Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:25-cv-02023
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2025
Case in other court:Louisiana Western, 3:25-cv-00119
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 4:26 AM PDT
Defendant
Monsanto Co.
Represented By
Jennise Walker-Stubbs
Shook Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
Larry Brister
Represented By
Mikalia Miceli Kott
Herman Herman & Katz
contact info
Joseph Edward Cain
Herman Herman & Katz
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
11 11 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 04/01 10:10 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Co. identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Co.. [RE: Plaintiff Larry Brister] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 04/01 10:08 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Co. identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Co.. [RE: Plaintiff Larry Brister] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/01 10:07 AM
Defendant Monsanto Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff Larry Brister] by Monsanto Co.. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
utility MDL Member Case Mon 03/03 11:08 AM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: Western District of Louisiana, 3:25-cv-00119, Brister v. Monsanto Co, Opened in California Northern District as 3:25-cv-02023-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order CTO-503 cc: JPMDL (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
8 8 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Mon 03/03 11:04 AM
Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Western; Case Number 3:25-cv-00119. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
7 7 ORDER FOR MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER CTO # 503, directing transfer to Northern District of California, In Re: Roundup Products Liability Litigation, MDL # 2741. Record electronically transmitted to receiving court. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Kiper, C)
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE received via email from Clerk of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transmitting Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-503) in MDL No. 2741, IN RE: Roundup Products Liability Litigation advising case shall be transferred to the Northern District of California upon request of the record. (crt,Alexander, E)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
5 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Larry Brister. Monsanto Co waiver sent on 2/5/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. (aty,Kott, Mikalia) Modified to correct service date as an erroneous date was entered at the time of e-filing on 2/6/2025 (Chavis, J).
Related: [-]
4 4 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Larry Brister. (aty,Kott, Mikalia)
Related: [-]
NOTICE of Corrective Action to Mikalia Miceli Kott on behalf of Larry Brister regarding5 Waiver of Service Executed. Action taken: docket text modified to reflect correct service date 02/05/2025. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
3 3 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Mikalia Miceli Kott on behalf of Larry Brister. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 2/18/2025. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
2 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Monsanto Co. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6181985) filed by Larry Brister.(Attorney Mikalia Miceli Kott added to party Larry Brister(pty:pla))(aty,Kott, Mikalia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet
CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]