Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Robert J Jonker
Referred: Maarten Vermaat
Case #: 2:25-cv-00036
Nature of Suit120 Contract - Marine
Cause28:1333 Admiralty
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 6:18 AM EDT
counter-claimant
Mackinac Island, City of
Represented By
Larry J. Saylor
Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone Plc (detroit)
contact info
Kimberly L. Scott
Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone Plc (ann Arbor)
contact info
Michael E. Cavanaugh
Fraser Trebilcock Davis & Dunlap Pc (lansing)
contact info
counter-defendant
Mackinac Island Ferry Company
Represented By
Samuel Peter Blatchley
Eckland & Blando, Llp (ma)
contact info
Robert T. Dube, Jr.
Eckland & Blando, Llp (mn)
contact info
Vince C. Reuter
Eckland & Blando, Llp (mn)
contact info
counter-defendant
Shepler's Inc.
Represented By
Samuel Peter Blatchley
Eckland & Blando, Llp (ma)
contact info
Robert T. Dube, Jr.
Eckland & Blando, Llp (mn)
contact info
Vince C. Reuter
Eckland & Blando, Llp (mn)
contact info
defendant
Mackinac Island, City of
Represented By
Larry J. Saylor
Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone Plc (detroit)
contact info
Kimberly L. Scott
Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone Plc (ann Arbor)
contact info
Michael E. Cavanaugh
Fraser Trebilcock Davis & Dunlap Pc (lansing)
contact info
plaintiff
Mackinac Island Ferry Company
Represented By
Samuel Peter Blatchley
Eckland & Blando, Llp (ma)
contact info
Robert T. Dube, Jr.
Eckland & Blando, Llp (mn)
contact info
Vince C. Reuter
Eckland & Blando, Llp (mn)
contact info
plaintiff
Shepler's Inc.
Represented By
Samuel Peter Blatchley
Eckland & Blando, Llp (ma)
contact info
Robert T. Dube, Jr.
Eckland & Blando, Llp (mn)
contact info
Vince C. Reuter
Eckland & Blando, Llp (mn)
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Order on Proposed Order Tue 04/29 10:36 AM
ORDER granting10 motion for extension of time to answer; extension granted to 5/19/25; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (sjc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
16 16 respm Response to Motion Mon 04/28 5:05 PM
RESPONSE TO MOTION for extension of time to file answer re7 10 filed by Mackinac Island, City of (Saylor, Larry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Mackinac Island Vows to Countersue Ferry Companies Amid Monopoly Dispute, Crain's Grand Rapids Business, March 7, 2025,
Att: 2 Exhibit B. Mackinac Island Says it Will Countersue Ferry Owner for Violating Anti-Trust Laws, MLive, March 5, 2025,
Att: 3 Exhibit C. Are Mackinac Island Ferries a Monopoly, Bridge Michigan March 4, 2025,
Att: 4 Exhibit D. City of Mackinac Island to Countersue Ferry Companies, Wood TV, March 6, 2025,
Att: 5 Exhibit E. Island Will Countersue Shepler's, Arnold Ferry Companies, Mackinac Island Town Crier, March 5, 2025,
Att: 6 Exhibit F. Mackinac Island Mayor City will Defend Against Meritless Lawsuit, Mackinac Island Town Crier, March 6, 2025
Friday, April 25, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order Fri 04/25 6:42 PM
ORDER ; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Jonker, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
14 14 motion Proposed Order Thu 04/24 7:15 PM
PROPOSED ORDER regarding Motion for an Extension to Answer Counterclaim by plaintiffs Shepler's Inc., Mackinac Island Ferry Company Related [+]
Related: [-] uter, Vince
13 13 respm Certificate Regarding Motion Concurrence Thu 04/24 7:14 PM
CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to file answer re7 10 filed by Shepler's Inc., Mackinac Island Ferry Company Related [+]
Related: [-] uter, Vince
12 12 misc Declaration Thu 04/24 7:06 PM
DECLARATION re10 of Amy Cline by plaintiffs Shepler's Inc., Mackinac Island Ferry Company Related [+]
Related: [-] uter, Vince
11 11 respm Brief in Support of a Motion Thu 04/24 7:03 PM
BRIEF in support of MOTION for extension of time to file answer re7 10 filed by Shepler's Inc., Mackinac Island Ferry Company Related [+]
Related: [-] uter, Vince
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 04/24 7:01 PM
MOTION for extension of time to file answer re7 by plaintiffs Shepler's Inc., Mackinac Island Ferry Company ; Related [+]
Related: [-] uter, Vince
Friday, April 18, 2025
9 9 5 pgs order Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Fri 04/18 9:52 AM
ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 5/28/2025 at 10:00 AM at 235 Federal Building, Marquette, MI before Judge Robert J. Jonker; joint status report due by 5/21/2025 ; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam) Modified text per chambers on 4/18/2025 (slk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
8 8 misc Jury Demand Tue 04/08 4:47 PM
DEMAND for TRIAL BY JURY by defendant Mackinac Island, City of, counter-claimant Mackinac Island, City of (Scott, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
notice Attorney Appearance Fri 04/04 10:31 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Michael E. Cavanaugh on behalf of defendant Mackinac Island, City of, counter-claimant Mackinac Island, City of (Cavanaugh, Michael)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Fri 04/04 4:31 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Larry J. Saylor on behalf of defendant Mackinac Island, City of, counter-claimant Mackinac Island, City of (Saylor, Larry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Thu 04/03 8:00 PM
City of Mackinac Island's ANSWER to complaint1 and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint and , COUNTERCLAIM against Mackinac Island Ferry Company, Shepler's Inc. by Mackinac Island, City of (Scott, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. City of Mackinac Island, Regular City Council Meeting Minutes (December 11, 2024),
Att: 2 Exhibit B. City of Mackinac Island, Regular City Council Meeting Minutes (January 8, 2025),
Att: 3 Exhibit 1. Franchise Agreement (June 27, 2012),
Att: 4 Exhibit 2. Amendment and Restatement of Franchise (November 13, 2023),
Att: 5 Exhibit 3. Assignment and Assumption of Contracts (November 10, 2016),
Att: 6 Exhibit 4. Amendment and Restatement of Franchise (October 18, 2023),
Att: 7 Exhibit 5. Hoffmann Marine Acquires Mackinac Island Ferry Company (June 29, 2024),
Att: 8 Exhibit 6. Jenny Gezella Profile, Hoffmann Family of Companies,
Att: 9 Exhibit 7. Mackinac Island Town Crier (July 20-26, 2024)
notice Attorney Appearance Thu 04/03 7:01 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Kimberly L. Scott on behalf of defendant Mackinac Island, City of (Scott, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 03/13 1:53 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Shepler's Inc., Mackinac Island Ferry Company as to Mackinac Island, City of waiver sent on 3/6/2025, answer due 5/5/2025 (Dube, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
notice Attorney Appearance Mon 03/10 12:53 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Vince C. Reuter on behalf of plaintiffs Shepler's Inc., Mackinac Island Ferry Company Related [+]
Related: [-] uter, Vince
Friday, March 07, 2025
5 5 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/07 12:02 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mackinac Island Ferry Company identifying Corporate Parent Osprey Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Hoffman Star Line LLC for Mackinac Island Ferry Company (Dube, Robert)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/07 11:59 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shepler's Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Osprey Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Hoffmann Shepler's Ferry Service LLC; for Shepler's Inc. (Dube, Robert)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Fri 03/07 12:07 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Samuel Peter Blatchley on behalf of plaintiffs Shepler's Inc., Mackinac Island Ferry Company (Blatchley, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 03/04 3:11 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Mackinac Island, City of (mg)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Tue 03/04 3:10 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Robert J. Jonker ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/03 6:04 PM
COMPLAINT against City of Mackinac Island filed by Shepler's Inc., Mackinac Island Ferry Company (Dube, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Summons
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Mon 03/03 6:06 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiffs Shepler's Inc., Mackinac Island Ferry Company in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7631909 (Dube, Robert)
Related: [-]