Original Case: 1:24-cv-01477

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-prici-10651
Typeprivate civil / federal question
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2025
Terminated:Apr 18, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 4:51 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
STEPHEN B. TINSLEY
Represented By
Emily Rose Hancock
Brown Readdick Bumgartner Carter Strickland & Watkins, LLP
contact info
Richard K. Strickland
Brown Readdick Bumgartner Carter Strickland & Watkins, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
DARIUS RICE
Represented By
Harry Martina Daniels
The Law Offices of Harry M. Daniels, LLC
contact info
Bakari T. Sellers
Strom Law Firm
contact info
Latrice Latin Alexander
The Latin Law Group LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ASHLEY JACKSON
Represented By
Bakari T. Sellers
Strom Law Firm
contact info
Latrice Latin Alexander
The Latin Law Group LLC
contact info
Harry Daniels Jr.
Law Offices of Harry M. Daniels
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/23/2025 4:51 AM EDT
Thursday, February 27, 2025
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Stephen B. Tinsley on 02/27/2025. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/21/2025 as to Appellant Stephen B. Tinsley. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/31/2025 as to Appellee Darius Rice.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs CIVIL - Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 2 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 3 22 pgs USDC Order DE #26