video conference before Judge David W. Dugan. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 4/17/2025. (dmw2)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Thu 04/17 9:16 AM
ORDER regarding the Entry of Appearance of Daniel R. Price for Plaintiff (Doc. 11) and the Proposed Consent Order Granting the Substitution of Attorney (Doc. 12). The latter filing is signed by Plaintiff, Mr. Price, and Plaintiff's original attorney, Mr. Curtis W. Martin. All consent to the substitution of Mr. Price for Mr. Martin as counsel for Plaintiff. Accordingly, interpreting the Proposed Consent Order as a Motion for the Substitution of Counsel, that request is GRANTED and Mr. Price is SUBSTITUTED for Mr. Martin as counsel for Plaintiff. Mr. Martin is TERMINATED from the docket. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 4/17/2025. (jnh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
12 12 motion Substitute Attorney Wed 04/16 3:35 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Andrea Cisco. (Price, Daniel)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/16 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R. Price on behalf of Andrea Cisco (Price, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 04/11 10:47 AM
NOTICE RESETTING Hearing: At the joint request of counsel, the Scheduling Conference is RESET for 4/23/2025 at 3:00 PM via Zoom video conference before Judge David W. Dugan. The Joint Report of Parties shall be submitted, via email at DWDpd@ilsd.uscourt.gov, on or before 4/16/2025. (dmw2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 03/11 7:01 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company.(DuChateau, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 01,
Att: 2 Exhibit 02,
Att: 3 Exhibit 03
8 8 7 pgs order Order Tue 03/11 1:48 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 3/11/2025. (dmw2)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Tue 03/11 1:47 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 3/11/2025. (dmw2)
Related: [-]
6 6 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 03/11 1:46 PM
ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2025 at 3:00 PM via Zoom video conference before Judge David W. Dugan. The Parties will receive the appropriate Zoom invitation via email from the Court. The Joint Report of the Parties is due on or before 4/9/2025 and shall be submitted via email to DWDpd@ilsd.uscourts.gov. The Parties are instructed to use the correct form for the Joint Report of the Parties which can be found attached to this Order. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 3/11/2025. (dmw2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 JROP
5 5 notice CJRA Track Tue 03/11 1:42 PM
CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2026 at 10:00 AM and Bench Trial set for 5/18/2026 at 9:00 AM both in the East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge David W. Dugan. (dmw2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/04 8:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by James P. DuChateau on behalf of All Defendants (DuChateau, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case Opening Notification Tue 03/04 7:52 AM
Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge David W. Dugan assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:25-cv-00295-DWD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (jdc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement Mon 03/03 2:42 PM
Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group for Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company. (DuChateau, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 03/03 2:37 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Illinois, case number 2025-MR-5 ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AILSDC-5599215), filed by Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company.(DuChateau, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 01,
Att: 2 Exhibit 02,
Att: 3 Exhibit 03,
Att: 4 Exhibit 04,
Att: 5 Exhibit 05,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet