Maryland District Court
Judge:Lydia Kay Griggsby
Case #: 8:25-cv-00708
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:15 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Allegheny Health Newtwork, d/b/a Allegheny General Hospital
120 Fifth Ave., Suite 2900
Pittsburgh, PA 15222
Defendant
UPMC Presbyterian Shadyside
200 Lothrop Street
Pittsburgh, PA 15312
Defendant
Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania, d/b/a Medical Center Hospital of the Univeristy of Pennsylvania
3451 Walnut Street Room 310
Philadelphia, PA 19104
Defendant
The University of Chicago Medical Center
5841 South Maryland Avenue
Chicago, IL 60637
Defendant
The Queen's Health Systems
1301 Punchbowl Street
Honolulu, HI 96813
Defendant
The New York and Presbyterian Hospital d/b/a New York Presbyterian Hospital
525 East 68th Street
New York, NY 10021
Defendant
The Nemours Foundation
10140 Centurion Parkway North
Jacksonville, FL 32256
Defendant
The Methodist Hospital d/b/a Houston Methodist Hospital
Defendant
The Johns Hopkins Hospital
1800 Orleans Street
Baltimore, MD 21202
Defendant
The Cleveland Clinic Foundation d/b/a Cleveland Clinic
9500 Euclid Ave
Cleveland, OH 44195
Defendant
Rush University Medical Center
1653 West Congress Parkway
Chicago, IL 60612
Defendant
Regents of the University of California
1111 Franklin St., 12th Floor
Oakland, CA 94607
Defendant
Northwestern Memorial Hospital
251 East Huron Street
Chicago, IL 60611
Defendant
National Matching Services, Inc..
Defendant
Leesburg Regional Medical Center Inc. d/b/a UF Health Central Florida
600 E. Dixie Avenue
Leesburg, FL 34748
Defendant
Kaiser Permanente
1 Kaiser Plaza
Oakland, CA 94612
Defendant
Ascension Health
4600 Edmundson Rd.
St. Louis, MO 63134
Defendant
American Society of Health-System Pharmacists, Inc.
4500 East-West Highway, Suite 900
Bethesda, MD 20814
Plaintiff
June Kim
13126 Lazy Glen Ct
Herndon, VA 20171
Represented By
Joseph Allan Pettigrew
Scott+scott Attorneys At Law LLP
contact info
Patrick J. McGahan
Scott&scott Attorneys At Law LLP
contact info
Matthew Joseph Perez
Scott&scott Attorneys At Law LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 75 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
33 33 3 pgs order Order Tue 04/01 10:23 AM
CONSOLIDATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER; consolidating Kim v. American Society of Health-System Pharmacists, Inc., et al., No. 25-cv-00708; and (2) Albert v. American Society of Health-System Pharmacists, Inc., et. al, No. 8:25-cv-00673-LKG; directing that the parties shall proceed and make all future filings under the lead case, Albert v. American Society of Health-System Pharmacists, Inc., et. al, No. 8:25-cv-00673-LKG; holding in abeyance the Plaintiffs' motion to appoint class counsel, pending the briefing of their motion to appoint class counsel. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 4/1/2025. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Remark - Member Case Tue 04/01 10:24 AM
THIS IS A CONSOLIDATED CASE. PLEASE DO NOT ELECTRONICALLY FILE OR SPREAD TEXT IN THIS CASE. ALL SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS ARE TO BE ELECTRONICALLY FILED ONLY IN THE LEAD CASE (LKG-25-673). (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
32 32 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 03/27 6:02 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by June Kim. Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania, d/b/a Medical Center Hospital of the Univeristy of Pennsylvania waiver sent on 3/24/2025, answer due 5/23/2025.(Perez, Matthew)
Related: [-]
31 31 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/27 12:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by June Kim. Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania, d/b/a Medical Center Hospital of the Univeristy of Pennsylvania served on 3/17/2025, answer due 4/7/2025.(Perez, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
30 30 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 03/26 4:30 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by June Kim. UPMC Presbyterian Shadyside waiver sent on 3/26/2025, answer due 5/27/2025.(Perez, Matthew)
Related: [-]
29 29 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/26 4:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by June Kim. The Methodist Hospital d/b/a Houston Methodist Hospital served on 3/17/2025, answer due 4/7/2025.(Perez, Matthew)
Related: [-]
28 28 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/26 4:27 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by June Kim. National Matching Services, Inc.. served on 3/18/2025, answer due 4/8/2025.(Perez, Matthew)
Related: [-]
27 27 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/26 4:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by June Kim. Kaiser Permanente served on 3/18/2025, answer due 4/8/2025.(Perez, Matthew)
Related: [-]
26 26 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 03/26 12:48 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by June Kim. The Nemours Foundation waiver sent on 3/21/2025, answer due 5/20/2025.(Perez, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
25 25 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/25 9:42 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by June Kim. Ascension Health waiver sent on 3/25/2025, answer due 5/27/2025.(Perez, Matthew)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/25 4:38 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by June Kim. The Cleveland Clinic Foundation d/b/a Cleveland Clinic waiver sent on 3/24/2025, answer due 5/23/2025.(Perez, Matthew)
Related: [-]
23 23 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/25 12:20 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by June Kim. The New York and Presbyterian Hospital d/b/a New York Presbyterian Hospital waiver sent on 3/24/2025, answer due 5/23/2025.(Perez, Matthew)
Related: [-]
22 22 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/25 8:18 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by June Kim. Rush University Medical Center waiver sent on 3/24/2025, answer due 5/23/2025.(Perez, Matthew)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/25 8:16 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by June Kim. Leesburg Regional Medical Center Inc. d/b/a UF Health Central Florida waiver sent on 3/25/2025, answer due 5/27/2025.(Perez, Matthew)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/25 8:15 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by June Kim. Northwestern Memorial Hospital waiver sent on 3/24/2025, answer due 5/23/2025.(Perez, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
19 19 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 03/24 5:47 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by June Kim. The University of Chicago Medical Center waiver sent on 3/24/2025, answer due 5/23/2025.(Perez, Matthew)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 03/24 5:45 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by June Kim. Regents of the University of California waiver sent on 3/24/2025, answer due 5/23/2025.(Perez, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
17 17 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 03/21 3:09 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by June Kim. The Queen's Health Systems waiver sent on 3/21/2025, answer due 5/20/2025.(Perez, Matthew)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/21 2:06 PM
NOTICE by June Kim Notice of Intent to File Motion to Consolidate and Appoint Interim Class Counsel (Perez, Matthew)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 03/21 10:47 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by June Kim. American Society of Health-System Pharmacists, Inc. waiver sent on 3/17/2025, answer due 5/16/2025.(Pettigrew, Joseph)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 03/21 10:45 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by June Kim. The Johns Hopkins Hospital waiver sent on 3/19/2025, answer due 5/19/2025.(Pettigrew, Joseph)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 03/21 10:42 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by June Kim. Allegheny Health Newtwork, d/b/a Allegheny General Hospital waiver sent on 3/20/2025, answer due 5/19/2025.(Pettigrew, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
12 12 order Order on Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/17 4:07 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting10 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Patrick McGahan. Directing attorney Patrick McGahan to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 3/17/2025. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Case Management Order Mon 03/17 11:38 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 3/17/2025. (mu1s, Chambers)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Pro Hac Vice - Corrected Mon 03/17 11:29 AM
CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Patrick McGahan by June Kim. The fee has already been paid.(Pettigrew, Joseph)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice QC Notice - Pro Hac - Signatures Mon 03/17 11:11 AM
QC NOTICE:6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by June Kim needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/17 11:10 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Matthew Joseph Perez. Directing attorney Matthew Joseph Perez to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 3/17/2025. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Thu 03/13 9:37 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Allegheny Health Newtwork, d/b/a Allegheny General Hospital, American Society of Health-System Pharmacists, Inc., Ascension Health, Kaiser Permanente, Leesburg Regional Medical Center Inc. d/b/a UF Health Central Florida, National Matching Services, Inc.., Northwestern Memorial Hospital, Regents of the University of California, Rush University Medical Center, The Cleveland Clinic Foundation d/b/a Cleveland Clinic, The Johns Hopkins Hospital, The Methodist Hospital d/b/a Houston Methodist Hospital, The Nemours Foundation, The New York and Presbyterian Hospital d/b/a New York Presbyterian Hospital, The Queen's Health Systems, The University of Chicago Medical Center, Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania, d/b/a Medical Center Hospital of the Univeristy of Pennsylvania, UPMC Presbyterian Shadyside.(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/12 11:50 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Patrick McGahan (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11836308.) by June Kim(Pettigrew, Joseph)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/12 11:42 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew Joseph Perez (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11836265.) by June Kim(Pettigrew, Joseph)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/12 11:31 AM
NOTICE by June Kim re1 Complaint,,,, Summonses (Pettigrew, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 03/06 1:18 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby. Judge Deborah L. Boardman no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
3 3 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Tue 03/04 3:49 PM
QC NOTICE:1 Complaint,,,, filed by June Kim was filed incorrectly. ****The following attachments are missing - Summonses. To correct this problem, file completed Summonses using the event > Other Filings > Notices > Notice (Other) and link Summonses to1 Complaint. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/04 11:39 AM
NOTICE by June Kim Civil Cover Sheet (Pettigrew, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 46 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/04 11:35 AM
COMPLAINT against Allegheny Health Newtwork, d/b/a Allegheny General Hospital, American Society of Health-System Pharmacists, Inc., Ascension Health, Kaiser Permanente, Leesburg Regional Medical Center Inc. d/b/a UF Health Central Florida, National Matching Services, Inc.., Northwestern Memorial Hospital, Regents of the University of California, Rush University Medical Center, The Cleveland Clinic Foundation d/b/a Cleveland Clinic, The Johns Hopkins Hospital, The Methodist Hospital d/b/a Houston Methodist Hospital, The Nemours Foundation, The New York and Presbyterian Hospital d/b/a New York Presbyterian Hospital, The Queen's Health Systems, The University of Chicago Medical Center, Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania, d/b/a Medical Center Hospital of the Univeristy of Pennsylvania, UPMC Presbyterian Shadyside ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11818573.), filed by June Kim.(Pettigrew, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - ASHP Regulations on Accreditation of Pharmacy Residencies,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Residency Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Registration Guide,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Rules for the ASHP Matching Program,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Applicant Agreement,
Att: 6 Summons