California Northern District Court
Judge:Jon S Tigar
Case #: 4:25-cv-02197
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 5:10 AM PDT
Defendant
ProctorU, Inc.
Plaintiff
Trisha A.M.
Represented By
Joseph G. Sauder
Sauder Schelkopf LLC
contact info
Alison Marie Bernal
Nye Stirling Hale & Miller, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
21 21 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Wed 05/14 12:46 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Leheny, Emma)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 05/14 12:45 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by ProctorU, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent MZR Buyer, LLC for ProctorU, Inc.. (Leheny, Emma)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 05/14 12:41 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ProctorU, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent MZR Buyer, LLC for ProctorU, Inc.. (Leheny, Emma)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
18 18 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 05/13 1:13 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Bernal, Alison)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/02 10:32 AM
APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE; ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Joseph G. Sauder. (dms, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/02 6:33 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20521132.) filed by Trisha A.M..(Sauder, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit (Certificate of Good Standing)
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
15 15 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Wed 03/26 2:47 PM
CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ZOOM HEARING. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/10/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/17/2025 at 02:00 PM - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 06/16/2025 at 2:00PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (dms, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
14 14 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/26 1:50 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is directly assigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order Relating Case Wed 03/26 7:32 AM
RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on 03/26/2025. Case no. 25-cv-2095-JST is related to Case no. 25-cv-2197-HSG. (dms, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
12 12 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Tue 03/25 7:09 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference via a Zoom webinar has been set for June 17, 2025, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by June 10th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:25-cv-02197-HSG. All attorneys and pro se litigants appearing for the case management conference are required to join at least 15 minutes before the hearing to check-in with the CRD. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/hsg] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
11 11 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/24 3:22 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned using a proportionate, random and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Mon 03/24 1:09 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 03/24 6:46 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Trisha A.M... (Bernal, Alison)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Fri 03/21 12:17 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 4/4/2025. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
7 7 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 03/06 5:34 PM
Revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/28/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 03/04 10:51 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/28/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/24/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (kam2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 03/04 10:48 AM
Summons Issued as to ProctorU, Inc.. (kam2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 03/04 10:43 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/18/2025. (kam2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 03/04 8:58 AM
Civil Cover Sheet by Trisha A.M. Amended . (Bernal, Alison)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Tue 03/04 8:05 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Use Updated Civil Cover Sheet www.cand.uscourts.gov. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re:1 Complaint filed by Trisha A.M. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 03/03 4:27 PM
Proposed Summons. (Bernal, Alison)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/03 4:25 PM
COMPLAINT against ProctorU, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20412229.). Filed by Trisha A.M..(Bernal, Alison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Affidavit