Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Donald C Nugent
Case #: 1:25-cv-00403
Nature of Suit140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 4:58 AM EDT
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Kathleen A. Nitschke
Perez Morris
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeasung Jay Yoo
Ste. 192 1284 Som Center Rd.
Mayfield Hts., OH 44124


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
28 28 motion Relief Thu 05/15 11:47 PM
Supplemental Motion for relief Motion to Take Judicial Notice filed by Plaintiff Jeasung Jay Yoo. (Yoo, Jeasung)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
27 27 resp Opposition Tue 05/13 3:38 PM
Opposition to23 Motion to Take Judicial Notice of Affidavit filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Nienaber, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
26 26 notice Notice (court event) Fri 05/09 9:17 AM
Notice of Conspiracy Counts and Civil Rights Violations under 18 U.S.C. §§ 241 and 242 filed by Jeasung Jay Yoo.. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Counts of Conspiracy, Commercial Dishonor, and Racketeering,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Legal Notice and Demand
25 25 motion Clarify Stay Fri 05/09 9:09 AM
Motion Related [+] for clarification, Judicial Notice, and Motion to stay proceedings filed by Plaintiff Jeasung Jay Yoo. (H,Ch)
Related: [-] quest
Monday, May 05, 2025
24 24 notice Notice (court event) Tue 05/06 2:58 PM
Notice of Intent to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Jeasung Jay Yoo. Related document(s)21 . (M,CE)
Related: [-]
23 23 4 pgs motion Order Tue 05/06 2:57 PM
Motion to Take Judicial Notice of Affidavit of Commercial Symmetry and Constitutional Violation filed by Plaintiff Jeasung Jay Yoo. Related document(s)22 . (M,CE)
Related: [-]
22 22 oth_doc Affidavit/Declaration (court event) Tue 05/06 2:56 PM
Affidavit of Commercial Symmetry and Constitutional Violation filed by Jeasung Jay Yoo.(M,CE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - UCC-1 Financing Statement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Chain of Dishonor
21 21 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 05/05 2:48 PM
Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Nienaber, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Case's Docket,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State Appellate Case's Docket,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Amended Answer and Counterclaims,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - 2025 Affidavit,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Journal Entry
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion for order Mon 05/05 10:11 AM
Marginal Entry Order granting Plaintiff's Motion for electronic filing privileges Related [+]. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 5/5/2025. (M,S)
Related: [-] 3
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for order Mon 05/05 10:06 AM
Marginal Entry Order granting Plaintiff's Motion to amend civil cover sheet Related [+]. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 5/5/2025. (M,S)
Related: [-] 9
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Mon 05/05 10:12 AM
Copy of20 Order on Motion,19 Order on Motion mailed to Jeasung Jay Yoo Ste. 192 1284 Som Center Rd. Mayfield Hts., OH 44124 on 5/5/2025. Related document(s)20 ,19 . (M,S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
18 18 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Wed 04/30 10:37 AM
Attorney Appearance by Alexandra N. Nienaber filed by on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Nienaber, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Tue 04/29 1:08 PM
Marginal Entry Order granting Defendant's16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 5/5/2025. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 4/29/2025. (M,S)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Tue 04/29 1:09 PM
Copy of17 Order on Motion for extension of time to answer mailed to Jeasung Jay Yoo Ste. 192 1284 Som Center Rd. Mayfield Hts., OH 44124 on 4/29/2025. Related document(s)17 . (M,S)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
16 16 motion Extension (answer complaint) Mon 04/28 4:12 PM
Motion for extension of time until May 5, 2025 to answer filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Nitschke, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
15 15 notice Notice (court event) Mon 04/14 9:28 AM
Notice of Filing Affidavit and Legal Notice and Demand for Disclosure filed by Jeasung Jay Yoo.. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Non-Disclosure, Collusion, and Fraudulent Concealment,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - FOIA and Privacy Act Request,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - IRS Responses to FOIA Privacy Act Request,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - IRS Appeal - Remains Unanswered,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - CHASE acts as Agent to the IRS,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Sherrod Brown Request for IRS Assistance,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Past Correspondences,
Att: 8 Exhibit G - Legal Notice and Demand for Disclosure
Monday, March 31, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Mon 03/31 3:47 PM
Marginal Entry Order granting Defendant's12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 4/28/2025. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 3/31/2025. (M,S)
Related: [-]
13 13 oth_doc Proposed Order Mon 03/31 1:38 PM
Proposed Order filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Related document(s)12 . (Nitschke, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension (answer complaint) Mon 03/31 1:29 PM
Motion for extension of time until April 28, 2025 to answer plaintiff's complaint filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Nitschke, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Mon 03/31 3:48 PM
Copy of14 Order on Motion for extension of time to answer mailed to Jeasung Jay Yoo Ste. 192 1284 Som Center Rd. Mayfield Hts., OH 44124 on 3/31/2025. Related document(s)14 . (M,S)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
11 11 service Return of Service Executed Tue 03/25 2:20 PM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. on 3/20/2025, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Jeasung Jay Yoo. Related document(s)8 . (M,CE)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
10 10 notice Notice (court event) Tue 03/25 12:56 PM
Notice of jurisdictional clarification filed by Jeasung Jay Yoo. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
9 9 4 pgs motion Order Tue 03/25 12:53 PM
Motion to amend civil cover sheet filed by Plaintiff Jeasung Jay Yoo. Related document1 .. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet
Monday, March 17, 2025
8 8 oth_evt Summons Issued Mon 03/17 11:46 AM
Original Summons issued for service upon JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (W,CM)
Related: [-]
7 7 oth_doc Praecipe Mon 03/17 11:42 AM
Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Jeasung Jay Yoo.(W,CM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons - JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
oth_evt Service by Clerk Mon 03/17 11:48 AM
Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 9589 0710 5270 2833 2223 66. (W,CM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
6 6 oth_doc Errata (court event) Tue 03/04 4:08 PM
Notice of Errata filed by Jeasung Jay Yoo. Related document(s)1 . (F,AW)
Related: [-]
5 5 oth_evt Summons Issued Tue 03/04 4:02 PM
Original Summons issued to pro se Plaintiff over the counter for service upon JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
4 4 oth_doc Praecipe Tue 03/04 3:46 PM
Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Jeasung Jay Yoo.(F,AW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
oth_evt Service by Clerk Tue 03/04 4:03 PM
Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 9589 0710 5270 2600 5816 27. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
3 3 4 pgs motion Order Mon 03/03 4:39 PM
Motion for electronic filing privileges filed by Plaintiff Jeasung Jay Yoo. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
2 2 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Mon 03/03 4:29 PM
Magistrate Consent Form issued at counter to Pro Se Plaintiff. No summons was provided and none was issued. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/03 4:25 PM
Complaint with jury demand against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Filing fee paid. $405.00. Receipt # 157007. Filed by Jeasung Jay Yoo.. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Legal & Financial Evidence,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Chase Discovery Repsonses,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Chase 3555 Card Member Agreement & Statement,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Procedural Rulings & Court Filings,
Att: 6 Affidavit for Unruled & Unadjudicated Motions,
Att: 7 Affidavit on the True Nature of Bank Lending Practices,
Att: 8 Affidavit for Brach of Good Faith,
Att: 9 Affidavit of Recorded Coversations with Chase Representatives
utility Add and Terminate Judge Mon 03/03 4:26 PM
Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Mon 03/03 4:28 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]