Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:David L Russell
Referred: Chris M Stephens
Case #: 5:25-cv-00275
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
8 8 motion Report and Recommendation ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges Wed 04/23 11:55 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION the undersigned recommends that the Court DISMISS Petitioner's action without prejudice to allow for refiling in the district court with jurisdiction over his current custodian.The undersigned also recommends that should the Court receive Petitioner's $5.00 filing fee, it be returned to Petitioner. Objections to R&R due by 5/14/2025. This Report and Recommendation terminates the referral of this matter to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M Stephens on 4/23/2025. (ac)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
7 7 notice ~Notice (other) Mon 03/31 4:17 PM
NOTICE (other) by Kenneth Mobley re5 Order(naa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Request for Withdrawal of Inmate's Personal Funds,
Att: 2 Envelope
6 6 motion Temporary Restraining Order Mon 03/31 4:13 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Kenneth Mobley. Motions referred to Chris M Stephens.(naa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order Tue 03/18 8:30 AM
ORDER TO CURE. Petitioner must cure this deficiency not later than April 8, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M Stephens on 3/18/2025. (ac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
4 4 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 03/04 9:03 AM
ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Chris M Stephens. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 03/04/2025. (naa)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Previous Cases Tue 03/04 9:00 AM
PREVIOUS Cases (naa)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs motion Order Tue 03/04 8:54 AM
MOTION for Order titled, Motion to direct warden by Kenneth Mobley.(naa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope
Monday, March 03, 2025
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Tue 03/04 8:46 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Kenneth Mobley.(naa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Brief in Support,
Att: 2 Envelope