New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael B Kaplan
Case #: 3:25-bk-12234
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC
704 Howe Street
Point Pleasant Beach, NJ 08742
Represented By
Andrew R. Macklin
Brach Eichler
contact info
Brian W. Hofmeister
Law Firm Of Brian W. Hofmeister, LLC
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 10:26 AM EDT
Creditor
Kittiwake Avenue LLC
Represented By
Andrew R. Macklin
Brach Eichler
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102
Represented By
Samantha Lieb
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 40 minutes ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
44 44 3 pgs motion Retention (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner) Mon 05/05 2:07 PM
Application For Retention of Professional Grace Capital, LLC as Financial Broker Filed by Brian W. Hofmeister on behalf of Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC. Objection deadline is 5/12/2025. (Hofmeister, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
Thursday, May 01, 2025
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 05/01 2:20 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 5/1/2025. Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 07/03/2025 at 10:00 AM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (llb)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Hearing for: Status Conference. (related document:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Brian W. Hofmeister on behalf of Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 07/2/2025. filed by Debtor Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/24/2025 at 10:00 AM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton.
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 05/01 2:21 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 5/1/2025. Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 07/03/2025 at 10:00 AM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (llb)
Related: [-] 28 Motion re: for an Order to Determine That Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC is Stayed or, in the Alternative, the Automatic stay is Extended Over Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC and Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC Has No Standing to Pursue The State Court Eviction Action. Filed by Brian W. Hofmeister on behalf of Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/17/2025 at 10:00 AM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton.. (Attachments: #1 Certification #2 Brief #3 Proposed Order) Modified on 4/7/2025 (llb). SIGNATURE MISSING ON BRIEF Filed by Debtor Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 05/01 2:21 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 5/1/2025. Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 07/03/2025 at 10:00 AM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (llb)
Related: [-] 34 Cross Motion (related document:28 Motion re: for an Order to Determine That Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC is Stayed or, in the Alternative, the Automatic stay is Extended Over Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC and Ian filed by Debtor Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC), Motion for an Order Confirming Automatic Stay is Not in Effect Filed by Andrew R. Macklin on behalf of Kittiwake Avenue LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification Cert. of Andrew R. Macklin #2 Exhibit Exhibits A - G) Filed by Creditor Kittiwake Avenue LLC
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 05/01 2:21 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 5/1/2025. Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 07/03/2025 at 10:00 AM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (llb)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to dismiss case for other reasons re:Bad Faith, Substantial loss to Estate, no likelihood of Reorganization, in addition to Motion for Relief from Stay re: 120 Kittiwake Avenue, 3241, 3245, 3249 Route 35 Northbound, Lavallette, NJ. Fee Amount $ 199., or in the alternative Motion for Adequate Protection Filed by Andrew R. Macklin on behalf of Kittiwake Avenue LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/17/2025 at 10:00 AM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton.. (Attachments: #1 Brief #2 Certification Certification of Andrew Macklin, Esq #3 Exhibit Macklin Exhibits #4 Certification Certification of Calculation #5 Certification Certification of Maya Petrocelli #6 Exhibit Petrocelli Exhibits #7 Proposed Order) Filed by Creditor Kittiwake Avenue LLC
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
43 43 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Tue 04/29 12:06 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 filed by Brian W. Hofmeister on behalf of Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC. (Hofmeister, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
42 42 4 pgs answer Response Tue 04/29 9:49 AM
Response to Related [+] filed by Andrew R. Macklin on behalf of Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC. (Macklin, Andrew)
Related: [-] 41 Limited Objection to (related document:34 Cross Motion (related document:28 Motion re: for an Order to Determine That Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC is Stayed or, in the Alternative, the Automatic stay is Extended Over Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC and Ian filed by Debtor Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC), Motion for an Order Confirming Automatic Stay is Not in Effect Filed by Andrew R. Macklin on behalf of Kittiwake Avenue LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification Cert. of Andrew R. Macklin # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A - G) filed by Creditor Kittiwake Avenue LLC) filed by Samantha Lieb on behalf of U.S. Trustee. filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee
Monday, April 28, 2025
41 41 answer Objection Mon 04/28 3:48 PM
Limited Objection to Related [+] filed by Samantha Lieb on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Lieb, Samantha)
Related: [-] 34 Cross Motion (related document:28 Motion re: for an Order to Determine That Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC is Stayed or, in the Alternative, the Automatic stay is Extended Over Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC and Ian filed by Debtor Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC), Motion for an Order Confirming Automatic Stay is Not in Effect Filed by Andrew R. Macklin on behalf of Kittiwake Avenue LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification Cert. of Andrew R. Macklin # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A - G) filed by Creditor Kittiwake Avenue LLC
40 40 answer Response Mon 04/28 3:20 PM
Response to Related [+] filed by Andrew R. Macklin on behalf of Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC. (Macklin, Andrew)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to dismiss case for other reasons re:Bad Faith, Substantial loss to Estate, no likelihood of Reorganization, in addition to Motion for Relief from Stay re: 120 Kittiwake Avenue, 3241, 3245, 3249 Route 35 Northbound, Lavallette, NJ. Fee Amount $ 199., or in the alternative Motion for Adequate Protection Filed by Andrew R. Macklin on behalf of Kittiwake Avenue LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/17/2025 at 10:00 AM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief # 2 Certification Certification of Andrew Macklin, Esq # 3 Exhibit Macklin Exhibits # 4 Certification Certification of Calculation # 5 Certification Certification of Maya Petrocelli # 6 Exhibit Petrocelli Exhibits # 7 Proposed Order) filed by Creditor Kittiwake Avenue LLC,34 Cross Motion (related document:28 Motion re: for an Order to Determine That Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC is Stayed or, in the Alternative, the Automatic stay is Extended Over Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC and Ian filed by Debtor Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC), Motion for an Order Confirming Automatic Stay is Not in Effect Filed by Andrew R. Macklin on behalf of Kittiwake Avenue LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification Cert. of Andrew R. Macklin # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A - G) filed by Creditor Kittiwake Avenue LLC
Att: 1 Certification Reply Certification of Andrew R. Macklin with Exhibits
Thursday, April 24, 2025
39 39 answer Opposition Thu 04/24 6:05 PM
BriefCertification in Opposition to KAL Motion to Dismiss and Cross Motion re: rent Receiver Related [+] filed by Brian W. Hofmeister on behalf of Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC. (Hofmeister, Brian)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to dismiss case for other reasons re:Bad Faith, Substantial loss to Estate, no likelihood of Reorganization, in addition to Motion for Relief from Stay re: 120 Kittiwake Avenue, 3241, 3245, 3249 Route 35 Northbound, Lavallette, NJ. Fee Amount $ 199., or in the alternative Motion for Adequate Protection Filed by Andrew R. Macklin on behalf of Kittiwake Avenue LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/17/2025 at 10:00 AM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief # 2 Certification Certification of Andrew Macklin, Esq # 3 Exhibit Macklin Exhibits # 4 Certification Certification of Calculation # 5 Certification Certification of Maya Petrocelli # 6 Exhibit Petrocelli Exhibits # 7 Proposed Order) filed by Creditor Kittiwake Avenue LLC,34 Cross Motion (related document:28 Motion re: for an Order to Determine That Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC is Stayed or, in the Alternative, the Automatic stay is Extended Over Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC and Ian filed by Debtor Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC), Motion for an Order Confirming Automatic Stay is Not in Effect Filed by Andrew R. Macklin on behalf of Kittiwake Avenue LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification Cert. of Andrew R. Macklin # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A - G) filed by Creditor Kittiwake Avenue LLC
Att: 1 Certification in Opposition
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 04/24 11:26 AM
Hearing Rescheduled from 4/24/2025. Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2025 at 01:30 PM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (llb)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Hearing for: Status Conference. (related document:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Brian W. Hofmeister on behalf of Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 07/2/2025. filed by Debtor Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/24/2025 at 10:00 AM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton.
Thursday, April 17, 2025
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Mon 04/21 2:17 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 4/17/2025. Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2025 at 10:00 AM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (llb)
Related: [-] 28 Motion re: for an Order to Determine That Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC is Stayed or, in the Alternative, the Automatic stay is Extended Over Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC and Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC Has No Standing to Pursue The State Court Eviction Action. Filed by Brian W. Hofmeister on behalf of Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/17/2025 at 10:00 AM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton.. (Attachments: #1 Certification #2 Brief #3 Proposed Order) Modified on 4/7/2025 (llb). SIGNATURE MISSING ON BRIEF Filed by Debtor Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Mon 04/21 2:18 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 4/17/2025. Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2025 at 10:00 AM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (llb)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to dismiss case for other reasons re:Bad Faith, Substantial loss to Estate, no likelihood of Reorganization, in addition to Motion for Relief from Stay re: 120 Kittiwake Avenue, 3241, 3245, 3249 Route 35 Northbound, Lavallette, NJ. Fee Amount $ 199., or in the alternative Motion for Adequate Protection Filed by Andrew R. Macklin on behalf of Kittiwake Avenue LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/17/2025 at 10:00 AM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton.. (Attachments: #1 Brief #2 Certification Certification of Andrew Macklin, Esq #3 Exhibit Macklin Exhibits #4 Certification Certification of Calculation #5 Certification Certification of Maya Petrocelli #6 Exhibit Petrocelli Exhibits #7 Proposed Order) Filed by Creditor Kittiwake Avenue LLC
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Mon 04/21 2:19 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 4/17/2025. Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2025 at 01:30 PM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (llb)
Related: [-] 34 Cross Motion (related document:28 Motion re: for an Order to Determine That Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC is Stayed or, in the Alternative, the Automatic stay is Extended Over Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC and Ian filed by Debtor Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC), Motion for an Order Confirming Automatic Stay is Not in Effect Filed by Andrew R. Macklin on behalf of Kittiwake Avenue LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification Cert. of Andrew R. Macklin #2 Exhibit Exhibits A - G) Filed by Creditor Kittiwake Avenue LLC
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Tue 04/22 12:57 PM
AMENDED Hearing Rescheduled from 4/17/2025. Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2025 at 0 1:30 PM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (llb)
Related: [-] 28 Motion re: for an Order to Determine That Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC is Stayed or, in the Alternative, the Automatic stay is Extended Over Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC and Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC Has No Standing to Pursue The State Court Eviction Action. Filed by Brian W. Hofmeister on behalf of Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/17/2025 at 10:00 AM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton.. (Attachments: #1 Certification #2 Brief #3 Proposed Order) Modified on 4/7/2025 (llb). SIGNATURE MISSING ON BRIEF Filed by Debtor Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Tue 04/22 12:58 PM
AMENDED Hearing Rescheduled from 4/17/2025. Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2025 at 01:30 PM , MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (llb)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to dismiss case for other reasons re:Bad Faith, Substantial loss to Estate, no likelihood of Reorganization, in addition to Motion for Relief from Stay re: 120 Kittiwake Avenue, 3241, 3245, 3249 Route 35 Northbound, Lavallette, NJ. Fee Amount $ 199., or in the alternative Motion for Adequate Protection Filed by Andrew R. Macklin on behalf of Kittiwake Avenue LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/17/2025 at 10:00 AM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton.. (Attachments: #1 Brief #2 Certification Certification of Andrew Macklin, Esq #3 Exhibit Macklin Exhibits #4 Certification Certification of Calculation #5 Certification Certification of Maya Petrocelli #6 Exhibit Petrocelli Exhibits #7 Proposed Order) Filed by Creditor Kittiwake Avenue LLC
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
38 38 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/15 3:15 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Andrew R. Macklin on behalf of Kittiwake Avenue LLC. (Macklin, Andrew)
Related: [-] 34 Cross Motion filed by Creditor Kittiwake Avenue LLC, Motion Confirming Automatic Stay is Not in Effect,35 Application to Shorten Time filed by Creditor Kittiwake Avenue LLC,36 Order on Application to Shorten Time
Sunday, April 13, 2025
37 37 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 04/14 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/13/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
36 36 order Shorten Time Fri 04/11 3:17 PM
Order Granting Application to Shorten Time Related [+]
Related: [-] 34 Cross Motion (related document:28 Motion re: for an Order to Determine That Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC is Stayed or, in the Alternative, the Automatic stay is Extended Over Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Beha filed by Creditor Kittiwake Avenue LLC, Motion for an Order Confirming Automatic Stay is Not in Effect). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/11/2025. Hearing scheduled for 4/17/2025 at 11:30 AM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton.. (wiq
35 35 1 pgs motion Shorten Time Fri 04/11 2:43 PM
Application to Shorten Time Related [+]
Related: [-] 34 Cross Motion (related document:28 Motion re: for an Order to Determine That Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC is Stayed or, in the Alternative, the Automatic stay is Extended Over Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Beha filed by Creditor Kittiwake Avenue LLC, Motion for an Order Confirming Automatic Stay is Not in Effect) Filed by Andrew R. Macklin on behalf of Kittiwake Avenue LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Macklin, Andrew
34 34 6 pgs motion Confirming Automatic Stay is Not in Effect Fri 04/11 2:39 PM
Cross Motion Related [+], Motion for an Order Confirming Automatic Stay is Not in Effect Filed by Andrew R. Macklin on behalf of Kittiwake Avenue LLC.. (Macklin, Andrew)
Related: [-] 28 Motion re: for an Order to Determine That Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC is Stayed or, in the Alternative, the Automatic stay is Extended Over Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC and Ian filed by Debtor Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC
Att: 1 Certification Cert. of Andrew R. Macklin
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibits A - G
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
33 33 court Determination of Adjournment Request Wed 04/09 8:30 AM
Determination of Adjournment Request Granted. Hearing will be adjourned to MAY 1, 2025 at 10:00 am. The hearing date is Not Peremptory. Related [+] (wiq)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Creditor Kittiwake Avenue LLC, Motion for Relief From Stay, Motion for Adequate Protection,28 Motion re: for an Order to Determine That Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC is Stayed or, in the Alternative, the Automatic stay is Extended Over Ian V. Lagowitz, filed by Debtor Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC
Monday, April 07, 2025
32 32 misc Support Mon 04/07 9:42 AM
Brief in support of Related [+] filed by Brian W. Hofmeister on behalf of Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC. (Hofmeister, Brian)
Related: [-] 28 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC, Notice of Docketing Error
court Notice of Docketing Error Mon 04/07 9:29 AM
Correction Notice in Electronic Filing Related [+]. Type of Error: BRIEF IS NOT SIGNED, filed by Brian W. Hofmeister. Please correct and refile AS A SUPPORT with the court. (llb)
Related: [-] 28 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC
Sunday, April 06, 2025
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 04/07 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/06/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
30 30 order Shorten Time Fri 04/04 1:58 PM
Order Granting Application to Shorten Time Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/4/2025. Hearing scheduled for 4/17/2025 at 11:30 AM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton.. (wiq)
Related: [-] 28 Motion re: for an Order to Determine That Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC is Stayed or, in the Alternative, the Automatic stay is Extended Over Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC and Ian filed by Debtor Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC
29 29 1 pgs motion Shorten Time Fri 04/04 12:27 PM
Application to Shorten Time Related [+] Filed by Brian W. Hofmeister on behalf of Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC. (Hofmeister, Brian)
Related: [-] 28 Motion re: for an Order to Determine That Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC is Stayed or, in the Alternative, the Automatic stay is Extended Over Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC and Ian filed by Debtor Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC
Att: 1 Proposed Order
28 28 3 pgs motion Motion (Generic) - Only use if no other event is applicable Fri 04/04 12:26 PM
Motion re: for an Order to Determine That Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC is Stayed or, in the Alternative, the Automatic stay is Extended Over Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC and Ian V. Lagowitz, Rent Receiver on Behalf of Kittiwake Avenue, LLC Has No Standing to Pursue The State Court Eviction Action. Filed by Brian W. Hofmeister on behalf of Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/17/2025 at 10:00 AM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton.. (Hofmeister, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification
Att: 2 Brief
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Monday, March 31, 2025
27 27 misc Certificate of Service Mon 03/31 12:13 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brian W. Hofmeister on behalf of Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC. (Hofmeister, Brian)
Related: [-] 24 Order Respecting Amendment to Schedule(s)or Document(s)
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Mon 03/31 9:15 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Amended List of Creditors (Fee)([LINK 25-12234 MBK] ) [misc,amdcma] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47978425, fee amount $ 34.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#19
court Hearing Held Mon 03/31 2:15 PM
Minute of 3/31/2025 Hearing Held, OUTCOME: WITHDRAWN Related [+] (llb)
Related: [-] 7 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Statement of Your Current Monthly Income(122B), 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, List of Equity Security Holders, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/5/2025. Hearing scheduled for 3/31/2025 at 10:00 AM, Zoom-Judge Kaplan: join.zoom.us Meeting ID 160 546 2580, Passcode 962296, or call 1-646-828-7666..
Sunday, March 30, 2025
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 03/31 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/30/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 03/29 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/28/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Respecting Amendment to Schedule(s) or Document(s) Fri 03/28 3:53 PM
Order Respecting Amendment to Schedule(s) Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/28/2025. (pbf)
Related: [-] 19 Missing Document(s) Filed filed by Debtor Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC
23 23 misc Ch. 11 Small Business Statement of No Documents Fri 03/28 11:29 AM
Statement that No Documents Required by U.S.C. 1116 Have Been Filed or Prepared filed by Brian W. Hofmeister on behalf of Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC. (Hofmeister, Brian)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Statement of Operations Fri 03/28 11:28 AM
Statement of Operations for Small Business filed by Brian W. Hofmeister on behalf of Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC. (Hofmeister, Brian)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Cash Flow Statement Fri 03/28 11:26 AM
Cash Flow Statement for Small Business filed by Brian W. Hofmeister on behalf of Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC. (Hofmeister, Brian)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Balance Sheet Fri 03/28 11:25 AM
Balance Sheet filed by Brian W. Hofmeister on behalf of Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC. (Hofmeister, Brian)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Missing Document(s) Filed Fri 03/28 11:17 AM
Missing Document(s): Declaration Under Penalty For Non Individual Debtors, 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, List of All Creditors, List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Schedules, Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals A/B,C,D,E/F,G,H, filed by Brian W. Hofmeister on behalf of Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC. (Hofmeister, Brian)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Amended Schedules (Fee) - Use for All Amended Schedules Fri 03/28 11:12 AM
Amended Schedule(s) : Other Schedules re:Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy filed by Brian W. Hofmeister on behalf of Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC. (Hofmeister, Brian)
Related: [-]
utility Fee Due (Create Outstanding Fee) Fri 03/28 3:54 PM
Fee Due Amended List of Creditors (Fee) $ 34. Related [+] (pbf)
Related: [-] 19 Missing Document(s): Declaration Under Penalty For Non Individual Debtors, 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, List of All Creditors, List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Schedules, Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals A/B,C,D,E/F,G,H, filed by Brian W. Hofmeister on behalf of Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC. (Hofmeister, Brian)Modified on 3/28/2025 (pbf). ADDITIONAL CREDITORS ADDED TO THE CASE. filed by Debtor Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC
utility Remark re: Missing Documents Filed Fri 03/28 3:56 PM
Remark. No Documents Missing - All Required Documents Filed. (pbf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
17 17 order Retention Wed 03/26 2:41 PM
Order Granting Application to Employ Brian W. Hofmeister, LLC as Attorney as ATTORNEY FOR DEBTOR Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/26/2025. (wiq)
Related: [-] 2
16 16 misc Document Wed 03/26 10:32 AM
Document re: Notice of Adjournment of Telephonic 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Related [+] filed by Brian W. Hofmeister on behalf of Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC. (Hofmeister, Brian)
Related: [-] 4 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
15 15 court BNC Hrg to Dismiss Case Thu 03/20 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Hearing to Dismiss Case. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Fri 03/14 3:15 PM
Certification In Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Andrew R. Macklin on behalf of Kittiwake Avenue LLC. (Macklin, Andrew)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Creditor Kittiwake Avenue LLC, Motion for Relief From Stay, Motion for Adequate Protection
13 13 3 pgs motion Adequate Protection Fri 03/14 10:06 AM
Motion to dismiss case for other reasons re:Bad Faith, Substantial loss to Estate, no likelihood of Reorganization, in addition to Motion for Relief from Stay re: 120 Kittiwake Avenue, 3241, 3245, 3249 Route 35 Northbound, Lavallette, NJ. Fee Amount $ 199., or in the alternative Motion for Adequate Protection Filed by Andrew R. Macklin on behalf of Kittiwake Avenue LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/17/2025 at 10:00 AM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton.. (Macklin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief
Att: 2 Certification Certification of Andrew Macklin, Esq
Att: 3 Exhibit Macklin Exhibits
Att: 4 Certification Certification of Calculation
Att: 5 Certification Certification of Maya Petrocelli
Att: 6 Exhibit Petrocelli Exhibits
Att: 7 Proposed Order
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Fri 03/14 10:07 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Relief From Stay([LINK 25-12234 MBK] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47918435, fee amount $ 199.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#13
Friday, March 07, 2025
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sun 03/09 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sun 03/09 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sun 03/09 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors Sun 03/09 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
8 8 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Thu 03/06 5:33 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Samantha Lieb on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Lieb, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Show Cause Wed 03/05 8:59 AM
Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Statement of Your Current Monthly Income(122B), 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, List of Equity Security Holders, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/5/2025. Hearing scheduled for 3/31/2025 at 10:00 AM, Zoom-Judge Kaplan: join.zoom.us Meeting ID 160 546 2580, Passcode 962296, or call 1-646-828-7666.. (mmf)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Judge Kaplan's Zoom Order Wed 03/05 8:54 AM
TEXT ORDER: Beginning on February 2, 2023, Judge Kaplan's regular Thursday motion calendar (addressing Chapter 7 & 11 cases) will utilize ZOOM for remote appearances. Parties remain free to request in-person appearances by contacting Chambers and the Court may direct same if, in the Court's discretion, in-person appearances are appropriate. Otherwise, remote appearances will be conducted via ZOOM ONLY. Please find the Zoom link on Judge Kaplan's page on the Court's website: http://www.njb.uscourts.gov/content/honorable-michael-b-kaplan. To appear via Zoom, parties may click on the Zoom link on the website or use a telephone to dial-in using the dial-in information. Please visit Judge Kaplan's page on the Court's website for further information regarding appearances, including the Court's Zoom appearance guidelines. (mmf)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Notice of Hearing (Upload) Wed 03/05 8:45 AM
Notice of Hearing for: Status Conference. Related [+]. The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/24/2025 at 10:00 AM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (rms)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Brian W. Hofmeister on behalf of Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 07/2/2025. filed by Debtor Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC
4 4 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Wed 03/05 7:25 AM
Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/3/2025 at 01:00 PM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 5/13/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 9/2/2025. (llb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Tue 03/04 12:03 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Andrew R. Macklin on behalf of Kittiwake Avenue LLC. (Macklin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
2 2 3 pgs motion Retention (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner) Tue 03/04 9:42 AM
Application For Retention of Professional Law Firm of Brian W. Hofmeister, LLC as Attorney Filed by Brian W. Hofmeister on behalf of Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC. Objections due by 3/25/2025. (Hofmeister, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
1 1 11 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 03/04 9:38 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Brian W. Hofmeister on behalf of Ocean Bay Holdings, LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 07/2/2025. (Hofmeister, Brian)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Tue 03/04 9:39 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-12234 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47873558, fee amount $ 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1